EP2665386 - HAIR STYLING IRON WITH TIMER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.12.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kenford Industrial Company Ltd Room 1106-1108, Riley House 88 Lei Muk Road, Kwai Chung New Territories, Hong Kong / CN | [2015/36] |
Former [2013/48] | For all designated states Kenford Industrial Co., Ltd. Room 1106-1108 Riley House 88 Lei Muk Road Kwai Chung New Territories Hong Kong / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LAM, Wai Ming Room 1106-1108 Riley House 88 Lei Muk Road Kwai Chung, New Territories Hong Kong / CN | 02 /
KEONG, Wai Ho Michael Room 1106-1108 Riley House 88 Lei Muk Road Kwai Chung, New Territories Hong Kong / CN | [2013/48] | Representative(s) | Stevenson-Hill, Jack Patrick, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 1 New York Street Manchester M1 4HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/19] | Stevenson-Hill, Jack Patrick, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 1 New York Street Manchester, M1 4HD / GB | ||
Former [2013/48] | Hall, Graeme Keith Marks & Clerk LLP 1 New York Street Manchester, M1 4HD / GB | Application number, filing date | 11856542.3 | 26.10.2011 | [2016/08] | WO2011CN81323 | Priority number, date | CN20112017359U | 18.01.2011 Original published format: CN 201120017359 U | [2013/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012097619 | Date: | 26.07.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2665386 | Date: | 27.11.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.07.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2665386 | Date: | 24.02.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 26.07.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.05.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A45D1/04, A45D1/28, A45D1/16 | [2014/23] | CPC: |
A45D1/04 (EP,GB,US);
A45D1/00 (US);
A45D1/16 (EP,US);
A45D1/28 (EP,GB,US);
A45D6/02 (US);
A45D6/04 (US)
|
Former IPC [2013/48] | A45D1/04, A45D1/28 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/48] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HAARGLÄTTEISEN MIT TIMER | [2013/48] | English: | HAIR STYLING IRON WITH TIMER | [2013/48] | French: | FER À COIFFER LES CHEVEUX AYANT UNE MINUTERIE | [2013/48] | Entry into regional phase | 16.08.2013 | National basic fee paid | 16.08.2013 | Search fee paid | 16.08.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.08.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.08.2013 | Examination requested [2013/48] | 19.01.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 30.03.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.08.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.12.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 14.12.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.12.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP16151589.5 / EP3025611 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.08.2015 | Opposition(s) | 25.11.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/05] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 30.03.2015 | Request for further processing filed | 30.03.2015 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 08.04.2015 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.10.2011 | AL | 24.02.2016 | AT | 24.02.2016 | BE | 24.02.2016 | CY | 24.02.2016 | CZ | 24.02.2016 | EE | 24.02.2016 | FI | 24.02.2016 | HR | 24.02.2016 | IS | 24.02.2016 | LT | 24.02.2016 | LV | 24.02.2016 | MC | 24.02.2016 | MK | 24.02.2016 | PL | 24.02.2016 | RO | 24.02.2016 | RS | 24.02.2016 | SE | 24.02.2016 | SI | 24.02.2016 | SK | 24.02.2016 | SM | 24.02.2016 | BG | 24.05.2016 | NO | 24.05.2016 | GR | 25.05.2016 | PT | 24.06.2016 | IE | 26.10.2016 | LU | 26.10.2016 | CH | 31.10.2016 | LI | 31.10.2016 | MT | 31.10.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 26.10.2011 | |
AT | 24.02.2016 | ||
BE | 24.02.2016 | ||
CY | 24.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2016 | ||
EE | 24.02.2016 | ||
FI | 24.02.2016 | ||
HR | 24.02.2016 | ||
IS | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LV | 24.02.2016 | ||
MC | 24.02.2016 | ||
MK | 24.02.2016 | ||
PL | 24.02.2016 | ||
RO | 24.02.2016 | ||
RS | 24.02.2016 | ||
SE | 24.02.2016 | ||
SI | 24.02.2016 | ||
SK | 24.02.2016 | ||
SM | 24.02.2016 | ||
BG | 24.05.2016 | ||
NO | 24.05.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
PT | 24.06.2016 | ||
IE | 26.10.2016 | ||
LU | 26.10.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
MT | 31.10.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 26.10.2011 | |
AT | 24.02.2016 | ||
