EP2652258 - DOWNHOLE FLUID FLOW CONTROL SYSTEM AND METHOD HAVING DIRECTION DEPENDENT FLOW RESISTANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.06.2018 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.06.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.07.2018 [2018/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. 2601 E. Beltline Road Carrollton, TX 75006 / US | [2013/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LOPEZ, Jean-marc 7308 Stoddard Ln. Plano, TX 75025 / US | [2013/43] | Representative(s) | Bennett, Adrian Robert J., et al AA Thornton IP LLP 8th Floor, 125 Old Broad Street London EC2N 1AR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/43] | Bennett, Adrian Robert J., et al A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 11847917.9 | 28.11.2011 | WO2011US62190 | Priority number, date | US20100966772 | 13.12.2010 Original published format: US 966772 | [2013/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012082343 | Date: | 21.06.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/25] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2652258 | Date: | 23.10.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.06.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 04.10.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.06.2017 | Classification | IPC: | E21B43/12 | [2013/43] | CPC: |
E21B43/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/43] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG EINES BOHRLOCHFLÜSSIGKEITSFLUSSES MIT RICHTUNGSABHÄNGIGEM STRÖMUNGSWIDERSTAND | [2013/43] | English: | DOWNHOLE FLUID FLOW CONTROL SYSTEM AND METHOD HAVING DIRECTION DEPENDENT FLOW RESISTANCE | [2013/43] | French: | SYSTÈME DE COMMANDE DE L'ÉCOULEMENT D'UN FLUIDE DE FORAGE ET PROCÉDÉ AYANT UNE RÉSISTANCE À L'ÉCOULEMENT QUI DÉPEND DU SENS | [2013/43] | Entry into regional phase | 20.05.2013 | National basic fee paid | 20.05.2013 | Search fee paid | 20.05.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.05.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.05.2013 | Examination requested [2013/43] | 25.09.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.01.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/28] | 16.02.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2017 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2009205834 (GARCIA LUIS A [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4-6,10,11,14 * paragraph [0022]; figures 3-5 * * sentence 1, paragraph 23 * * sentence 1, paragraph 25 * * paragraphs [0007] , [0028] , [0031] , [0 34] *; | [XI]US2007169942 (LORETZ IVES [US], et al) [X] 1,2,14 * paragraphs [0023] , [0025] , [0038] , [0040] , [0043]; figures 1-7 * [I] 4-6,10,11; | [XA]US2009078428 (ALI MOHAMMAD ATHAR [SA]) [X] 1 * figures 1-4 * [A] 2-15 | International search | [Y]US2007169942 (LORETZ IVES [US], et al); | [Y]US3850190 (CARLSON D); | [Y]US3712321 (BAUER A); | [A]US2009205834 (GARCIA LUIS A [US], et al); | [A]US4418721 (HOLMES ALLEN B [US]) |