|
19.06.2019 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.04.2019 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.04.2019 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's name |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
27.08.2018 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.07.2018 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
06.07.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.07.2018 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.07.2018 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
06.07.2018 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
08.03.2018 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.03.2018 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
08.03.2018 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.03.2018 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
08.03.2018 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
26.01.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.01.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
26.01.2018 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
26.01.2018 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
26.01.2018 |
Description |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
26.01.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.01.2018 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.09.2017 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
27.09.2017 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.09.2017 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.11.2016 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.11.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.11.2016 |
Deficiencies in an enquiry |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.11.2016 |
Enquiry as to the processing of the file |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.11.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.11.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.11.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.02.2016 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.01.2016 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.12.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.12.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.12.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.12.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.04.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.04.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.04.2014 |
Priority search results |
Search / examination |
48 |
|
11.04.2014 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.04.2014 |
Invitation to file a copy of search results(priority) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.03.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.03.2014 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.03.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.03.2014 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.03.2014 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.03.2014 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.03.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.12.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.12.2013 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.12.2013 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.11.2013 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.11.2013 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.11.2013 |
Supplementary European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.11.2013 |
Search started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.08.2013 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.08.2013 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.07.2013 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
10.07.2013 |
Reply by International Bureau |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.07.2013 |
Translation of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
26.06.2013 |
Enquiry with the International Bureau |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.06.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.06.2013 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.06.2013 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
07.06.2013 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
07.06.2013 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.06.2013 |
Description |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
07.06.2013 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.06.2013 |
Priority search results |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
07.06.2013 |
Priority search results |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
07.06.2013 |
Priority search results |
Search / examination |
28 |
|
07.06.2013 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
13.05.2013 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
25.07.2012 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
05.07.2012 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.07.2012 |
Copy of the translated international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.07.2012 |
International publication pamphlet |
Search / examination |
14 |