BE | 24.02.2016 | ||
CY | 24.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2016 | ||
EE | 24.02.2016 | ||
FI | 24.02.2016 | ||
HR | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LV | 24.02.2016 | ||
MC | 24.02.2016 | ||
MK | 24.02.2016 | ||
PL | 24.02.2016 | ||
RO | 24.02.2016 | ||
RS | 24.02.2016 | ||
SE | 24.02.2016 | ||
SI | 24.02.2016 | ||
SK | 24.02.2016 | ||
SM | 24.02.2016 | ||
BG | 24.05.2016 | ||
NO | 24.05.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
PT | 24.06.2016 | ||
IE | 26.10.2016 | ||
LU | 26.10.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 24.02.2016 | |
BE | 24.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2016 | ||
EE | 24.02.2016 | ||
FI | 24.02.2016 | ||
HR | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LV | 24.02.2016 | ||
PL | 24.02.2016 | ||
RO | 24.02.2016 | ||
RS | 24.02.2016 | ||
SE | 24.02.2016 | ||
SI | 24.02.2016 | ||
SK | 24.02.2016 | ||
SM | 24.02.2016 | ||
BG | 24.05.2016 | ||
NO | 24.05.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
PT | 24.06.2016 | ||
IE | 26.10.2016 | ||
LU | 26.10.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/43] | AT | 24.02.2016 | |
BE | 24.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2016 | ||
EE | 24.02.2016 | ||
FI | 24.02.2016 | ||
HR | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LV | 24.02.2016 | ||
PL | 24.02.2016 | ||
RO | 24.02.2016 | ||
RS | 24.02.2016 | ||
SE | 24.02.2016 | ||
SI | 24.02.2016 | ||
SK | 24.02.2016 | ||
SM | 24.02.2016 | ||
BG | 24.05.2016 | ||
NO | 24.05.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
PT | 24.06.2016 | ||
LU | 26.10.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/16] | AT | 24.02.2016 | |
BE | 24.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2016 | ||
EE | 24.02.2016 | ||
FI | 24.02.2016 | ||
HR | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LV | 24.02.2016 | ||
PL | 24.02.2016 | ||
RO | 24.02.2016 | ||
RS | 24.02.2016 | ||
SE | 24.02.2016 | ||
SI | 24.02.2016 | ||
SK | 24.02.2016 | ||
SM | 24.02.2016 | ||
BG | 24.05.2016 | ||
NO | 24.05.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
PT | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 24.02.2016 | |
BE | 24.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2016 | ||
EE | 24.02.2016 | ||
FI | 24.02.2016 | ||
HR | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LV | 24.02.2016 | ||
PL | 24.02.2016 | ||
RO | 24.02.2016 | ||
RS | 24.02.2016 | ||
SE | 24.02.2016 | ||
SK | 24.02.2016 | ||
SM | 24.02.2016 | ||
NO | 24.05.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
PT | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 24.02.2016 | |
CZ | 24.02.2016 | ||
EE | 24.02.2016 | ||
FI | 24.02.2016 | ||
HR | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LV | 24.02.2016 | ||
PL | 24.02.2016 | ||
RO | 24.02.2016 | ||
RS | 24.02.2016 | ||
SE | 24.02.2016 | ||
SK | 24.02.2016 | ||
SM | 24.02.2016 | ||
NO | 24.05.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
PT | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 24.02.2016 | |
EE | 24.02.2016 | ||
FI | 24.02.2016 | ||
HR | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LV | 24.02.2016 | ||
PL | 24.02.2016 | ||
RS | 24.02.2016 | ||
SE | 24.02.2016 | ||
NO | 24.05.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
PT | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 24.02.2016 | |
FI | 24.02.2016 | ||
HR | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LV | 24.02.2016 | ||
PL | 24.02.2016 | ||
RS | 24.02.2016 | ||
SE | 24.02.2016 | ||
NO | 24.05.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
PT | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | AT | 24.02.2016 | |
FI | 24.02.2016 | ||
HR | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
PL | 24.02.2016 | ||
NO | 24.05.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
PT | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 24.02.2016 | |
FI | 24.02.2016 | ||
HR | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
PL | 24.02.2016 | ||
NO | 24.05.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | FI | 24.02.2016 | |
HR | 24.02.2016 | ||
NO | 24.05.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2005098192 (CAFARO MICHAEL [US]); | [Y]US2006191888 (CARLUCCI VITO J [US]); | [XYI]WO2008075384 (TENACTA GROUP SPA [IT], et al); | [Y]US2009126757 (MARINO CLAUDIO [US], et al) | International search | [A]US4968870 (MOON CHUI C [HK]); | [A]US5951894 (WHITE JR MARION O [US]); | [A]WO2005025367 (CONAIR [US], et al); | [A]CN2768540Y (HEJI INDUSTRY CO LTD [HK]); | [A]CN201025960Y (LIU HAIBIN CHEN ZHUOWEN [CN]) |