EP2652256 - WELL SCREENS HAVING ENHANCED WELL TREATMENT CAPABILITIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.01.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. 10200 Bellaire Boulevard Houston, TX 77072 / US | [2015/11] |
Former [2013/43] | For all designated states Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. 10200 Bellaire Blvd. Houston, TX 77072 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FITZPATRICK, Harvey, J., Jr 10200 Bellaire Boulevard Houston, TX 77072 / US | [2013/43] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2015/11] |
Former [2013/43] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11848612.5 | 06.12.2011 | WO2011US63517 | Priority number, date | US20100966162 | 13.12.2010 Original published format: US 966162 | [2013/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012082468 | Date: | 21.06.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/25] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2652256 | Date: | 23.10.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.06.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2652256 | Date: | 11.03.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 13.09.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.04.2014 | Classification | IPC: | E21B43/08, E21B43/02, E21B43/10 | [2014/19] | CPC: |
E21B43/108 (EP,US);
E21B43/025 (EP,US);
E21B43/08 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2013/43] | E21B43/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/43] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BOHRLOCHSIEBE MIT VERBESSERTEN BOHRLOCHBEHANDLUNGSEIGENSCHAFTEN | [2013/43] | English: | WELL SCREENS HAVING ENHANCED WELL TREATMENT CAPABILITIES | [2013/43] | French: | CRIBLES DE PUITS À CAPACITÉS DE TRAITEMENT DE PUITS AMÉLIORÉES | [2013/43] | Entry into regional phase | 13.06.2013 | National basic fee paid | 13.06.2013 | Search fee paid | 13.06.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.06.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.06.2013 | Examination requested [2013/43] | 16.05.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.10.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.01.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 29.01.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.01.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP14153426.3 / EP2730739 | EP14153427.1 / EP2728110 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.10.2014 | Opposition(s) | 14.12.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.12.2011 | AL | 11.03.2015 | AT | 11.03.2015 | BE | 11.03.2015 | BG | 11.03.2015 | CY | 11.03.2015 | CZ | 11.03.2015 | DK | 11.03.2015 | EE | 11.03.2015 | ES | 11.03.2015 | FI | 11.03.2015 | HR | 11.03.2015 | IT | 11.03.2015 | LT | 11.03.2015 | LV | 11.03.2015 | MC | 11.03.2015 | MK | 11.03.2015 | MT | 11.03.2015 | NL | 11.03.2015 | PL | 11.03.2015 | RO | 11.03.2015 | RS | 11.03.2015 | SE | 11.03.2015 | SI | 11.03.2015 | SK | 11.03.2015 | SM | 11.03.2015 | TR | 11.03.2015 | GR | 12.06.2015 | IS | 11.07.2015 | PT | 13.07.2015 | IE | 06.12.2015 | LU | 06.12.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 06.12.2011 | |
AT | 11.03.2015 | ||
BE | 11.03.2015 | ||
BG | 11.03.2015 | ||
CY | 11.03.2015 | ||
CZ | 11.03.2015 | ||
DK | 11.03.2015 | ||
EE | 11.03.2015 | ||
ES | 11.03.2015 | ||
FI | 11.03.2015 | ||
HR | 11.03.2015 | ||
IT | 11.03.2015 | ||
LT | 11.03.2015 | ||
LV | 11.03.2015 | ||
MC | 11.03.2015 | ||
MK | 11.03.2015 | ||
MT | 11.03.2015 | ||
NL | 11.03.2015 | ||
PL | 11.03.2015 | ||
RO | 11.03.2015 | ||
