EP2646606 - SURFACE-ANCHORED FC-BAIT ANTIBODY DISPLAY SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2013/41] | SURFACE, ANCHORED FC-BAIT ANTIBODY DISPLAY SYSTEM | ||
[2018/21] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.08.2019 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.09.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.04.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, MK | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. 126 East Lincoln Road Rahway, New Jersey 07065-0907 / US | [2018/41] |
Former [2013/41] | For all designated states Merck Sharp&Dohme Corp. 126 East Lincoln Road Rahway, New Jersey 07106 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHA, Dongxing 21 Lafayette Street Suite 200 Lebanon New Hampshire 03766 / US | 02 /
SHAHEEN, Hussam Hisham 21 Lafayette Street Suite 200 Lebanon New Hampshire 03766 / US | [2013/41] | Representative(s) | Horgan, James Michael Frederic Merck Sharp & Dohme (UK) Limited 120 Moorgate London EC2M 6UR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/41] | Horgan, James Michael Frederic Merck & Co., Inc. European Patent Department Hertford Road Hoddesdon Hertfordshire EN11 9BU / GB | Application number, filing date | 11844912.3 | 29.11.2011 | [2018/41] | WO2011US62286 | Priority number, date | US20100458771P | 01.12.2010 Original published format: US 458771 P | [2013/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012074948 | Date: | 07.06.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/23] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2646606 | Date: | 09.10.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.06.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2646606 | Date: | 10.10.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 19.07.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.04.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C40B40/02, C07K16/00, C07K16/32, C07K16/40, C07K16/46, C12N15/10, C40B40/10 | [2018/18] | CPC: |
C12N15/1037 (EP,CN,US);
C07K16/46 (CN,US);
C07K16/00 (EP,CN,US);
C07K16/32 (EP,CN,US);
C07K16/40 (EP,CN,US);
C40B40/10 (EP,CN,US);
C07K2317/14 (EP,CN,US);
C07K2317/21 (EP,CN,US);
C07K2317/35 (EP,CN,US);
|
Former IPC [2014/19] | C40B40/02, C07K16/00 | ||
Former IPC [2013/41] | C40B40/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/41] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | OBERFLÄCHEN-VERANKERTES FC-BEUTE-ANTIKÖRPERANZEIGESYSTEM | [2018/21] | English: | SURFACE-ANCHORED FC-BAIT ANTIBODY DISPLAY SYSTEM | [2018/21] | French: | SYSTÈME DE PRÉSENTATION D'ANTICORPS FC-LEURRE ANCRÉ EN SURFACE | [2013/41] |
Former [2013/41] | OBERFLÄCHE UND VERANKERTES FC-BEUTE-ANTIKÖRPERANZEIGESYSTEM | ||
Former [2013/41] | SURFACE, ANCHORED FC-BAIT ANTIBODY DISPLAY SYSTEM | Entry into regional phase | 01.07.2013 | National basic fee paid | 01.07.2013 | Search fee paid | 01.07.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.07.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.07.2013 | Examination requested [2013/41] | 13.11.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.04.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.10.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.05.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.11.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.04.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.08.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 31.08.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.08.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.04.2016 | Opposition(s) | 11.07.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.11.2011 | AL | 10.10.2018 | AT | 10.10.2018 | CY | 10.10.2018 | CZ | 10.10.2018 | DK | 10.10.2018 | EE | 10.10.2018 | ES | 10.10.2018 | FI | 10.10.2018 | HR | 10.10.2018 | IT | 10.10.2018 | LT | 10.10.2018 | LV | 10.10.2018 | MC | 10.10.2018 | MK | 10.10.2018 | NL | 10.10.2018 | PL | 10.10.2018 | RO | 10.10.2018 | RS | 10.10.2018 | SE | 10.10.2018 | SI | 10.10.2018 | SK | 10.10.2018 | SM | 10.10.2018 | TR | 10.10.2018 | IE | 29.11.2018 | LU | 29.11.2018 | MT | 29.11.2018 | BE | 30.11.2018 | CH | 30.11.2018 | LI | 30.11.2018 | BG | 10.01.2019 | NO | 10.01.2019 | GR | 11.01.2019 | IS | 10.02.2019 | PT | 10.02.2019 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/30] | HU | 29.11.2011 | |
AL | 10.10.2018 | ||
AT | 10.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 10.10.2018 | ||
DK | 10.10.2018 | ||
EE | 10.10.2018 | ||
ES | 10.10.2018 | ||
FI | 10.10.2018 | ||
HR | 10.10.2018 | ||
IT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LV | 10.10.2018 | ||
MC | 10.10.2018 | ||
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
PL | 10.10.2018 | ||
RO | 10.10.2018 | ||
RS | 10.10.2018 | ||
SE | 10.10.2018 | ||
SI | 10.10.2018 | ||
SK | 10.10.2018 | ||
SM | 10.10.2018 | ||
TR | 10.10.2018 | ||
IE | 29.11.2018 | ||
LU | 29.11.2018 | ||
MT | 29.11.2018 | ||
