EP2589819 - CENTRIFUGAL COMPRESSOR WITH SCROLL STRUCTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2013/19] | SCROLL STRUCTURE OF CENTRIFUGAL COMPRESSOR | ||
[2016/45] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.02.2018 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.03.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Heavy Industries, Ltd. 16-5, Konan 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8215 / JP | [2013/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOSHI, Toru C/O MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES LTD. 16-5 Konan 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8215 / JP | 02 /
TOMITA, Isao C/O MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES LTD. 16-5 Konan 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8215 / JP | 03 /
EBISU, Motoki C/O MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES LTD. 16-5 Konan 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8215 / JP | 04 /
SUZUKI, Hiroshi C/O MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES LTD. 16-5 Konan 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8215 / JP | 05 /
SHIRAISHI, Takashi C/O MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES LTD. 16-5 Konan 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8215 / JP | [2013/19] | Representative(s) | Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [2017/14] |
Former [2013/19] | Bongiovanni, Simone, et al Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 11854033.5 | 22.12.2011 | [2017/14] | WO2011JP79793 | Priority number, date | JP20100291362 | 27.12.2010 Original published format: JP 2010291362 | [2013/19] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012090853 | Date: | 05.07.2012 | Language: | JA | [2012/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2589819 | Date: | 08.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2589819 | Date: | 05.04.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 05.07.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.11.2014 | Classification | IPC: | F04D29/44, F04D29/68 | [2014/50] | CPC: |
F04D29/441 (EP,US);
F01D25/24 (US);
F04D29/681 (EP,US);
F05D2250/52 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2013/19] | F04D29/44 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/19] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZENTRIFUGALVERDICHTER MIT SPIRALGEHÄUSE | [2016/45] | English: | CENTRIFUGAL COMPRESSOR WITH SCROLL STRUCTURE | [2016/45] | French: | COMPRESSEUR CENTRIFUGE AVEC VOLUTE | [2016/45] |
Former [2013/19] | ROLLSTRUKTUR FÜR EINEN ZENTRIFUGALVERDICHTER | ||
Former [2013/19] | SCROLL STRUCTURE OF CENTRIFUGAL COMPRESSOR | ||
Former [2013/19] | STRUCTURE DE SPIRALE DE COMPRESSEUR CENTRIFUGE | Entry into regional phase | 30.01.2013 | Translation filed | 30.01.2013 | National basic fee paid | 30.01.2013 | Search fee paid | 30.01.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.01.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.01.2013 | Examination requested [2013/19] | 11.06.2013 | Observations by third parties | 19.05.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.10.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.02.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 17.02.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.02.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.10.2016 | Opposition(s) | 08.01.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.12.2011 | AL | 05.04.2017 | AT | 05.04.2017 | CY | 05.04.2017 | CZ | 05.04.2017 | DK | 05.04.2017 | EE | 05.04.2017 | ES | 05.04.2017 | FI | 05.04.2017 | HR | 05.04.2017 | IT | 05.04.2017 | LT | 05.04.2017 | LV | 05.04.2017 | MC | 05.04.2017 | MK | 05.04.2017 | PL | 05.04.2017 | PT | 05.04.2017 | RO | 05.04.2017 | RS | 05.04.2017 | SE | 05.04.2017 | SI | 05.04.2017 | SK | 05.04.2017 | SM | 05.04.2017 | TR | 05.04.2017 | BG | 05.07.2017 | NO | 05.07.2017 | GR | 06.07.2017 | IS | 05.08.2017 | IE | 22.12.2017 | LU | 22.12.2017 | MT | 22.12.2017 | BE | 31.12.2017 | CH | 31.12.2017 | LI | 31.12.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/27] | HU | 22.12.2011 | |
AT | 05.04.2017 | ||
CY | 05.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 05.04.2017 | ||
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
ES | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
MC | 05.04.2017 | ||
MK | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PT | 05.04.2017 | ||
RO | 05.04.2017 | ||
RS | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
SI | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
SM | 05.04.2017 | ||
TR | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
IE | 22.12.2017 | ||
LU | 22.12.2017 | ||
MT | 22.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
Former [2020/15] | HU | 22.12.2011 | |
AT | 05.04.2017 | ||
CY | 05.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 05.04.2017 | ||
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
ES | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
MC | 05.04.2017 | ||
MK | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RO | 05.04.2017 | ||
RS | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
SI | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
SM | 05.04.2017 | ||
TR | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
IE | 22.12.2017 | ||
LU | 22.12.2017 | ||
MT | 22.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 22.12.2011 | |
AT | 05.04.2017 | ||
CY | 05.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 05.04.2017 | ||
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
ES | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
MC | 05.04.2017 | ||
MK | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RO | 05.04.2017 | ||
RS | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
SI | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
SM | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
IE | 22.12.2017 | ||
