EP2653032 - METHOD FOR ASSEMBLING AND TRANSPORTING SQUARE AND CIRCULAR CAGE-RAFTS USED FOR FARMING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2013/43] | METHOD FOR ASSEMBLING AND TRANSPORTING SQUARE AND CIRCULAR CAGE-RAFTS USED FOR FARMING AND POLYETHYLENE FLOTATION SYSTEM FOR SUPPORTING RIGID AQUATIC STRUCTURES | ||
[2016/47] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.09.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.09.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.10.2017 [2017/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ecosea Farming S.A. Quillota 175 oficina 513 Puerto Montt / CL | [2013/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HURTADO FERREIRA, Carlos Felipe Quillota 175 oficina 513 Puerto Montt / CL | 02 /
SÁNCHEZ RACCARO, Rodrigo Quillota 175 oficina 513 Puerto Montt / CL | 03 /
SUAZO FUENTEALBA, Gonzalo Quillota 175 oficina 513 Puerto Montt / CL | [2013/43] | Representative(s) | Carvajal y Urquijo, Isabel, et al Clarke, Modet & Co. Suero de Quiñones, 34-36 28002 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2013/43] | Carvajal y Urquijo, Isabel, et al Clarke, Modet & Co. c/ Goya, 11 28001 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 11849693.4 | 13.12.2011 | WO2011CL00077 | Priority number, date | CL201014462010 | 16.12.2010 Original published format: CL 14462010 | [2013/43] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012079186 | Date: | 21.06.2012 | Language: | ES | [2012/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2653032 | Date: | 23.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | ES | 21.06.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.11.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A01K61/00 | [2013/43] | CPC: |
A01K61/60 (EP);
A01K61/10 (KR);
Y02A40/81 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/43] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM SAMMELN UND TRANSPORTIEREN QUADRATISCHER UND KREISFÖRMIGER KÄFIGFLÖSSE ZUR VERWENDUNG IN DER LANDWIRTSCHAFT | [2016/47] | English: | METHOD FOR ASSEMBLING AND TRANSPORTING SQUARE AND CIRCULAR CAGE-RAFTS USED FOR FARMING | [2016/47] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR L'ARMEMENT ET LE TRANSPORT DE RADEAUX-CAISSONS RIGIDES DE FORME CARRÉE OU CIRCULAIRE UTILISÉS POUR L'ÉLEVAGE | [2016/47] |
Former [2013/43] | VERFAHREN ZUM SAMMELN UND TRANSPORTIEREN QUADRATISCHER UND KREISFÖRMIGER KÄFIGFLÖSSE ZUR VERWENDUNG IN DER LANDWIRTSCHAFT UND POLYETHYLEN-SCHWIMMSYSTEM ZUR UNTERSTÜTZUNG VON STARREN STRUKTUREN ZU WASSER | ||
Former [2013/43] | METHOD FOR ASSEMBLING AND TRANSPORTING SQUARE AND CIRCULAR CAGE-RAFTS USED FOR FARMING AND POLYETHYLENE FLOTATION SYSTEM FOR SUPPORTING RIGID AQUATIC STRUCTURES | ||
Former [2013/43] | PROCÉDÉ POUR L'ARMEMENT ET LE TRANSPORT DE RADEAUX-CAISSONS RIGIDES DE FORME CARRÉE OU CIRCULAIRE UTILISÉS POUR L'ÉLEVAGE ET SYSTÈME DE FLOTTAISON EN POLYÉTHYLÈNE SERVANT À SOUTENIR DES STRUCTURES AQUATIQUES RIGIDES | Entry into regional phase | 14.06.2013 | Translation filed | 14.06.2013 | National basic fee paid | 14.06.2013 | Search fee paid | 14.06.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.06.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.06.2013 | Examination requested [2013/43] | 30.05.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.02.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.06.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.04.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/42] | 24.05.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2017/42] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.02.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4920921 (OCHS GORDON M [US]) [A] 1-13 * column 2, line 58 - column 2, line 61 * * column 4, line 57 - column 5, line 2 * * column 6, line 3 - column 6, line 32 * * figures 2, 7, 8 *; | [XI]US5299530 (MUKADAM HASHAM [US], et al) [X] 9,12 * column 5, line 22 - column 5, line 25 * * column 6, line 13 - column 6, line 22 * * column 6, line 40 - column 6, line 42 * * column 11, line 23 - column 11, line 26 * * column 13, line 41 - column 13, line 44 * * figures 1, 18 * [I] 13; | [A]US6386146 (KNOTT SR JAMES M [US]) [A] 1-13 * column 2, line 22 - column 2, line 59 * * column 3, line 2 - column 3, line 4 * * column 3, line 28 - column 3, line 33 * * column 3, line 56 - column 4, line 5 * * claim 2 * * figures 1, 2, 6 *; | [A]US2006162667 (PAPADOYIANIS ERNEST D [US], et al) [A] 9-13 * paragraphs [0011] , [ 0042] - [0044] ** figures 1, 8 *; | [I]WO2009115361 (BEKAERT SA NV [BE], et al) [I] 1,2,4,5,7 * paragraphs [0007] , [ 0012] , [ 0023] , [ 0025] , [ 0036] , [ 0039] , [ 0042] , [ 0043] * * claims 13-15 * * figures 2, 3 *; | [A]US2010050952 (STILLMAN HAROLD M [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * paragraphs [0005] , [ 0016] , [ 0033] , [ 0036] , [ 0039] * * figures 1, 3, 5 *; | [X]WO2010128494 (SUNADIM BUDIPRAWIRA [ID]) [X] 9 * claim 1 * * figures 1, 4 * | International search | [A]US5549076 (KAARSTAD CHARLES [NO]); | [A]WO9832330 (AQUACULTURE TECHNOLOGIES INTER [AU], et al); | [A]WO2006004415 (FOSEN SEAFARMING SYSTEMS AS [NO], et al); | [A]WO2007031352 (BEKAERT SA NV [BE], et al); | [A]CA2669265 (ASHIMORI IND CO LTD [JP]); | [A]WO2010128494 (SUNADIM BUDIPRAWIRA [ID]) |