BE | 30.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
GR | 11.01.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
PT | 10.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 10.10.2018 | |
AT | 10.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 10.10.2018 | ||
DK | 10.10.2018 | ||
EE | 10.10.2018 | ||
ES | 10.10.2018 | ||
FI | 10.10.2018 | ||
HR | 10.10.2018 | ||
IT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LV | 10.10.2018 | ||
MC | 10.10.2018 | ||
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
PL | 10.10.2018 | ||
RO | 10.10.2018 | ||
RS | 10.10.2018 | ||
SE | 10.10.2018 | ||
SI | 10.10.2018 | ||
SK | 10.10.2018 | ||
SM | 10.10.2018 | ||
TR | 10.10.2018 | ||
IE | 29.11.2018 | ||
LU | 29.11.2018 | ||
MT | 29.11.2018 | ||
BE | 30.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
GR | 11.01.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
PT | 10.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 10.10.2018 | |
AT | 10.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 10.10.2018 | ||
DK | 10.10.2018 | ||
EE | 10.10.2018 | ||
ES | 10.10.2018 | ||
FI | 10.10.2018 | ||
HR | 10.10.2018 | ||
IT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LV | 10.10.2018 | ||
MC | 10.10.2018 | ||
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
PL | 10.10.2018 | ||
RO | 10.10.2018 | ||
RS | 10.10.2018 | ||
SE | 10.10.2018 | ||
SI | 10.10.2018 | ||
SK | 10.10.2018 | ||
SM | 10.10.2018 | ||
IE | 29.11.2018 | ||
LU | 29.11.2018 | ||
MT | 29.11.2018 | ||
BE | 30.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
GR | 11.01.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
PT | 10.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 10.10.2018 | |
AT | 10.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 10.10.2018 | ||
DK | 10.10.2018 | ||
EE | 10.10.2018 | ||
ES | 10.10.2018 | ||
FI | 10.10.2018 | ||
HR | 10.10.2018 | ||
IT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LV | 10.10.2018 | ||
MC | 10.10.2018 | ||
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
PL | 10.10.2018 | ||
RO | 10.10.2018 | ||
RS | 10.10.2018 | ||
SE | 10.10.2018 | ||
SI | 10.10.2018 | ||
SK | 10.10.2018 | ||
SM | 10.10.2018 | ||
IE | 29.11.2018 | ||
LU | 29.11.2018 | ||
BE | 30.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
GR | 11.01.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
PT | 10.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AL | 10.10.2018 | |
AT | 10.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 10.10.2018 | ||
DK | 10.10.2018 | ||
EE | 10.10.2018 | ||
ES | 10.10.2018 | ||
FI | 10.10.2018 | ||
HR | 10.10.2018 | ||
IT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LV | 10.10.2018 | ||
MC | 10.10.2018 | ||
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
PL | 10.10.2018 | ||
RO | 10.10.2018 | ||
RS | 10.10.2018 | ||
SE | 10.10.2018 | ||
SK | 10.10.2018 | ||
SM | 10.10.2018 | ||
IE | 29.11.2018 | ||
LU | 29.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
GR | 11.01.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
PT | 10.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 10.10.2018 | |
AT | 10.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 10.10.2018 | ||
DK | 10.10.2018 | ||
EE | 10.10.2018 | ||
ES | 10.10.2018 | ||
FI | 10.10.2018 | ||
HR | 10.10.2018 | ||
IT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LV | 10.10.2018 | ||
MC | 10.10.2018 | ||
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
PL | 10.10.2018 | ||
RO | 10.10.2018 | ||
RS | 10.10.2018 | ||
SE | 10.10.2018 | ||
SK | 10.10.2018 | ||
SM | 10.10.2018 | ||
LU | 29.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
GR | 11.01.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
PT | 10.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 10.10.2018 | |
AT | 10.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 10.10.2018 | ||
DK | 10.10.2018 | ||
EE | 10.10.2018 | ||
ES | 10.10.2018 | ||
FI | 10.10.2018 | ||
HR | 10.10.2018 | ||
IT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LV | 10.10.2018 | ||
MC | 10.10.2018 | ||
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
PL | 10.10.2018 | ||
RO | 10.10.2018 | ||
RS | 10.10.2018 | ||
SE | 10.10.2018 | ||
SM | 10.10.2018 | ||
LU | 29.11.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
GR | 11.01.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
PT | 10.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | AL | 10.10.2018 | |
AT | 10.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 10.10.2018 | ||
DK | 10.10.2018 | ||
ES | 10.10.2018 | ||
FI | 10.10.2018 | ||
HR | 10.10.2018 | ||
IT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LV | 10.10.2018 | ||
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
PL | 10.10.2018 | ||
RS | 10.10.2018 | ||
SE | 10.10.2018 | ||
LU | 29.11.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
GR | 11.01.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
