EP2670875 - COPPER ALLOY MATERIAL FOR SEAWATER AND METHOD FOR PREPARING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 12.10.2018 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Poongsan Corporation Poongsan Bldg. 23, Chungjeong-ro Seodaemun-gu Seoul 120-013 / KR | [2013/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, In Dal 106-902 Sammaeul Daewoo Apt. 1121 Hogye 1 (il)-dong Dongan-gu Anyang-si Gyeonggi-do 431-080 / KR | 02 /
LEE, Dong Woo 110-2803, Geumkang Exllu Tower Seokbong-dong, Daedeok-gu Daejeon 306-710 / KR | 03 /
KIM, Dae Hyun 404 Sunjinart Mansion 1544-1, Mugeo-dong Nam-gu Ulsan 680-812 / KR | 04 /
LEE, Ji Hoon 108-1102, Doosan Apt. Hyoseong 1-dong, Gyeyang-gu Incheon 407-782 / KR | [2014/07] |
Former [2013/50] | 01 /
KIM, In Dal 106-902 Sammaeul Daewoo Apt. 1121 Hogye 1 (il)-dong Dongan-gu Anyang-si Gyeonggi-do 431-080 / KR | ||
02 /
LEE, Dong Woo 102-1101, Baekhap Apt. Wolpyeong 2dong, Seo-gu Daejeon 302-752 / KR | |||
03 /
KIM, Dae Hyun 404 Sunjinart Mansion 1544-1, Mugeo-dong Nam-gu Ulsan 680-812 / KR | |||
04 /
LEE, Ji Hoon 319-503 Songgang Green Apt. Songgang-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-751 / KR | Representative(s) | Petraz, Gilberto Luigi, et al GLP S.r.l. Viale Europa Unita, 171 33100 Udine / IT | [2013/50] | Application number, filing date | 11857456.5 | 11.05.2011 | [2016/44] | WO2011KR03449 | Priority number, date | KR20110009997 | 01.02.2011 Original published format: KR 20110009997 | [2013/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012105731 | Date: | 09.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2670875 | Date: | 11.12.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.08.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2670875 | Date: | 02.11.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 09.08.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.07.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C22C9/04, C22F1/08 | [2013/50] | CPC: |
C22C9/04 (EP,KR);
C22F1/08 (EP,KR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/50] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KUPFERLEGIERUNGSMATERIAL FÜR SEEWASSER UND VERFAHREN ZU SEINER HERSTELLUNG | [2013/50] | English: | COPPER ALLOY MATERIAL FOR SEAWATER AND METHOD FOR PREPARING SAME | [2013/50] | French: | MATÉRIAU D'ALLIAGE DE CUIVRE POUR L'EAU DE MER ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION | [2013/50] | Entry into regional phase | 19.07.2013 | National basic fee paid | 19.07.2013 | Search fee paid | 19.07.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.07.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.07.2013 | Examination requested [2013/50] | 29.01.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.04.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.08.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.09.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.01.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.05.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.09.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 21.09.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.09.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.04.2015 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
19.07.2017
ADMISSIBLE Otto Fuchs KG Derschlager Straße 26 58540 Meinerzhagen / DE Opponent's representative Haverkamp, Jens Gartenstrasse 61 58636 Iserlohn / DE | [2017/34] | 11.09.2017 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 21.06.2018 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 09.11.2018 | 28.06.2018 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 08.07.2018 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2018/46] | 09.11.2018 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.05.2011 | AL | 02.11.2016 | AT | 02.11.2016 | BE | 02.11.2016 | CY | 02.11.2016 | CZ | 02.11.2016 | DK | 02.11.2016 | EE | 02.11.2016 | ES | 02.11.2016 | FI | 02.11.2016 | HR | 02.11.2016 | IT | 02.11.2016 | LT | 02.11.2016 | LV | 02.11.2016 | MC | 02.11.2016 | MK | 02.11.2016 | NL | 02.11.2016 | PL | 02.11.2016 | RO | 02.11.2016 | RS | 02.11.2016 | SE | 02.11.2016 | SI | 02.11.2016 | SK | 02.11.2016 | SM | 02.11.2016 | TR | 02.11.2016 | BG | 02.02.2017 | GR | 03.02.2017 | IS | 02.03.2017 | PT | 02.03.2017 | GB | 11.05.2017 | IE | 11.05.2017 | LU | 11.05.2017 | MT | 11.05.2017 | CH | 31.05.2017 | FR | 31.05.2017 | LI | 31.05.2017 | DE | 01.12.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 11.05.2011 | |
