EP2659968 - Use of a particulate combustion catalyst and a particulate filter, production methods therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2013/45] | PARTICULATE COMBUSTION CATALYST, PRODUCTION METHOD THEREFOR, PARTICULATE FILTER AND PRODUCTION METHOD THEREFOR | ||
[2015/22] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.09.2016 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUI MINING & SMELTING CO., LTD. 1-11-1, Osaki Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-8584 / JP | [2015/46] |
Former [2013/45] | For all designated states MITSUI MINING & SMELTING CO., LTD. 11-1, Osaki 1-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-8584 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOGAWA, Takahiro c/o Catalysts Strategic Division MITSUI MINING & SMELTING CO., LTD. 1013-1, Ageoshimo Ageo-shi Saitama 362-0025 / JP | 02 /
ABE, Akira c/o Catalysts Strategic Division MITSUI MINING & SMELTING CO., LTD. 1013-1, Ageoshimo Ageo-shi Saitama 362-0025 / JP | [2013/45] | Representative(s) | Dossmann, Gérard Casalonga & Partners Bayerstrasse 71-73 80335 München / DE | [2013/45] | Application number, filing date | 11852234.1 | 20.10.2011 | [2015/47] | WO2011JP74188 | Priority number, date | JP20100291099 | 27.12.2010 Original published format: JP 2010291099 | [2013/45] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012090577 | Date: | 05.07.2012 | Language: | JA | [2012/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2659968 | Date: | 06.11.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2659968 | Date: | 18.11.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 05.07.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.05.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B01J23/66, B01D53/94, B01J35/10, F01N3/021, F01N3/023, F01N3/035, F01N3/24, F01N3/28 | [2013/45] | CPC: |
B01J21/04 (EP);
B01D53/944 (EP);
B01J23/44 (EP);
B01J23/50 (EP);
B01J23/63 (EP);
B01J23/66 (EP);
B01J35/647 (EP);
B01D2255/1023 (EP);
B01D2255/104 (EP);
B01D2255/2063 (EP);
B01D2258/012 (EP);
B01J35/651 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/45] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verwendung eines teilchenförmigen Verbrennungskatalysators und eines Partikelfilters, Herstellungsverfahren dafür | [2015/22] | English: | Use of a particulate combustion catalyst and a particulate filter, production methods therefor | [2015/22] | French: | Utilisation d'un catalyseur de combustion particulaire et d'un filtre particulaire, les procédés de production de ceux-ci | [2015/22] |
Former [2013/45] | TEILCHENFÖRMIGER VERBRENNUNGSKATALYSATOR, HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR, PARTIKELFILTER UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | ||
Former [2013/45] | PARTICULATE COMBUSTION CATALYST, PRODUCTION METHOD THEREFOR, PARTICULATE FILTER AND PRODUCTION METHOD THEREFOR | ||
Former [2013/45] | CATALYSEUR DE COMBUSTION PARTICULAIRE, PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE CELUI-CI, FILTRE PARTICULAIRE ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE CELUI-CI | Entry into regional phase | 17.07.2013 | Translation filed | 17.07.2013 | National basic fee paid | 17.07.2013 | Search fee paid | 17.07.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.07.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.07.2013 | Examination requested [2013/45] | 12.12.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.06.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.10.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 02.10.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.10.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.06.2015 | Opposition(s) | 19.08.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.10.2011 | AL | 18.11.2015 | AT | 18.11.2015 | BG | 18.11.2015 | CY | 18.11.2015 | CZ | 18.11.2015 | DK | 18.11.2015 | EE | 18.11.2015 | FI | 18.11.2015 | HR | 18.11.2015 | LT | 18.11.2015 | LV | 18.11.2015 | MC | 18.11.2015 | MK | 18.11.2015 | NL | 18.11.2015 | PL | 18.11.2015 | RO | 18.11.2015 | RS | 18.11.2015 | SI | 18.11.2015 | SK | 18.11.2015 | SM | 18.11.2015 | TR | 18.11.2015 | NO | 18.02.2016 | GR | 19.02.2016 | IS | 18.03.2016 | PT | 18.03.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/45] | HU | 20.10.2011 | |
AT | 18.11.2015 | ||