LU | 22.12.2017 | ||
MT | 22.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 22.12.2011 | |
AT | 05.04.2017 | ||
CY | 05.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 05.04.2017 | ||
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
ES | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
MC | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RO | 05.04.2017 | ||
RS | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
SI | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
SM | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
IE | 22.12.2017 | ||
LU | 22.12.2017 | ||
MT | 22.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 22.12.2011 | |
AT | 05.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 05.04.2017 | ||
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
ES | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
MC | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RO | 05.04.2017 | ||
RS | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
SI | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
SM | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
IE | 22.12.2017 | ||
LU | 22.12.2017 | ||
MT | 22.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AT | 05.04.2017 | |
CZ | 05.04.2017 | ||
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
ES | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
MC | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RO | 05.04.2017 | ||
RS | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
SI | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
SM | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
IE | 22.12.2017 | ||
LU | 22.12.2017 | ||
MT | 22.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 05.04.2017 | |
CZ | 05.04.2017 | ||
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
ES | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RO | 05.04.2017 | ||
RS | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
SI | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
SM | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
IE | 22.12.2017 | ||
LU | 22.12.2017 | ||
MT | 22.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AT | 05.04.2017 | |
CZ | 05.04.2017 | ||
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
ES | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RO | 05.04.2017 | ||
RS | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
SI | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
SM | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
IE | 22.12.2017 | ||
LU | 22.12.2017 | ||
MT | 22.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/45] | AT | 05.04.2017 | |
CZ | 05.04.2017 | ||
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
ES | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RO | 05.04.2017 | ||
RS | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
SI | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
SM | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
IE | 22.12.2017 | ||
LU | 22.12.2017 | ||
MT | 22.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 05.04.2017 | |
CZ | 05.04.2017 | ||
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
ES | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RO | 05.04.2017 | ||
RS | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
SI | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
SM | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
LU | 22.12.2017 | ||
MT | 22.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/25] | AT | 05.04.2017 | |
CZ | 05.04.2017 | ||
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
ES | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RO | 05.04.2017 | ||
RS | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
SI | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
SM | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 05.04.2017 | |
CZ | 05.04.2017 | ||
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
ES | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RO | 05.04.2017 | ||
RS | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
SM | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 05.04.2017 | |
CZ | 05.04.2017 | ||
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
ES | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RO | 05.04.2017 | ||
RS | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | AT | 05.04.2017 | |
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
ES | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RS | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 05.04.2017 | |
ES | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RS | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 05.04.2017 | |
ES | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5624229 (KOTZUR JOACHIM [DE], et al) [A] 1-4 * figure 4 * * figure 5 * * column 3, line 16 - line 34 *; | [A]US6439839 (SONG SUNG BAE [KR], et al) [A] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [AD]JP2010209824 (IHI CORP) [AD] 1-4 * abstract * * figure 3 *; | [A]JP2010216378 (KOBE STEEL LTD) [A] 1-4 * abstract * * figure 1 * * figure 2 * * figure 3 * * figure 4 * * figure 5 * * figure 6 * * figure 7 *; | [A] - MISHINA H ET AL, "Performance Investigations of Large Capacity Centrifugal Compressors", ASME (AMERICAN SOCIETY OF MECHANICAL ENGINEERS), PETROLEUMDIVISION PUBLICATION, ASME, US, (19780101), pages 1 - 11, XP003031973 [A] 1-4 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1115/78-GT-3 | International search | [A]JPS60135696 (HITACHI LTD); | [A]JPH08503284 (MAN GUTEHOFFUNUNGSHUTTE AG.); | [A]JP2005240761 (JAPAN SERVO) | by applicant | JP2010209824 | other | - MISHINA H. ET AL, "Performance Investigations of Large Capacity Centrifugal Compressors", ASME (AMERICAN SOCIETY OF MECHANICAL ENGINEERS), PETROLEUMDIVISION PUBLICATION, (1978), pages 1 - 11, XP003031973 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1115/78-GT-3 |