EP2657375 - SEED MATERIAL FOR LIQUID PHASE EPITAXIAL GROWTH OF MONOCRYSTALLINE SILICON CARBIDE, AND METHOD FOR LIQUID PHASE EPITAXIAL GROWTH OF MONOCRYSTALLINE SILICON CARBIDE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.06.2019 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.07.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.02.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toyo Tanso Co., Ltd. 5-7-12, Takeshima Nishiyodogawa-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 555-0011 / JP | [2013/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TORIMI, Satoshi c/o TOYO TANSO CO. LTD. 2181-2 Nakahime Ohnohara-cho Kanonji-shi, Kagawa 769-1612 / JP | 02 /
NOGAMI, Satoru c/o TOYO TANSO CO., LTD. 2181-2, Nakahime Ohnohara-cho Kanonji-shi, Kagawa 769-1612 / JP | 03 /
MATSUMOTO, Tsuyoshi c/o TOYO TANSO CO., LTD. 2181-2, Nakahime Ohnohara-cho Kanonji-shi, Kagawa 769-1612 / JP | [2018/32] |
Former [2013/44] | 01 /
TORIMI, Satoshi c/o TOYO TANSO CO. LTD. 2181-2 Nakahime Ohnohara-cho Kanonji-shi, Kagawa 769-1612 / JP | ||
02 /
NOGAMI, Satoru c/o TOYO TANSO CO. LTD. 2181-2 Nakahime Ohnohara-cho Kanonji-shi, Kagawa 769-1612 / JP | |||
03 /
MATSUMOTO, Tsuyoshi c/o TOYO TANSO CO. LTD. 2181-2 Nakahime Ohnohara-cho Kanonji-shi, Kagawa 769-1612 / JP | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Nymphenburger Straße 4 80335 München / DE | [2018/32] |
Former [2013/44] | Aechter, Bernd Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Mauerkircherstraße 45 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11850722.7 | 29.06.2011 | [2018/32] | WO2011JP64876 | Priority number, date | JP20100288467 | 24.12.2010 Original published format: JP 2010288467 | JP20100288470 | 24.12.2010 Original published format: JP 2010288470 | JP20100288473 | 24.12.2010 Original published format: JP 2010288473 | JP20100288477 | 24.12.2010 Original published format: JP 2010288477 | [2013/44] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012086238 | Date: | 28.06.2012 | Language: | JA | [2012/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2657375 | Date: | 30.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2657375 | Date: | 08.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 28.06.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.04.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C30B29/36, C30B19/12, C30B28/14 | [2014/19] | CPC: |
C30B19/12 (EP,KR,US);
C30B28/14 (EP,US);
C30B29/36 (EP,KR,US);
H01L21/20 (KR);
Y10T428/26 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2013/44] | C30B29/36, C30B19/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/44] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KRISTALLISATIONSKEIM ZUR FLÜSSIGPHASENEPITAXIE VON MONOKRISTALLINEM SILICIUMCARBID UND VERFAHREN ZUR FLÜSSIGPHASENEPITAXIE VON MONOKRISTALLINEM SILICIUMCARBID | [2018/12] | English: | SEED MATERIAL FOR LIQUID PHASE EPITAXIAL GROWTH OF MONOCRYSTALLINE SILICON CARBIDE, AND METHOD FOR LIQUID PHASE EPITAXIAL GROWTH OF MONOCRYSTALLINE SILICON CARBIDE | [2013/44] | French: | SUBSTANCE DE GERME POUR CROISSANCE ÉPITAXIALE EN PHASE LIQUIDE DU CARBURE DE SILICIUM MONOCRISTALLIN, ET PROCÉDÉ DE CROISSANCE ÉPITAXIALE EN PHASE LIQUIDE DU CARBURE DE SILICIUM MONOCRISTALLIN | [2013/44] |
Former [2013/44] | SAMENMATERIAL ZUR FLÜSSIGPHASENEPITAXIE VON MONOKRISTALLINEM SILICIUMCARBID UND VERFAHREN ZUR FLÜSSIGPHASENEPITAXIE VON MONOKRISTALLINEM SILICIUMCARBID | Entry into regional phase | 21.06.2013 | Translation filed | 21.06.2013 | National basic fee paid | 21.06.2013 | Search fee paid | 21.06.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.06.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.06.2013 | Examination requested [2013/44] | 24.10.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.05.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.09.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.10.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.01.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.02.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.06.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 05.06.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.06.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.05.2017 | Opposition(s) | 09.05.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.06.2011 | AL | 08.08.2018 | AT | 08.08.2018 | CY | 08.08.2018 | CZ | 08.08.2018 | DK | 08.08.2018 | EE | 08.08.2018 | ES | 08.08.2018 | FI | 08.08.2018 | HR | 08.08.2018 | LT | 08.08.2018 | LV | 08.08.2018 | MC | 08.08.2018 | MK | 08.08.2018 | MT | 08.08.2018 | NL | 08.08.2018 | PL | 08.08.2018 | RO | 08.08.2018 | RS | 08.08.2018 | SI | 08.08.2018 | SK | 08.08.2018 | SM | 08.08.2018 | TR | 08.08.2018 | BG | 08.11.2018 | NO | 08.11.2018 | GR | 09.11.2018 | IS | 08.12.2018 | PT | 08.12.2018 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 29.06.2011 | |
AL | 08.08.2018 | ||
AT | 08.08.2018 | ||
CY | 08.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
DK | 08.08.2018 | ||
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
ES | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
MC | 08.08.2018 | ||
MT | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
RS | 08.08.2018 | ||
SI | 08.08.2018 | ||
SK | 08.08.2018 | ||
SM | 08.08.2018 | ||
TR | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
PT | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 29.06.2011 | |
AL | 08.08.2018 | ||