AT | 02.11.2016 | ||
BE | 02.11.2016 | ||
CY | 02.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2016 | ||
DK | 02.11.2016 | ||
EE | 02.11.2016 | ||
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
HR | 02.11.2016 | ||
IT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
MC | 02.11.2016 | ||
MK | 02.11.2016 | ||
NL | 02.11.2016 | ||
PL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RO | 02.11.2016 | ||
RS | 02.11.2016 | ||
SE | 02.11.2016 | ||
SI | 02.11.2016 | ||
SK | 02.11.2016 | ||
SM | 02.11.2016 | ||
TR | 02.11.2016 | ||
BG | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
GB | 11.05.2017 | ||
IE | 11.05.2017 | ||
LU | 11.05.2017 | ||
MT | 11.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
FR | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
DE | 01.12.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 11.05.2011 | |
AT | 02.11.2016 | ||
BE | 02.11.2016 | ||
CY | 02.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2016 | ||
DK | 02.11.2016 | ||
EE | 02.11.2016 | ||
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
HR | 02.11.2016 | ||
IT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
MC | 02.11.2016 | ||
MK | 02.11.2016 | ||
NL | 02.11.2016 | ||
PL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RO | 02.11.2016 | ||
RS | 02.11.2016 | ||
SE | 02.11.2016 | ||
SI | 02.11.2016 | ||
SK | 02.11.2016 | ||
SM | 02.11.2016 | ||
BG | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
GB | 11.05.2017 | ||
IE | 11.05.2017 | ||
LU | 11.05.2017 | ||
MT | 11.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
FR | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
DE | 01.12.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 11.05.2011 | |
AT | 02.11.2016 | ||
BE | 02.11.2016 | ||
CY | 02.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2016 | ||
DK | 02.11.2016 | ||
EE | 02.11.2016 | ||
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
HR | 02.11.2016 | ||
IT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
MC | 02.11.2016 | ||
NL | 02.11.2016 | ||
PL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RO | 02.11.2016 | ||
RS | 02.11.2016 | ||
SE | 02.11.2016 | ||
SI | 02.11.2016 | ||
SK | 02.11.2016 | ||
SM | 02.11.2016 | ||
BG | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
GB | 11.05.2017 | ||
IE | 11.05.2017 | ||
LU | 11.05.2017 | ||
MT | 11.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
FR | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
DE | 01.12.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 11.05.2011 | |
AT | 02.11.2016 | ||
BE | 02.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2016 | ||
DK | 02.11.2016 | ||
EE | 02.11.2016 | ||
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
HR | 02.11.2016 | ||
IT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
MC | 02.11.2016 | ||
NL | 02.11.2016 | ||
PL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RO | 02.11.2016 | ||
RS | 02.11.2016 | ||
SE | 02.11.2016 | ||
SI | 02.11.2016 | ||
SK | 02.11.2016 | ||
SM | 02.11.2016 | ||
BG | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
GB | 11.05.2017 | ||
IE | 11.05.2017 | ||
LU | 11.05.2017 | ||
MT | 11.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
FR | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
DE | 01.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 02.11.2016 | |
BE | 02.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2016 | ||
DK | 02.11.2016 | ||
EE | 02.11.2016 | ||
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
HR | 02.11.2016 | ||
IT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
MC | 02.11.2016 | ||
NL | 02.11.2016 | ||
PL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RO | 02.11.2016 | ||
RS | 02.11.2016 | ||
SE | 02.11.2016 | ||
SI | 02.11.2016 | ||
SK | 02.11.2016 | ||
SM | 02.11.2016 | ||
BG | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
GB | 11.05.2017 | ||
IE | 11.05.2017 | ||
LU | 11.05.2017 | ||
MT | 11.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
FR | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
DE | 01.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/29] | AT | 02.11.2016 | |
BE | 02.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2016 | ||
DK | 02.11.2016 | ||
EE | 02.11.2016 | ||
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
HR | 02.11.2016 | ||
IT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
MC | 02.11.2016 | ||
NL | 02.11.2016 | ||
PL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RO | 02.11.2016 | ||