BG | 18.11.2015 | ||
CY | 18.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2015 | ||
DK | 18.11.2015 | ||
EE | 18.11.2015 | ||
FI | 18.11.2015 | ||
HR | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LV | 18.11.2015 | ||
MC | 18.11.2015 | ||
MK | 18.11.2015 | ||
NL | 18.11.2015 | ||
PL | 18.11.2015 | ||
RO | 18.11.2015 | ||
RS | 18.11.2015 | ||
SI | 18.11.2015 | ||
SK | 18.11.2015 | ||
SM | 18.11.2015 | ||
TR | 18.11.2015 | ||
NO | 18.02.2016 | ||
GR | 19.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
PT | 18.03.2016 | ||
Former [2018/38] | HU | 20.10.2011 | |
AT | 18.11.2015 | ||
BG | 18.11.2015 | ||
CY | 18.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2015 | ||
DK | 18.11.2015 | ||
EE | 18.11.2015 | ||
FI | 18.11.2015 | ||
HR | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LV | 18.11.2015 | ||
MC | 18.11.2015 | ||
MK | 18.11.2015 | ||
NL | 18.11.2015 | ||
PL | 18.11.2015 | ||
RO | 18.11.2015 | ||
RS | 18.11.2015 | ||
SI | 18.11.2015 | ||
SK | 18.11.2015 | ||
SM | 18.11.2015 | ||
NO | 18.02.2016 | ||
GR | 19.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
PT | 18.03.2016 | ||
Former [2018/31] | HU | 20.10.2011 | |
AT | 18.11.2015 | ||
CY | 18.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2015 | ||
DK | 18.11.2015 | ||
EE | 18.11.2015 | ||
FI | 18.11.2015 | ||
HR | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LV | 18.11.2015 | ||
MC | 18.11.2015 | ||
MK | 18.11.2015 | ||
NL | 18.11.2015 | ||
PL | 18.11.2015 | ||
RO | 18.11.2015 | ||
RS | 18.11.2015 | ||
SI | 18.11.2015 | ||
SK | 18.11.2015 | ||
SM | 18.11.2015 | ||
NO | 18.02.2016 | ||
GR | 19.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
PT | 18.03.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 20.10.2011 | |
AT | 18.11.2015 | ||
CY | 18.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2015 | ||
DK | 18.11.2015 | ||
EE | 18.11.2015 | ||
FI | 18.11.2015 | ||
HR | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LV | 18.11.2015 | ||
MC | 18.11.2015 | ||
MK | 18.11.2015 | ||
NL | 18.11.2015 | ||
PL | 18.11.2015 | ||
RO | 18.11.2015 | ||
RS | 18.11.2015 | ||
SI | 18.11.2015 | ||
SK | 18.11.2015 | ||
SM | 18.11.2015 | ||
NO | 18.02.2016 | ||
GR | 19.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
PT | 18.03.2016 | ||
Former [2017/40] | AT | 18.11.2015 | |
CZ | 18.11.2015 | ||
DK | 18.11.2015 | ||
EE | 18.11.2015 | ||
FI | 18.11.2015 | ||
HR | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LV | 18.11.2015 | ||
MC | 18.11.2015 | ||
NL | 18.11.2015 | ||
PL | 18.11.2015 | ||
RO | 18.11.2015 | ||
RS | 18.11.2015 | ||
SI | 18.11.2015 | ||
SK | 18.11.2015 | ||
SM | 18.11.2015 | ||
NO | 18.02.2016 | ||
GR | 19.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
PT | 18.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 18.11.2015 | |
CZ | 18.11.2015 | ||
DK | 18.11.2015 | ||
EE | 18.11.2015 | ||
FI | 18.11.2015 | ||
HR | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LV | 18.11.2015 | ||
NL | 18.11.2015 | ||
PL | 18.11.2015 | ||
RO | 18.11.2015 | ||
RS | 18.11.2015 | ||
SI | 18.11.2015 | ||
SK | 18.11.2015 | ||
SM | 18.11.2015 | ||
NO | 18.02.2016 | ||
GR | 19.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
PT | 18.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 18.11.2015 | |
CZ | 18.11.2015 | ||
DK | 18.11.2015 | ||
EE | 18.11.2015 | ||
FI | 18.11.2015 | ||
HR | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LV | 18.11.2015 | ||
NL | 18.11.2015 | ||
PL | 18.11.2015 | ||
RO | 18.11.2015 | ||
RS | 18.11.2015 | ||
SK | 18.11.2015 | ||
SM | 18.11.2015 | ||
NO | 18.02.2016 | ||
GR | 19.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
PT | 18.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | AT | 18.11.2015 | |
CZ | 18.11.2015 | ||
EE | 18.11.2015 | ||
FI | 18.11.2015 | ||
HR | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LV | 18.11.2015 | ||
NL | 18.11.2015 | ||
PL | 18.11.2015 | ||
RO | 18.11.2015 | ||
RS | 18.11.2015 | ||
SK | 18.11.2015 | ||
SM | 18.11.2015 | ||
NO | 18.02.2016 | ||
GR | 19.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
PT | 18.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 18.11.2015 | |
CZ | 18.11.2015 | ||
EE | 18.11.2015 | ||
FI | 18.11.2015 | ||
HR | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LV | 18.11.2015 | ||
NL | 18.11.2015 | ||
