EP2667258 - DEVELOPING ROLLER, DEVELOPING DEVICE, AND IMAGE FORMATION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.03.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.04.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shin-Etsu Polymer Co. Ltd. 1-9, Kanda-Sudacho Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-0041 / JP | [2013/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKEUCHI, Tomoharu c/o Shin-Etsu Polymer Co. Ltd. Kodama Plant 300-5 Aza-Toyohara Oaza-Motohara, Kamikawa-cho Kodama-gun, Saitama 367-0241 / JP | 02 /
OHKUBO, Taichi c/o Shin-Etsu Polymer Co. Ltd. Kodama Plant 300-5 Aza-Toyohara Oaza-Motohara, Kamikawa-cho Kodama-gun, Saitama 367-0241 / JP | [2013/48] | Representative(s) | Beckmann, Claus, et al Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [2014/41] |
Former [2014/38] | Adam, Holger, et al Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | ||
Former [2013/48] | Albrecht, Thomas Kraus & Weisert Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11856388.1 | 24.02.2011 | [2017/19] | WO2011JP01062 | Priority number, date | JP20110008528 | 19.01.2011 Original published format: JP 2011008528 | [2013/48] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012098590 | Date: | 26.07.2012 | Language: | JA | [2012/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2667258 | Date: | 27.11.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2667258 | Date: | 10.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 26.07.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.06.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G03G15/08, C09D5/24, C09D7/12, C09D175/04, C09D183/04, C09D201/06 | [2013/48] | CPC: |
C09D7/61 (EP,KR,US);
G03G15/0806 (KR,US);
C08G18/4238 (EP,KR,US);
C08G18/73 (EP,KR,US);
C08K3/04 (EP,KR,US);
C08L27/18 (EP,KR,US);
C09D175/04 (EP,KR,US);
C09D175/06 (EP,KR,US);
C09D5/24 (KR);
C09D7/65 (EP,KR,US);
G03G15/0818 (EP,KR,US);
C08K2201/001 (EP,US);
C08K3/36 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/48] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ENTWICKLUNGSWALZE, ENTWICKLUNGSVORRICHTUNG, UND BILDERZEUGUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2013/48] | English: | DEVELOPING ROLLER, DEVELOPING DEVICE, AND IMAGE FORMATION DEVICE | [2013/48] | French: | ROULEAU DE DÉVELOPPEMENT, DISPOSITIF DE DÉVELOPPEMENT ET DISPOSITIF DE FORMATION D'IMAGE | [2013/48] | Entry into regional phase | 13.08.2013 | Translation filed | 13.08.2013 | National basic fee paid | 13.08.2013 | Search fee paid | 13.08.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.08.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.08.2013 | Examination requested [2013/48] | 20.02.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.12.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.03.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 31.03.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.03.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.12.2016 | Opposition(s) | 13.02.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.02.2011 | AL | 10.05.2017 | AT | 10.05.2017 | CY | 10.05.2017 | CZ | 10.05.2017 | DK | 10.05.2017 | EE | 10.05.2017 | ES | 10.05.2017 | FI | 10.05.2017 | HR | 10.05.2017 | IT | 10.05.2017 | LT | 10.05.2017 | LV | 10.05.2017 | MC | 10.05.2017 | MK | 10.05.2017 | NL | 10.05.2017 | PL | 10.05.2017 | PT | 10.05.2017 | RO | 10.05.2017 | RS | 10.05.2017 | SE | 10.05.2017 | SI | 10.05.2017 | SK | 10.05.2017 | SM | 10.05.2017 | TR | 10.05.2017 | BG | 10.08.2017 | NO | 10.08.2017 | GR | 11.08.2017 | IS | 10.09.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 24.02.2011 | |
AT | 10.05.2017 | ||
CY | 10.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 10.05.2017 | ||
DK | 10.05.2017 | ||
EE | 10.05.2017 | ||
ES | 10.05.2017 | ||
FI | 10.05.2017 | ||
HR | 10.05.2017 | ||
IT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
MC | 10.05.2017 | ||
MK | 10.05.2017 | ||
NL | 10.05.2017 | ||
PL | 10.05.2017 | ||
PT | 10.05.2017 | ||
RO | 10.05.2017 | ||
RS | 10.05.2017 | ||
SE | 10.05.2017 | ||
SI | 10.05.2017 | ||
SK | 10.05.2017 | ||
SM | 10.05.2017 | ||
TR | 10.05.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
NO | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
Former [2020/27] | HU | 24.02.2011 | |
AT | 10.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 10.05.2017 | ||
