EP2659297 - MULTI-PASS OPTICAL APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.07.2020 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.10.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ASML Netherlands B.V. De Run 6501 5504 DR Veldhoven / NL | [2015/50] |
Former [2015/34] | For all designated states ASML Netherlands BV De Run 6501 5504 DR Veldhoven / NL | ||
Former [2015/21] | For all designated states Cymer, LLC 17075 Thornmint Court San Diego, CA 92127-2413 / US | ||
Former [2013/45] | For all designated states Cymer, Inc. (a Nevada Corporation) 17075 Thornmint Court San Diego, CA 92127-2413 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SANDSTROM, Richard, L. 17075 Thornmint Court San Diego, CA 92127 / US | [2013/45] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/45] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11853061.7 | 25.10.2011 | WO2011US57717 | Priority number, date | US20100980939 | 29.12.2010 Original published format: US 980939 | [2013/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012091786 | Date: | 05.07.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2659297 | Date: | 06.11.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.07.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 05.07.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.09.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G02B5/08 | [2013/45] | CPC: |
G02B17/004 (EP,US);
G02B5/08 (KR);
G02B7/1815 (EP,US);
G02B7/1825 (EP,US);
H01S3/076 (EP,US);
H01S3/2325 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/45] | Title | German: | MEHRFLUTIGE OPTISCHE VORRICHTUNG | [2013/45] | English: | MULTI-PASS OPTICAL APPARATUS | [2013/45] | French: | APPAREIL OPTIQUE À PASSAGES MULTIPLES | [2013/45] | Entry into regional phase | 26.07.2013 | National basic fee paid | 26.07.2013 | Search fee paid | 26.07.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.07.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.07.2013 | Examination requested [2013/45] | 12.04.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.03.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.07.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.10.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.02.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/34] | 03.04.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2020/34] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.03.2019 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2007090278 (BOTMA HAKO [NL]) [X] 1-5,7,8,11-14 * paragraph [0037]; figure 2 *; | [X]US4156852 (HAGEN WILHELM F [US]) [X] 1,6,7,16 * figure 3 *; | [X]US2010195196 (NOWAK KRZYSZTOF [JP], et al) [X] 1-8,11-16 * figures 3,4,24 *; | [X]JP2006337861 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE) [X] 1,7,9,10 * paragraph [0018]; figure 1 * | International search | [Y]US5867329 (JUSTUS BRIAN L [US], et al); | [Y]US5751472 (JEYS THOMAS H [US], et al); | [Y]US4872179 (NITSCHE RAINER [DE], et al); | [A]US2010107733 (MIKLOS ANDRAS [DE], et al) |