EP2661031 - METHOD AND MOBILE TERMINAL FOR IMPROVING ANTENNA MATCHING PERFORMANCE OF MULTI-BAND MOBILE TERMINAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.11.2018 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.11.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.12.2018 [2018/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ST-Ericsson Semiconductor (Beijing) Co., Ltd. Unit 1908, Building 3 Block 1, No. 19 Xinjiekouwai Street Haidian District Beijing 100088 / CN | [2013/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHANG, Shifang 10/F, Tower B North Star Century Center No. 8 Bei Chen West Road Chaoyang District Beijing 100101 / CN | 02 /
LI, Jishui Longyueyuan 4 Zone, Huilongguan Changping District Beijing 102208 / CN | [2013/45] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/45] | Ström & Gulliksson AB P.O. Box 793 220 07 Lund / SE | Application number, filing date | 11852518.7 | 29.12.2011 | WO2011CN84891 | Priority number, date | CN201010623664 | 30.12.2010 Original published format: CN201010623664 | [2013/45] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012089138 | Date: | 05.07.2012 | Language: | ZH | [2012/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2661031 | Date: | 06.11.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 05.07.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.05.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H04L25/02, H04B1/40 | [2014/28] | CPC: |
H04B1/0053 (EP,US);
H04W88/06 (US);
H04B1/0458 (EP,US);
H04B1/18 (EP,US);
H04B1/40 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2013/45] | H04L25/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/45] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND MOBILES ENDGERÄT ZUR VERBESSERUNG EINER ANTENNENANPASSUNGSLEISTUNG EINES MOBILEN MEHRBAND-ENDGERÄTES | [2013/45] | English: | METHOD AND MOBILE TERMINAL FOR IMPROVING ANTENNA MATCHING PERFORMANCE OF MULTI-BAND MOBILE TERMINAL | [2013/45] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET TERMINAL MOBILE POUR AMÉLIORER LES PERFORMANCES D'ADAPTATION D'ANTENNE D'UN TERMINAL MOBILE MULTI-BANDE | [2013/45] | Entry into regional phase | 19.07.2013 | Translation filed | 19.07.2013 | National basic fee paid | 19.07.2013 | Search fee paid | 19.07.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.07.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.07.2013 | Examination requested [2013/45] | 27.11.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.07.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.11.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.07.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/51] | 13.08.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/51] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.07.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5564086 (CYGAN LAWRENCE F [US], et al) [Y] 3-6,9,10 * the whole document *; | [XY]WO03047035 (QUALCOMM INC [US]) [X] 1,2,7,8 * abstract * * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0031]; figures 1,2; claims 1-6 * [Y] 3-6,9,10; | [XA]KR20040092127 (PANTECH CO LTD) [X] 1,2,7,8 * abstract *[A] 3-6,9,10; | [XA]CN200990608Y (YINGHUADA SHANGHAI ELECTRONIC [CN]) [X] 1,2,7,8 * the whole document * [A] 3-6,9,10; | [XA]CN101562460 (HUIZHOU TCL MOBILE COMM CO LTD [CN]) [X] 1,2,7,8 * the whole document * [A] 3-6,9,10 | International search | [A]WO02054538 (CIT ALCATEL [FR], et al); | [X]CN200990608Y (YINGHUADA SHANGHAI ELECTRONIC [CN]); | [A]CN201388196Y (ZTE CORP); | [XP]CN102122969 (ST ERICSSON SEMICONDUCTOR BEIJING CO LTD) |