RS | 11.03.2015 | ||
SE | 11.03.2015 | ||
SI | 11.03.2015 | ||
SK | 11.03.2015 | ||
SM | 11.03.2015 | ||
TR | 11.03.2015 | ||
GR | 12.06.2015 | ||
IS | 11.07.2015 | ||
PT | 13.07.2015 | ||
IE | 06.12.2015 | ||
LU | 06.12.2015 | ||
Former [2017/39] | HU | 06.12.2011 | |
AT | 11.03.2015 | ||
BE | 11.03.2015 | ||
BG | 11.03.2015 | ||
CY | 11.03.2015 | ||
CZ | 11.03.2015 | ||
DK | 11.03.2015 | ||
EE | 11.03.2015 | ||
ES | 11.03.2015 | ||
FI | 11.03.2015 | ||
HR | 11.03.2015 | ||
IT | 11.03.2015 | ||
LT | 11.03.2015 | ||
LV | 11.03.2015 | ||
MC | 11.03.2015 | ||
MT | 11.03.2015 | ||
NL | 11.03.2015 | ||
PL | 11.03.2015 | ||
RO | 11.03.2015 | ||
RS | 11.03.2015 | ||
SE | 11.03.2015 | ||
SI | 11.03.2015 | ||
SK | 11.03.2015 | ||
SM | 11.03.2015 | ||
GR | 12.06.2015 | ||
IS | 11.07.2015 | ||
PT | 13.07.2015 | ||
IE | 06.12.2015 | ||
LU | 06.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/45] | AT | 11.03.2015 | |
BE | 11.03.2015 | ||
CZ | 11.03.2015 | ||
DK | 11.03.2015 | ||
EE | 11.03.2015 | ||
ES | 11.03.2015 | ||
FI | 11.03.2015 | ||
HR | 11.03.2015 | ||
IT | 11.03.2015 | ||
LT | 11.03.2015 | ||
LV | 11.03.2015 | ||
MC | 11.03.2015 | ||
NL | 11.03.2015 | ||
PL | 11.03.2015 | ||
RO | 11.03.2015 | ||
RS | 11.03.2015 | ||
SE | 11.03.2015 | ||
SI | 11.03.2015 | ||
SK | 11.03.2015 | ||
GR | 12.06.2015 | ||
IS | 11.07.2015 | ||
PT | 13.07.2015 | ||
IE | 06.12.2015 | ||
LU | 06.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/37] | AT | 11.03.2015 | |
BE | 11.03.2015 | ||
CZ | 11.03.2015 | ||
DK | 11.03.2015 | ||
EE | 11.03.2015 | ||
ES | 11.03.2015 | ||
FI | 11.03.2015 | ||
HR | 11.03.2015 | ||
IT | 11.03.2015 | ||
LT | 11.03.2015 | ||
LV | 11.03.2015 | ||
MC | 11.03.2015 | ||
NL | 11.03.2015 | ||
PL | 11.03.2015 | ||
RO | 11.03.2015 | ||
RS | 11.03.2015 | ||
SE | 11.03.2015 | ||
SI | 11.03.2015 | ||
SK | 11.03.2015 | ||
GR | 12.06.2015 | ||
IS | 11.07.2015 | ||
PT | 13.07.2015 | ||
LU | 06.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/34] | AT | 11.03.2015 | |
CZ | 11.03.2015 | ||
DK | 11.03.2015 | ||
EE | 11.03.2015 | ||
ES | 11.03.2015 | ||
FI | 11.03.2015 | ||
HR | 11.03.2015 | ||
IT | 11.03.2015 | ||
LT | 11.03.2015 | ||
LV | 11.03.2015 | ||
MC | 11.03.2015 | ||
NL | 11.03.2015 | ||
PL | 11.03.2015 | ||
RO | 11.03.2015 | ||
RS | 11.03.2015 | ||
SE | 11.03.2015 | ||
SI | 11.03.2015 | ||
SK | 11.03.2015 | ||
GR | 12.06.2015 | ||
IS | 11.07.2015 | ||
PT | 13.07.2015 | ||
LU | 06.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | AT | 11.03.2015 | |
CZ | 11.03.2015 | ||
DK | 11.03.2015 | ||
EE | 11.03.2015 | ||
ES | 11.03.2015 | ||
FI | 11.03.2015 | ||
HR | 11.03.2015 | ||
IT | 11.03.2015 | ||
LT | 11.03.2015 | ||
LV | 11.03.2015 | ||
MC | 11.03.2015 | ||
NL | 11.03.2015 | ||
PL | 11.03.2015 | ||
RO | 11.03.2015 | ||
RS | 11.03.2015 | ||
SE | 11.03.2015 | ||
SI | 11.03.2015 | ||
SK | 11.03.2015 | ||
GR | 12.06.2015 | ||
IS | 11.07.2015 | ||
PT | 13.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 11.03.2015 | |
CZ | 11.03.2015 | ||
DK | 11.03.2015 | ||
EE | 11.03.2015 | ||
ES | 11.03.2015 | ||
FI | 11.03.2015 | ||
HR | 11.03.2015 | ||
IT | 11.03.2015 | ||
LT | 11.03.2015 | ||
LV | 11.03.2015 | ||
NL | 11.03.2015 | ||
PL | 11.03.2015 | ||
RO | 11.03.2015 | ||
RS | 11.03.2015 | ||
SE | 11.03.2015 | ||
SI | 11.03.2015 | ||
SK | 11.03.2015 | ||
GR | 12.06.2015 | ||
IS | 11.07.2015 | ||
PT | 13.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | AT | 11.03.2015 | |
CZ | 11.03.2015 | ||
DK | 11.03.2015 | ||
EE | 11.03.2015 | ||
ES | 11.03.2015 | ||
FI | 11.03.2015 | ||
HR | 11.03.2015 | ||
