EP2657810 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CONSTRUCTING ORGANIC CHEMISTRY STRUCTURAL FORMULA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.07.2016 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.08.2016 [2016/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Peking University Founder Group Co., Ltd 5 Floor, Zhongguancun Founder Building No. 298 Chengfu Road Haidian District Beijing 100871 / CN | For all designated states Beijing Founder Electronics Co., Ltd. Founder Building No. 9, Shangdiwu Street Haidian District, Beijing 100085 / CN | For all designated states Peking University Founder R&D Center 4 Floor ZhongGuanCun Founder Building No.298 ChengFu Rd. HaiDian District Beijing 100871 / CN | [2013/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHAO, Zhigang Founder Building No. 9 Shangdiwu Street Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | [2013/44] | Representative(s) | HGF 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/44] | Harrison Goddard Foote LLP Belgrave Hall Belgrave Street Leeds LS2 8DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 11850662.5 | 24.12.2011 | WO2011CN84595 | Priority number, date | CN201010622069 | 24.12.2010 Original published format: CN201010622069 | [2013/44] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012083886 | Date: | 28.06.2012 | Language: | ZH | [2012/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2657810 | Date: | 30.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 28.06.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.01.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/023, G06F17/21, G06F19/00 | [2014/04] | CPC: |
G06T11/206 (EP);
G06F40/111 (EP);
G16C20/80 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2013/44] | G06F3/023 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/44] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ERSTELLUNG VON STRUKTURFORMELN AUS DER ORGANISCHEN CHEMIE | [2013/44] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CONSTRUCTING ORGANIC CHEMISTRY STRUCTURAL FORMULA | [2013/44] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE CONSTRUCTION DE FORMULE STRUCTURALE DE CHIMIE ORGANIQUE | [2013/44] | Entry into regional phase | 19.07.2013 | Translation filed | 19.07.2013 | National basic fee paid | 19.07.2013 | Search fee paid | 19.07.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.07.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.07.2013 | Examination requested [2013/44] | 18.07.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.10.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.02.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/31] | 17.03.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/31] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.10.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2015 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2007092842 (ABACALAB INC [US], et al) [X] 1,7 * page 5, line 29 - page 6, line 15 * * page 10, line 24 - page 11, line 14 * [I] 1-10; | [X]WO0213066 (CAMBRIDGESOFT CORP [US]) [X] 1,7 * page 3, line 18 - page 4, line 21 *; | [XP]US2011072339 (BOYER STEPHEN K [US], et al) [XP] 1,7 * the whole document * | International search | [A]CN1164698 (CHEN YONGBO [CN]); | [A]CN101261540 (BAOZHANG ZHAO [CN]) | [X] - CAI, WENSHENG ET AL., "2-D Graph Input Method for Organic Structures", CHEMISTRY, (199212), no. 12 |