PT | 10.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AL | 10.10.2018 | |
AT | 10.10.2018 | ||
DK | 10.10.2018 | ||
ES | 10.10.2018 | ||
FI | 10.10.2018 | ||
HR | 10.10.2018 | ||
IT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LV | 10.10.2018 | ||
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
PL | 10.10.2018 | ||
RS | 10.10.2018 | ||
SE | 10.10.2018 | ||
LU | 29.11.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
GR | 11.01.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
PT | 10.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 10.10.2018 | |
AT | 10.10.2018 | ||
ES | 10.10.2018 | ||
FI | 10.10.2018 | ||
HR | 10.10.2018 | ||
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LV | 10.10.2018 | ||
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
PL | 10.10.2018 | ||
RS | 10.10.2018 | ||
SE | 10.10.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
GR | 11.01.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
PT | 10.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/25] | AT | 10.10.2018 | |
ES | 10.10.2018 | ||
FI | 10.10.2018 | ||
HR | 10.10.2018 | ||
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LV | 10.10.2018 | ||
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
PL | 10.10.2018 | ||
RS | 10.10.2018 | ||
SE | 10.10.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
GR | 11.01.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 10.10.2018 | |
ES | 10.10.2018 | ||
FI | 10.10.2018 | ||
HR | 10.10.2018 | ||
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LV | 10.10.2018 | ||
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
PL | 10.10.2018 | ||
SE | 10.10.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
GR | 11.01.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AT | 10.10.2018 | |
ES | 10.10.2018 | ||
FI | 10.10.2018 | ||
HR | 10.10.2018 | ||
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LV | 10.10.2018 | ||
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
PL | 10.10.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | FI | 10.10.2018 | |
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
PL | 10.10.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | FI | 10.10.2018 | |
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | LT | 10.10.2018 | |
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/17] | NL | 10.10.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2008100816 (MEDIMMUNE INC [US], et al) [A] 1-24 * the whole document * * paragraph [0005]; figure 1 *; | [I]US2009163379 (WANG KEVIN CAILI [US], et al) [I] 1-24 * paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0011] * * paragraphs [0014] , [0016] * * paragraphs [0048] , [0065] * * paragraph [0053] * * paragraphs [0057] , [0070] * * paragraph [0085] *; | [I]WO2009111183 (GLYCOFI INC [US], et al) [I] 1-24 * page 5, lines 8-10 * * page 5, lines 16-18 * * page 25, lines 5-36 * * page 26, lines 1-3 * * page 6, lines 17-24 *; | [XPI]WO2011100566 (ONCOMED PHARM INC [US], et al) [XP] 1-6,8-15 * paragraph [0007] * [I] 7,16-24; | [T] - HUSSAM H. SHAHEEN ET AL, "A Dual-Mode Surface Display System for the Maturation and Production of Monoclonal Antibodies in Glyco-Engineered Pichia pastoris", PLOS ONE, (20130710), vol. 8, no. 7, doi:10.1371/journal.pone.0070190, page e70190, XP055109734 [T] 1-24 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pone.0070190 | International search | [A]EP1743938 (NASCACELL IP GMBH [DE]); | [Y]US2007105199 (YAN WEI [US], et al); | [X]US2010009866 (PRINZ BIANKA [US], et al); | [A]US2010075326 (JIN MOONSOO M [US], et al); | [XP]US2010331192 (ZHA DONGXING [US], et al) | by applicant | US4816397 | US4952496 | US5168062 | US5225539 | US5385839 | US5530101 | US5693489 | US5869320 | US7029872 | US2006211085 | US7198921 | WO2007061631 | US7259007 | US2009163379 | WO2009111183 | - D.N. Glover, DNA Cloning: A Practical Approach, (19850000), vol. I and II | - BENOIST et al., Nature, (19810000), vol. 290, pages 304 - 310 | - YAMAMOTO et al., Cell, (19800000), vol. 22, pages 787 - 797 | - WAGNER et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19810000), vol. 78, pages 1441 - 1445 | - BRINSTER et al., Nature, (19820000), vol. 296, pages 39 - 42 | - VILLA-KOMAROFF et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19780000), vol. 75, pages 3727 - 3731 | - DEBOER et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19830000), vol. 80, pages 21 - 25 | - Scientific American, (19800000), vol. 242, pages 74 - 94 | - PHILLIPS et al., J. Bacteriol., (19840000), vol. 159, page 283 | - LEAHY et al., Science, (19920000), vol. 258, page 987 | - DAVANLOO, P. et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19840000), vol. 81, pages 2035 - 2039 | - STUDIER, F. W. et al., J. Mol. Biol., (19860000), vol. 189, pages 113 - 130 | - ROSENBERG, A. H. et al., Gene, (19870000), vol. 56, pages 125 - 135 | - DUNN, J. J. et al., Gene, (19880000), vol. 68, page 259 |