DK | 10.05.2017 | ||
EE | 10.05.2017 | ||
ES | 10.05.2017 | ||
FI | 10.05.2017 | ||
HR | 10.05.2017 | ||
IT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
MC | 10.05.2017 | ||
NL | 10.05.2017 | ||
PL | 10.05.2017 | ||
PT | 10.05.2017 | ||
RO | 10.05.2017 | ||
RS | 10.05.2017 | ||
SE | 10.05.2017 | ||
SI | 10.05.2017 | ||
SK | 10.05.2017 | ||
SM | 10.05.2017 | ||
TR | 10.05.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
NO | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AT | 10.05.2017 | |
CZ | 10.05.2017 | ||
DK | 10.05.2017 | ||
EE | 10.05.2017 | ||
ES | 10.05.2017 | ||
FI | 10.05.2017 | ||
HR | 10.05.2017 | ||
IT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
MC | 10.05.2017 | ||
NL | 10.05.2017 | ||
PL | 10.05.2017 | ||
RO | 10.05.2017 | ||
RS | 10.05.2017 | ||
SE | 10.05.2017 | ||
SI | 10.05.2017 | ||
SK | 10.05.2017 | ||
SM | 10.05.2017 | ||
TR | 10.05.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
NO | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/44] | AT | 10.05.2017 | |
CZ | 10.05.2017 | ||
DK | 10.05.2017 | ||
EE | 10.05.2017 | ||
ES | 10.05.2017 | ||
FI | 10.05.2017 | ||
HR | 10.05.2017 | ||
IT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
MC | 10.05.2017 | ||
NL | 10.05.2017 | ||
PL | 10.05.2017 | ||
RO | 10.05.2017 | ||
RS | 10.05.2017 | ||
SE | 10.05.2017 | ||
SI | 10.05.2017 | ||
SK | 10.05.2017 | ||
SM | 10.05.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
NO | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/25] | AT | 10.05.2017 | |
CZ | 10.05.2017 | ||
DK | 10.05.2017 | ||
EE | 10.05.2017 | ||
ES | 10.05.2017 | ||
FI | 10.05.2017 | ||
HR | 10.05.2017 | ||
IT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
NL | 10.05.2017 | ||
PL | 10.05.2017 | ||
RO | 10.05.2017 | ||
RS | 10.05.2017 | ||
SE | 10.05.2017 | ||
SI | 10.05.2017 | ||
SK | 10.05.2017 | ||
SM | 10.05.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
NO | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 10.05.2017 | |
CZ | 10.05.2017 | ||
DK | 10.05.2017 | ||
EE | 10.05.2017 | ||
ES | 10.05.2017 | ||
FI | 10.05.2017 | ||
HR | 10.05.2017 | ||
IT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
NL | 10.05.2017 | ||
PL | 10.05.2017 | ||
RO | 10.05.2017 | ||
RS | 10.05.2017 | ||
SE | 10.05.2017 | ||
SK | 10.05.2017 | ||
SM | 10.05.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
NO | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 10.05.2017 | |
CZ | 10.05.2017 | ||
DK | 10.05.2017 | ||
EE | 10.05.2017 | ||
ES | 10.05.2017 | ||
FI | 10.05.2017 | ||
HR | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
NL | 10.05.2017 | ||
PL | 10.05.2017 | ||
RO | 10.05.2017 | ||
RS | 10.05.2017 | ||
SE | 10.05.2017 | ||
SK | 10.05.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
NO | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | AT | 10.05.2017 | |
DK | 10.05.2017 | ||
EE | 10.05.2017 | ||
ES | 10.05.2017 | ||
FI | 10.05.2017 | ||
HR | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
NL | 10.05.2017 | ||
PL | 10.05.2017 | ||
RS | 10.05.2017 | ||
SE | 10.05.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
NO | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | AT | 10.05.2017 | |
ES | 10.05.2017 | ||
FI | 10.05.2017 | ||
HR | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
NL | 10.05.2017 | ||
PL | 10.05.2017 | ||
RS | 10.05.2017 | ||
SE | 10.05.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
NO | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 10.05.2017 | |
ES | 10.05.2017 | ||
FI | 10.05.2017 | ||
HR | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
PL | 10.05.2017 | ||
RS | 10.05.2017 | ||
SE | 10.05.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
NO | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 10.05.2017 | |
ES | 10.05.2017 | ||
FI | 10.05.2017 | ||
HR | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
NO | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2010158564 (NAKAMURA MINORU [JP], et al) [A] 1-6* paragraphs [0007] - [0009] - [0031] , [0033] , [0040] , [0056] *; | [A]JP2010237445 (CANON KK) [A] 1-6 * abstract * * paragraphs [0006] , [0012] , [0013] , [0016] , [0018] , [0020] , [0024] - [0027] * | International search | [A]JPH04147166 (MITA INDUSTRIAL CO LTD); | [A]JP2002194278 (CANON CHEM INC); | [A]JP2010237445 (CANON KK) |