EP2670185 - THROUGHPUT ESTIMATION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.10.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.11.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.07.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [2013/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YOSHIDA, Hiroshi c/o NEC Corporation 7-1 Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [2013/49] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2019/52] |
Former [2013/49] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11857085.2 | 30.11.2011 | [2019/52] | WO2011JP06684 | Priority number, date | JP20110016232 | 28.01.2011 Original published format: JP 2011016232 | [2013/49] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012101709 | Date: | 02.08.2012 | Language: | JA | [2012/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2670185 | Date: | 04.12.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2670185 | Date: | 25.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 02.08.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.04.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H04W24/08, H04W28/06 | [2017/20] | CPC: |
H04W24/08 (EP,US);
H04W28/06 (US);
H04W24/10 (EP,US);
H04W28/22 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2013/49] | H04W24/08, H04W24/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/49] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DURCHSATZSCHÄTZVORRICHTUNG | [2013/49] | English: | THROUGHPUT ESTIMATION DEVICE | [2013/49] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ESTIMATION DE DÉBIT | [2013/49] | Entry into regional phase | 08.07.2013 | Translation filed | 07.08.2013 | National basic fee paid | 07.08.2013 | Search fee paid | 07.08.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.08.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.08.2013 | Examination requested [2013/49] | 16.08.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.07.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.11.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 18.11.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.11.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.07.2019 | Opposition(s) | 28.09.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.11.2011 | AL | 25.12.2019 | AT | 25.12.2019 | CY | 25.12.2019 | CZ | 25.12.2019 | DK | 25.12.2019 | EE | 25.12.2019 | ES | 25.12.2019 | FI | 25.12.2019 | HR | 25.12.2019 | IT | 25.12.2019 | LT | 25.12.2019 | LV | 25.12.2019 | MC | 25.12.2019 | MK | 25.12.2019 | MT | 25.12.2019 | NL | 25.12.2019 | PL | 25.12.2019 | RO | 25.12.2019 | RS | 25.12.2019 | SE | 25.12.2019 | SI | 25.12.2019 | SK | 25.12.2019 | SM | 25.12.2019 | TR | 25.12.2019 | BG | 25.03.2020 | NO | 25.03.2020 | GR | 26.03.2020 | IS | 25.04.2020 | PT | 20.05.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 30.11.2011 | |
AL | 25.12.2019 | ||
AT | 25.12.2019 | ||
CY | 25.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 25.12.2019 | ||
DK | 25.12.2019 | ||
EE | 25.12.2019 | ||
ES | 25.12.2019 | ||
FI | 25.12.2019 | ||
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
IT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
MC | 25.12.2019 | ||
MT | 25.12.2019 | ||
NL | 25.12.2019 | ||
PL | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
SI | 25.12.2019 | ||
SK | 25.12.2019 | ||
SM | 25.12.2019 | ||
TR | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
IS | 25.04.2020 | ||
PT | 20.05.2020 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 25.12.2019 | |
AT | 25.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 25.12.2019 | ||
DK | 25.12.2019 | ||
EE | 25.12.2019 | ||
ES | 25.12.2019 | ||
FI | 25.12.2019 | ||
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
IT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
MC | 25.12.2019 | ||
NL | 25.12.2019 | ||
PL | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
SI | 25.12.2019 | ||
SK | 25.12.2019 | ||
SM | 25.12.2019 | ||
TR | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
IS | 25.04.2020 | ||
PT | 20.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AL | 25.12.2019 | |
AT | 25.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 25.12.2019 | ||
DK | 25.12.2019 | ||
EE | 25.12.2019 | ||
ES | 25.12.2019 | ||
FI | 25.12.2019 | ||
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
IT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
MC | 25.12.2019 | ||
NL | 25.12.2019 | ||
PL | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
SI | 25.12.2019 | ||
SK | 25.12.2019 | ||
SM | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
IS | 25.04.2020 | ||
PT | 20.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 25.12.2019 | |
AT | 25.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 25.12.2019 | ||
DK | 25.12.2019 | ||
EE | 25.12.2019 | ||
ES | 25.12.2019 | ||
FI | 25.12.2019 | ||
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
IT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
NL | 25.12.2019 | ||
PL | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
SI | 25.12.2019 | ||
SK | 25.12.2019 | ||
SM | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
IS | 25.04.2020 | ||
PT | 20.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 25.12.2019 | |
CZ | 25.12.2019 | ||
DK | 25.12.2019 | ||
EE | 25.12.2019 | ||
ES | 25.12.2019 | ||
FI | 25.12.2019 | ||
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
NL | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
SI | 25.12.2019 | ||
SK | 25.12.2019 | ||
SM | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
IS | 25.04.2020 | ||
PT | 20.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | AL | 25.12.2019 | |
CZ | 25.12.2019 | ||
DK | 25.12.2019 | ||
EE | 25.12.2019 | ||
ES | 25.12.2019 | ||
FI | 25.12.2019 | ||
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
NL | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
SK | 25.12.2019 | ||
SM | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
IS | 25.04.2020 | ||
PT | 20.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/40] | AL | 25.12.2019 | |
CZ | 25.12.2019 | ||
EE | 25.12.2019 | ||
FI | 25.12.2019 | ||
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
NL | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
SK | 25.12.2019 | ||
SM | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
IS | 25.04.2020 | ||
PT | 20.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 25.12.2019 | |
CZ | 25.12.2019 | ||
EE | 25.12.2019 | ||
FI | 25.12.2019 | ||
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
NL | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
SK | 25.12.2019 | ||
SM | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
PT | 20.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 25.12.2019 | |
CZ | 25.12.2019 | ||
EE | 25.12.2019 | ||
FI | 25.12.2019 | ||
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
NL | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
PT | 20.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 25.12.2019 | |
CZ | 25.12.2019 | ||
FI | 25.12.2019 | ||
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
NL | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/32] | AL | 25.12.2019 | |
FI | 25.12.2019 | ||
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
NL | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | FI | 25.12.2019 | |
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | FI | 25.12.2019 | |
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | FI | 25.12.2019 | |
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/21] | NO | 25.03.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2005190732 (DOUGLAS BRETTON [US], et al) [X] 1-22 * abstract * * paragraphs [0032] , [0086] - [0091] *; | [X]US2007086353 (GEFFLAUT ALAIN F [DE], et al) [X] 1-22 * abstract * * paragraphs [0007] , [0008] , [0020] - [0022] *; | [X]US2009003236 (AOYAMA AKIO [JP], et al) [X] 1-22 * abstract * * paragraphs [0041] - [0053] *; | [X]US2010067396 (CUI TAO [US], et al) [X] 1-22* abstract *; | [X]US2010098047 (ZHOU XIAOMING [US], et al) [X] 1-22 * abstract * * paragraphs [0026] , [0027] , [0032] - [0041] *; | [X]US2010208603 (ISHII HIROYUKI [JP]) [X] 1-22 * abstract * * paragraphs [0011] - [0013] - [0126] , [0135] , [0185] , [0186] * | International search | [X]JP2009182650 (KYOCERA CORP); | [A] - HIROSHI YOSHIDA ET AL., "Analysis of Network Dynamics by Viscoelastic Material Model", IEICE TECHNICAL REPORT. IN, JOHO NETWORK, (20100225), vol. 109, no. 449, pages 349 - 354, XP008170501 | by applicant | JP2004254025 | JP2005244851 | JP2007116329 | JP2008258877 | JP2008278207 | WO2008143026 |