EP2648985 - CARTON WITH EXPANDABLE PANEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 25.10.2013 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.10.2013 | Withdrawal of application | published on 27.11.2013 [2013/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Graphic Packaging International, Inc. Law Department - 9th Floor 1500 Riveredge Parkway, Suite 100 Atlanta, Georgia 30328 / US | [2013/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SPIVEY, Raymond, R., Sr. 475 Ivey Court Mableton, GA 30126 / US | [2013/42] | Representative(s) | Grättinger Möhring von Poschinger Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Wittelsbacherstrasse 2b 82319 Starnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/42] | Grättinger Möhring von Poschinger Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Wittelsbacherstrasse 2b 82319 Starnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 11846091.4 | 07.12.2011 | WO2011US63629 | Priority number, date | US20100459294P | 10.12.2010 Original published format: US 459294 P | [2013/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012078700 | Date: | 14.06.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/24] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2648985 | Date: | 16.10.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.06.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 07.09.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B65D5/72, B65D71/34, B65D5/54 | [2013/42] | CPC: |
B65D71/36 (EP,US);
B65D2571/00141 (EP,US);
B65D2571/0045 (EP,US);
B65D2571/00549 (EP,US);
B65D2571/0058 (EP,US);
B65D2571/00611 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/42] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KARTON MIT EXPANDIERBARER PLATTE | [2013/42] | English: | CARTON WITH EXPANDABLE PANEL | [2013/42] | French: | BOÎTE PLIANTE COMPRENANT UN PANNEAU EXTENSIBLE | [2013/42] | Entry into regional phase | 21.06.2013 | National basic fee paid | 21.06.2013 | Search fee paid | 21.06.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.06.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.06.2013 | Examination requested [2013/42] | 15.10.2013 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2013/48] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JP2008545596 (PHILIP MORRIS PRODUCTS S.A.); | [A]KR19980056170U (NONGSIM CORP); | [A]JP2004018010 (DAIO SEISHI KK); | [A]JP2001192016 (KOJIMA KK) |