EP2669240 - ADVANCING/RETRACTING ACTUATION DEVICE WITH MESHING CHAIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 01.03.2019 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.03.2019 | Refusal of application | published on 03.04.2019 [2019/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tsubakimoto Chain Co. 3-3, Nakanoshima 3-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-0005 / JP | [2013/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAJI, Tomoyuki c/o TSUBAKIMOTO CHAIN CO. 3-3 Nakanoshima 3-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 530-0005 / JP | 02 /
MURAKAMI, Keisuke c/o TSUBAKIMOTO CHAIN CO. 3-3 Nakanoshima 3-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 530-0005 / JP | [2013/49] | Representative(s) | Westphal, Mussgnug & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Am Riettor 5 78048 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/49] | Patentanwälte Westphal, Mussgnug & Partner Am Riettor 5 78048 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE | Application number, filing date | 11857348.4 | 27.12.2011 | WO2011JP80166 | Priority number, date | JP20110015066 | 27.01.2011 Original published format: JP 2011015066 | [2013/49] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012101945 | Date: | 02.08.2012 | Language: | JA | [2012/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2669240 | Date: | 04.12.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 02.08.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.07.2014 | Classification | IPC: | F16G13/20, B66F3/06 | [2014/35] | CPC: |
F16G13/20 (EP,US);
F16H19/04 (US);
B66F3/06 (EP,US);
Y10T74/18096 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2013/49] | B66F7/12, F16G13/20 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/49] | Title | German: | VORSCHUB-/RETRAKTIONSBETÄTIGUNGSVORRICHTUNG MIT INEINANDERGREIFENDER KETTE | [2013/49] | English: | ADVANCING/RETRACTING ACTUATION DEVICE WITH MESHING CHAIN | [2013/49] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ACTIONNEMENT D'AVANCE/RECUL DOTÉ D'UNE CHAÎNE À ENGRÈNEMENT | [2013/49] | Entry into regional phase | 06.08.2013 | Translation filed | 06.08.2013 | National basic fee paid | 06.08.2013 | Search fee paid | 06.08.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.08.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.08.2013 | Examination requested [2013/49] | 20.11.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.01.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.05.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.09.2018 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2019/14] | 27.09.2018 | Date of oral proceedings | 07.11.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2019/14] | 07.11.2018 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.01.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2010229469 (KANEHIRA MAKOTO [JP]) [X] 1-4 * abstract * * paragraph [0081] * * paragraph [0102] - paragraph [0107] ** figures 2,6,13,14 *; | [XPL]WO2011062190 (TSUBAKIMOTO CHAIN CO [JP], et al) [XP] 1-4 * abstract * * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0034] * * figures 1-4 * [L] ; | [XPL]JP2011144832 (TSUBAKIMOTO CHAIN CO) [XP] 1-4 * abstract * * figures 1-6 * [L] | International search | [A]JPH053300U (SUMITOMO METAL INDUSTRIES, LTD., DAIDO KOGYO CO., LTD.); | [A]JPH09119495 (SANIN BOORUTO SEISAKUSHO KK); | [A]JPH11278797 (TSUBAKIMOTO CHAIN CO) | by applicant | JP2009255997 |