|
13.06.2019 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.08.2018 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.07.2018 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.06.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.06.2018 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.06.2018 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.06.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.02.2018 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.02.2018 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
26.02.2018 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.02.2018 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
55 |
|
26.02.2018 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
55 |
|
31.01.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.01.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.01.2018 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
43 |
|
31.01.2018 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.01.2018 |
Description |
Search / examination |
43 |
|
31.01.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.01.2018 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.10.2017 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
13.10.2017 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.09.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.09.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.09.2017 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.09.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.09.2017 |
Letter filed before dispatch of the 1st communication from the Examining Division(examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.09.2017 |
Letter filed before dispatch of the 1st communication from the Examining Division(examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.09.2017 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
29.05.2017 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
29.05.2017 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.05.2017 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.03.2017 |
Notification regarding date of start of examination with possibility to withdraw |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.12.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.12.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.12.2015 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.12.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.12.2015 |
Letter filed before dispatch of the 1st communication from the Examining Division(examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.07.2015 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.07.2015 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.07.2015 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.06.2015 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.12.2014 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.10.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.10.2014 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.10.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.10.2014 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
24.10.2014 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.10.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.04.2014 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.04.2014 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.04.2014 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
03.04.2014 |
Supplementary European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.03.2014 |
Search started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.10.2013 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.07.2013 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.07.2013 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.07.2013 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.07.2013 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.07.2013 |
Translation of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
11.07.2013 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
28.06.2013 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.06.2013 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.06.2013 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
21.06.2013 |
Description |
Search / examination |
42 |
|
21.06.2013 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
21.06.2013 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.06.2013 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
06.05.2013 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.07.2012 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
26 |
|
17.07.2012 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
22 |
|
17.07.2012 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
17.07.2012 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
28 |
|
28.06.2012 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.06.2012 |
Copy of the translated international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.06.2012 |
International publication pamphlet |
Search / examination |
39 |