PL | 18.11.2015 | ||
RO | 18.11.2015 | ||
RS | 18.11.2015 | ||
SK | 18.11.2015 | ||
NO | 18.02.2016 | ||
GR | 19.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
PT | 18.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/34] | AT | 18.11.2015 | |
CZ | 18.11.2015 | ||
FI | 18.11.2015 | ||
HR | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LV | 18.11.2015 | ||
NL | 18.11.2015 | ||
PL | 18.11.2015 | ||
RS | 18.11.2015 | ||
NO | 18.02.2016 | ||
GR | 19.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
PT | 18.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 18.11.2015 | |
FI | 18.11.2015 | ||
HR | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LV | 18.11.2015 | ||
NL | 18.11.2015 | ||
PL | 18.11.2015 | ||
RS | 18.11.2015 | ||
NO | 18.02.2016 | ||
GR | 19.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
PT | 18.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 18.11.2015 | |
FI | 18.11.2015 | ||
HR | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
NL | 18.11.2015 | ||
PL | 18.11.2015 | ||
RS | 18.11.2015 | ||
NO | 18.02.2016 | ||
GR | 19.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
PT | 18.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | HR | 18.11.2015 | |
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
NL | 18.11.2015 | ||
RS | 18.11.2015 | ||
NO | 18.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/22] | LT | 18.11.2015 | |
NL | 18.11.2015 | ||
NO | 18.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | LT | 18.11.2015 | |
NO | 18.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/20] | LT | 18.11.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0222497 (GEN MOTORS CORP [US]) [A] 1-6 * page 1, line 2 - line 11 * * page 3, line 15 - line 29 * * page 5, line 23 - line 26 * * page 6, line 1 - line 6 * * page 6, line 21 - line 25 * * example * * page 9, line 10 - line 28 * * page 11, line 9 - page 12, line 14 * * figures 1, 2, 4 * * claims 1-3 *; | [A]US6511642 (HATANAKA MIHO [JP], et al) [A] 1-6 * column 1, line 9 - line 15 * * column 1, line 20 - line 21 * * column 1, line 28 - line 43 * * column 3, line 60 - column 4, line 6 * * column 4, line 41 - line 49 * * column 4, line 66 - column 5, line 7 * * column 5, line 16 - line 22 * * column 7, line 3 - line 9 * * column 9, line 44 - column 10, line 22 * * column 17, line 50 - column 18, line 30 * * column 20, line 66 - column 21, line 46 * * column 53, line 49 - line 63 * * tables 1-17 * * example 2-8 * * claims 1-11, 26-32, 42-50, 57, 58, 60, 61 *; | [Y]EP1985353 (N E CHEMCAT CORP [JP]) [Y] 1-6 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0038] * * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0042] * * paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0045] * * paragraph [0049] - paragraph [0067] * * paragraph [0072] * * example 1 * * claims 1-15 *; | [XYI] - PERSSON K ET AL, "Influence of co-metals on bimetallic palladium catalysts for methane combustion", JOURNAL OF CATALYSIS, ACADEMIC PRESS, DULUTH, MN, US, (20050401), vol. 231, no. 1, doi:10.1016/J.JCAT.2005.01.001, ISSN 0021-9517, pages 139 - 150, XP004803506 [X] 1,2 * abstract * * 2.1. Catalyst preparation; page 140 * * tables 1, 2 * * figures 1, 2, 4, 5, 8, 9, 12 * * 5. Conclusions * [Y] 1-6 [I] 3-6 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jcat.2005.01.001 | [Y] - Sasol Germany Gmbh, "Sasol Germany GmbH PURALOX /CATALOX High purity activated aluminas", (20030101), URL: http://www.sasoltechdata.com/tds/ALUCLOX.pdf, (20140519), XP055118776 [Y] 1,2,4 * page 8 * | [A] - HONG HE ET AL, "Novel Pd promoted Ag/Al2O3 catalyst for the selective reduction of NOx", APPLIED CATALYSIS. B, ENVIRONMENTAL, (20031101), vol. 46, no. 2, doi:10.1016/S0926-3373(03)00242-X, ISSN 0926-3373, pages 365 - 370, XP055118784 [A] 1-6 * abstract * * 2.1. Catalyst preparation * * 2.2. Catalytic tests * * 3.1. Activity measurements * * figure 1 * * 4. Conclusion * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0926-3373(03)00242-X | International search | [A]JP2002346386 (IBIDEN CO LTD); | [A]JP2004057949 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP); | [A]JP2005007360 (TOKYO YOGYO KK, et al); | [A]WO2007043442 (MITSUI MINING & SMELTING CO [JP], et al) | by applicant | JPH1047035 | JP3012249B | JP2003334443 | JP2004058013 | JP4144898B |