AT | 08.08.2018 | ||
CY | 08.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
DK | 08.08.2018 | ||
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
ES | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
MC | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
RS | 08.08.2018 | ||
SI | 08.08.2018 | ||
SK | 08.08.2018 | ||
SM | 08.08.2018 | ||
TR | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
PT | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 08.08.2018 | |
AT | 08.08.2018 | ||
CY | 08.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
DK | 08.08.2018 | ||
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
ES | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
MC | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
RS | 08.08.2018 | ||
SI | 08.08.2018 | ||
SK | 08.08.2018 | ||
SM | 08.08.2018 | ||
TR | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
PT | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 08.08.2018 | |
AT | 08.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
DK | 08.08.2018 | ||
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
ES | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
MC | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
RS | 08.08.2018 | ||
SI | 08.08.2018 | ||
SK | 08.08.2018 | ||
SM | 08.08.2018 | ||
TR | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
PT | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 08.08.2018 | |
AT | 08.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
DK | 08.08.2018 | ||
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
ES | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
MC | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
RS | 08.08.2018 | ||
SI | 08.08.2018 | ||
SK | 08.08.2018 | ||
SM | 08.08.2018 | ||
TR | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 08.08.2018 | |
AT | 08.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
DK | 08.08.2018 | ||
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
ES | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
MC | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
RS | 08.08.2018 | ||
SI | 08.08.2018 | ||
SK | 08.08.2018 | ||
SM | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 08.08.2018 | |
AT | 08.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
DK | 08.08.2018 | ||
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
ES | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
RS | 08.08.2018 | ||
SI | 08.08.2018 | ||
SK | 08.08.2018 | ||
SM | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 08.08.2018 | |
AT | 08.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
DK | 08.08.2018 | ||
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
ES | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
RS | 08.08.2018 | ||
SK | 08.08.2018 | ||
SM | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AL | 08.08.2018 | |
AT | 08.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
ES | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
RS | 08.08.2018 | ||
SK | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/22] | AL | 08.08.2018 | |
AT | 08.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
RS | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 08.08.2018 | |
AT | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RS | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | AT | 08.08.2018 | |
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RS | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 08.08.2018 | |
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RS | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | FI | 08.08.2018 | |
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 08.08.2018 | |
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 08.08.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS55144499 (SHARP KK) [X] 1-3,7-12 * page 502, column 1, paragraph 1; figure 3 *; | [A]US5879450 (LEE SHUIT TONG [HK], et al) [A] 1* example 2 *; | [X] - CHINONE Y ET AL, "APPLICATIONS OF HIGH PURITY SIC PREPARED BY CHEMICAL VAPOR DEPOSITION", SPRINGER PROCEEDINGS IN PHYSICS, SPRINGER VERLAG, BERLIN, DE, (19890101), vol. 43, ISSN 0930-8989, pages 198 - 206, XP000617080 [X] 1-11 * abstract * | [X] - GEORGE V C ET AL, "Bias enhanced deposition of highly oriented beta-SiC thin films using low pressure hot filament chemical vapour deposition technique", THIN SOLID FILMS, ELSEVIER-SEQUOIA S.A. LAUSANNE, CH, (20021101), vol. 419, no. 1-2, doi:10.1016/S0040-6090(02)00789-7, ISSN 0040-6090, pages 114 - 117, XP004391117 [X] 1-3,7-9,11 * page 116, column 1, paragraph 2; figures 1,3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0040-6090(02)00789-7 | International search | [A]JPH0455397 (MITSUI SHIPBUILDING ENG); | [A]JP2000044398 (TOYOTA CENTRAL RES & DEV, et al); | [A]JP2000160343 (TOYO TANSO CO); | [A]JP2001107239 (TOKYO ELECTRON LTD, et al); | [A] - S. R. NISHITANI ET AL., "Metastable solvent epitaxy of SiC", JOURNAL OF CRYSTAL GROWTH, (2008), vol. 310, pages 1815 - 1818, XP022587697 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jcrysgro.2007.11.234 | [A] - A. J. STECKL ET AL., "Characterization of 3C-SiC crystals grown by thermal decomposition of methyltrichlorosilane", APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS, (19961216), vol. 69, no. 25, pages 3824 - 3826, XP000643667 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.117117 | by applicant | JP2005097040 | JP2005132711 | JP2008230946 |