EP2668800 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR ALLOCATING COMMUNICATION RESOURCES IN A COMMUNICATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.06.2020 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.07.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Technologies Oy Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | [2019/36] |
Former [2015/32] | For all designated states Nokia Technologies Oy Karaportti 3 02610 Espoo / FI | ||
Former [2014/24] | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | ||
Former [2013/49] | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LUNDEN, Jari Matinkallio 10A, 15 FIN-02230 Espoo / FI | 02 /
VIRTEJ, Elena Sateenkaari 3 M 200 FIN-02100 Espoo / FI | [2013/49] | Representative(s) | Ruuskanen, Juha-Pekka, et al Page White & Farrer Limited Bedford House 21A John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/49] | Jaatinen, Jussi Imari Nokia Corporation Intellectual Property Department Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | Application number, filing date | 11857247.8 | 26.01.2011 | WO2011IB50350 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012101482 | Date: | 02.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2668800 | Date: | 04.12.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.08.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 02.08.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.03.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H04W16/14, H04W52/38, H04W52/24 | [2015/52] | CPC: |
H04W52/146 (EP,US);
H04W16/14 (US);
H04W52/24 (EP,US);
H04W52/241 (US);
H04W52/246 (US);
H04W52/38 (US);
H04W72/541 (EP,US);
H04W24/10 (EP,US);
H04W52/242 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2013/49] | H04W16/14, H04W52/38 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/49] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN FÜR DIE ZUWEISUNG VON KOMMUNIKATIONSRESSOURCEN IN EINEM KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM | [2013/49] | English: | APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR ALLOCATING COMMUNICATION RESOURCES IN A COMMUNICATION SYSTEM | [2013/49] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ POUR ALLOUER DES RESSOURCES DE COMMUNICATION DANS UN SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION | [2013/49] | Entry into regional phase | 30.07.2013 | National basic fee paid | 30.07.2013 | Search fee paid | 30.07.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.07.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.07.2013 | Examination requested [2013/49] | 04.10.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.07.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.01.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/31] | 14.02.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/31] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.07.2019 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2020 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO0057658 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]); | [A]US2006209767 (CHAE HEON-KI [KR], et al); | [A]US2008166976 (RAO ANIL M [US]); | [A]US2008261645 (LUO XILIANG [US], et al); | [A]WO2010006909 (IP ACCESS LTD [GB], et al); | [X]CN101711058 (ZTE CORP); | EP2515599 [ ] (ZTE CORP [CN]) | International search | [A]WO0057658 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]); | [A]EP1773085 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]); | [A]WO2009050212 (NOKIA SIEMENS NETWORKS OY [FI], et al); | [A]WO2009050210 (NOKIA SIEMENS NETWORKS OY [FI], et al); | [A]WO2010137777 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR], et al); | [E]US2011028170 (SAWAI RYO [JP]); |