Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9871393 | Global Dossier | 16.01.2018 | B2 | US2013285599 | 31.10.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2011CN84680 | 26.12.2011 | CN201010624697 | 29.12.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101501965B | Global Dossier | 12.03.2015 | B1 | KR20130096312 | 29.08.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2011CN84680 | 26.12.2011 | CN201010624697 | 29.12.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2637247 | Global Dossier | 15.08.2018 | B1 | EP2637247 | 01.01.2014 | A4 | EP2637247 | 11.09.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2011CN84680 | 26.12.2011 | CN201010624697 | 29.12.2010 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2012089086 | Global Dossier | 05.07.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN201010624697 | 29.12.2010 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102122739B | Global Dossier | 26.06.2013 | B | CN102122739 | 13.07.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | CN201010624697 | 29.12.2010 |