EP2659661 - ELECTRONIC PHYSICAL ACCESS CONTROL WITH REMOTE AUTHENTICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.12.2017 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.12.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.01.2018 [2018/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schneider Electric Buildings LLC One High Street North Andover, MA 01845 / US | [2013/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DUBOIS, Richard, L., Jr. 40 Village Road Chester, NH 03036 / US | [2013/45] | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/45] | Zerbi, Guido Maria Murgitroyd & Company Piazza Borromeo, 12 20123 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 11853958.4 | 12.12.2011 | WO2011US64304 | Priority number, date | US20100982929 | 31.12.2010 Original published format: US 982929 | [2013/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012091888 | Date: | 05.07.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2659661 | Date: | 06.11.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.07.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 05.07.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.08.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H04M11/00, G07C9/00 | [2015/40] | CPC: |
G07C9/00571 (EP,US);
G07C9/00309 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2013/45] | H04M11/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/45] | Title | German: | ELEKTRONISCH-PHYSIKALISCHE ZUGANGSKONTROLLE MIT FERNAUTHENTIFIKATION | [2013/45] | English: | ELECTRONIC PHYSICAL ACCESS CONTROL WITH REMOTE AUTHENTICATION | [2013/45] | French: | COMMANDE D'ACCÈS PHYSIQUE ÉLECTRONIQUE AVEC AUTHENTIFICATION À DISTANCE | [2013/45] | Entry into regional phase | 02.07.2013 | National basic fee paid | 02.07.2013 | Search fee paid | 02.07.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.07.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.07.2013 | Examination requested [2013/45] | 16.03.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.07.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/01] | 23.08.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2018/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2016 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO2004077848 (GE INTERLOGIX INC [US], et al) [X] 1-5,8,9,12,13 * abstract * * page 2, line 8 - page 3, line 28 * * page 5, line 20 - page 11, line 22 * [Y] 6,7,10,11; | [Y]US2005241003 (SWEENEY KEVIN [US], et al) [Y] 6,7,10,11 * abstract * * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0024] *; | [A]US2007200665 (STUDERUS PAUL [CH]) [A] 1-13 * abstract * | International search | [X]US2004003073 (KRZYZANOWSKI PAUL [US], et al) |