IT | 11.03.2015 | ||
LT | 11.03.2015 | ||
LV | 11.03.2015 | ||
NL | 11.03.2015 | ||
PL | 11.03.2015 | ||
RO | 11.03.2015 | ||
RS | 11.03.2015 | ||
SE | 11.03.2015 | ||
SK | 11.03.2015 | ||
GR | 12.06.2015 | ||
IS | 11.07.2015 | ||
PT | 13.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/03] | AT | 11.03.2015 | |
CZ | 11.03.2015 | ||
EE | 11.03.2015 | ||
ES | 11.03.2015 | ||
FI | 11.03.2015 | ||
HR | 11.03.2015 | ||
IT | 11.03.2015 | ||
LT | 11.03.2015 | ||
LV | 11.03.2015 | ||
NL | 11.03.2015 | ||
PL | 11.03.2015 | ||
RO | 11.03.2015 | ||
RS | 11.03.2015 | ||
SE | 11.03.2015 | ||
SK | 11.03.2015 | ||
GR | 12.06.2015 | ||
IS | 11.07.2015 | ||
PT | 13.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/51] | AT | 11.03.2015 | |
CZ | 11.03.2015 | ||
EE | 11.03.2015 | ||
ES | 11.03.2015 | ||
FI | 11.03.2015 | ||
HR | 11.03.2015 | ||
LT | 11.03.2015 | ||
LV | 11.03.2015 | ||
NL | 11.03.2015 | ||
PL | 11.03.2015 | ||
RO | 11.03.2015 | ||
RS | 11.03.2015 | ||
SE | 11.03.2015 | ||
SK | 11.03.2015 | ||
GR | 12.06.2015 | ||
IS | 11.07.2015 | ||
PT | 13.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | CZ | 11.03.2015 | |
EE | 11.03.2015 | ||
ES | 11.03.2015 | ||
FI | 11.03.2015 | ||
HR | 11.03.2015 | ||
LT | 11.03.2015 | ||
LV | 11.03.2015 | ||
NL | 11.03.2015 | ||
PL | 11.03.2015 | ||
RO | 11.03.2015 | ||
RS | 11.03.2015 | ||
SE | 11.03.2015 | ||
SK | 11.03.2015 | ||
GR | 12.06.2015 | ||
IS | 11.07.2015 | ||
PT | 13.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | CZ | 11.03.2015 | |
EE | 11.03.2015 | ||
ES | 11.03.2015 | ||
FI | 11.03.2015 | ||
HR | 11.03.2015 | ||
LT | 11.03.2015 | ||
LV | 11.03.2015 | ||
NL | 11.03.2015 | ||
RO | 11.03.2015 | ||
RS | 11.03.2015 | ||
SE | 11.03.2015 | ||
SK | 11.03.2015 | ||
GR | 12.06.2015 | ||
PT | 13.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/41] | ES | 11.03.2015 | |
FI | 11.03.2015 | ||
HR | 11.03.2015 | ||
LT | 11.03.2015 | ||
LV | 11.03.2015 | ||
NL | 11.03.2015 | ||
RS | 11.03.2015 | ||
SE | 11.03.2015 | ||
GR | 12.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | ES | 11.03.2015 | |
FI | 11.03.2015 | ||
HR | 11.03.2015 | ||
LT | 11.03.2015 | ||
LV | 11.03.2015 | ||
RS | 11.03.2015 | ||
SE | 11.03.2015 | ||
GR | 12.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | ES | 11.03.2015 | |
FI | 11.03.2015 | ||
HR | 11.03.2015 | ||
LT | 11.03.2015 | ||
SE | 11.03.2015 | ||
GR | 12.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | ES | 11.03.2015 | |
FI | 11.03.2015 | ||
HR | 11.03.2015 | ||
LT | 11.03.2015 | ||
SE | 11.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | ES | 11.03.2015 | |
LT | 11.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/33] | ES | 11.03.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2010025150 (HALLIBURTON ENERGY SERV INC [US], et al) [X] 8,12,13,15 * paragraphs [0062] - [0067] *; | [A]WO0208562 (SINVENT AS [NO], et al) [A] 1-7 * page 3, lines 2-22 *; | [A]US4202411 (SHARP KEITH W [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * column 3, lines 27-68 * * column 5, line 33 - column 6, line 68 *; | [A]WO2006130748 (BAKER HUGHES INC [US], et al) [A] 1 * paragraph [0014] *; | [A]US2005065037 (CONSTIEN VERNON GEORGE [US]) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0033] - [9945] * | International search | [X]US2005065037 (CONSTIEN VERNON GEORGE [US]); | [Y]WO9717524 (SHELL INT RESEARCH [NL], et al); | [A]US6527051 (REDDY BAIREDDY R [US], et al); | [A]US2009065206 (RUSSELL THANE GEOFFREY [CA]) | by applicant | WO0208562 | WO2006130748 | WO2010025150 | US7360593 | US6831044 | US6394185 | GB2365043 |