EP2659491 - PROTON ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 10.05.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.07.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.05.2024 | Refusal of application | published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ross, Owen Venmore 32 Ozone Avenue Venice, CA 90291 / US | [2013/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2013/45] | Representative(s) | Engstle, Verena, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Bankgasse 3 90402 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/45] | Rupprecht, Kay, et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Widenmayerstraße 47-50 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11852655.7 | 27.12.2011 | WO2011US67340 | Priority number, date | US201061460364P | 30.12.2010 Original published format: US 201061460364 P | US201113336976 | 23.12.2011 Original published format: US201113336976 | [2013/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012092243 | Date: | 05.07.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/27] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2659491 | Date: | 06.11.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.07.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 27.09.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.01.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G21G1/10, G21G7/00, H02N11/00 | [2018/09] | CPC: |
G21G7/00 (EP,US);
G21G1/10 (KR);
H02N11/002 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2013/45] | G21G1/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/45] | Extension states | BA | 30.07.2013 | ME | 30.07.2013 | Title | German: | PROTONENMOTOR | [2013/45] | English: | PROTON ENGINE | [2013/45] | French: | MOTEUR À PROTONS | [2013/45] | Entry into regional phase | 30.07.2013 | National basic fee paid | 30.07.2013 | Search fee paid | 30.07.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.07.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.10.2012 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 30.07.2013 | Examination requested [2013/45] | 02.10.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 11.12.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.07.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.01.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.01.2024 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2024/24] | 26.01.2024 | Date of oral proceedings | 02.02.2024 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 05.02.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2024/24] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.07.2020 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 11.12.2018 | Request for further processing filed | 11.12.2018 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 02.01.2019 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to indicate the wish to proceed further with the application | 11.12.2018 | Request for further processing filed | 11.12.2018 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 02.01.2019 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 30.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2014 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   22.05.2015 | 31.12.2017 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   28.06.2018 | 31.12.2018 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   24.06.2019 | 31.12.2019 | 09   M06   Fee paid on   29.06.2020 | 31.12.2020 | 10   M06   Fee paid on   29.06.2021 | 31.12.2022 | 12   M06   Fee paid on   30.06.2023 | 31.12.2023 | 13   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2004059662 (TAHAN CHRISTIAN A [US]) [A] 1-8,10-22 * abstract *; | [A] - G G Pavlov ET AL, "Coulomb deceleration of fast protons in a strong magnetic field", USSR Academy of Sciences Zh. Eksp. Toor. Fiz, (19760303), pages 753 - 767, URL: http://www.jetp.ac.ru/cgi-bin/dn/e_043_03_0389.pdf, (20170928), XP055411111 [A] 1-8,10-22 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]US3266019 (BECKWITH HOWARD W); | [Y]US6158384 (YE YAN [US], et al); | [Y]US2002090054 (SOGARD MICHAEL [US]); | [Y]US2004104519 (CHEN HANCUN [US], et al); | [Y]US2005249324 (MEACHAM GEORGE B K [US]); | [Y]US2006267503 (BYSTRISKII VITALY [US], et al); | [X]US2007133733 (POPA-SIMIL LIVIU [US]); | [Y]US7547861 (JORGENSEN MORTEN [US]) |