Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2657810 | Global Dossier | 22.01.2014 | A4 | EP2657810 | 30.10.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2011CN84595 | 24.12.2011 | CN201010622069 | 24.12.2010 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2012083886 | Global Dossier | 28.06.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN201010622069 | 24.12.2010 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102541286B | Global Dossier | 16.09.2015 | B | CN102541286 | 04.07.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | CN201010622069 | 24.12.2010 |