RS | 02.11.2016 | ||
SE | 02.11.2016 | ||
SI | 02.11.2016 | ||
SK | 02.11.2016 | ||
SM | 02.11.2016 | ||
BG | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
GB | 11.05.2017 | ||
IE | 11.05.2017 | ||
LU | 11.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
FR | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
DE | 01.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 02.11.2016 | |
BE | 02.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2016 | ||
DK | 02.11.2016 | ||
EE | 02.11.2016 | ||
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
HR | 02.11.2016 | ||
IT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
MC | 02.11.2016 | ||
NL | 02.11.2016 | ||
PL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RO | 02.11.2016 | ||
RS | 02.11.2016 | ||
SE | 02.11.2016 | ||
SI | 02.11.2016 | ||
SK | 02.11.2016 | ||
SM | 02.11.2016 | ||
BG | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
GB | 11.05.2017 | ||
IE | 11.05.2017 | ||
LU | 11.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
DE | 01.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 02.11.2016 | |
BE | 02.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2016 | ||
DK | 02.11.2016 | ||
EE | 02.11.2016 | ||
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
HR | 02.11.2016 | ||
IT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
MC | 02.11.2016 | ||
NL | 02.11.2016 | ||
PL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RO | 02.11.2016 | ||
RS | 02.11.2016 | ||
SE | 02.11.2016 | ||
SI | 02.11.2016 | ||
SK | 02.11.2016 | ||
SM | 02.11.2016 | ||
BG | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
GB | 11.05.2017 | ||
LU | 11.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
DE | 01.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/20] | AT | 02.11.2016 | |
BE | 02.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2016 | ||
DK | 02.11.2016 | ||
EE | 02.11.2016 | ||
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
HR | 02.11.2016 | ||
IT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
MC | 02.11.2016 | ||
NL | 02.11.2016 | ||
PL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RO | 02.11.2016 | ||
RS | 02.11.2016 | ||
SE | 02.11.2016 | ||
SI | 02.11.2016 | ||
SK | 02.11.2016 | ||
SM | 02.11.2016 | ||
BG | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
LU | 11.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
DE | 01.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/17] | AT | 02.11.2016 | |
BE | 02.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2016 | ||
DK | 02.11.2016 | ||
EE | 02.11.2016 | ||
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
HR | 02.11.2016 | ||
IT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
MC | 02.11.2016 | ||
NL | 02.11.2016 | ||
PL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RO | 02.11.2016 | ||
RS | 02.11.2016 | ||
SE | 02.11.2016 | ||
SI | 02.11.2016 | ||
SK | 02.11.2016 | ||
SM | 02.11.2016 | ||
BG | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
LU | 11.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | AT | 02.11.2016 | |
BE | 02.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2016 | ||
DK | 02.11.2016 | ||
EE | 02.11.2016 | ||
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
HR | 02.11.2016 | ||
IT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
MC | 02.11.2016 | ||
NL | 02.11.2016 | ||
PL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RO | 02.11.2016 | ||
RS | 02.11.2016 | ||
SE | 02.11.2016 | ||
SI | 02.11.2016 | ||
SK | 02.11.2016 | ||
SM | 02.11.2016 | ||
BG | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/06] | AT | 02.11.2016 | |
BE | 02.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2016 | ||
DK | 02.11.2016 | ||
EE | 02.11.2016 | ||
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
HR | 02.11.2016 | ||
IT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
MC | 02.11.2016 | ||
NL | 02.11.2016 | ||
PL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RO | 02.11.2016 | ||
RS | 02.11.2016 | ||
SE | 02.11.2016 | ||
SI | 02.11.2016 | ||
SK | 02.11.2016 | ||
SM | 02.11.2016 | ||
BG | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | AT | 02.11.2016 | |
BE | 02.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2016 | ||
DK | 02.11.2016 | ||
EE | 02.11.2016 | ||
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
HR | 02.11.2016 | ||
IT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
NL | 02.11.2016 | ||
PL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RO | 02.11.2016 | ||
RS | 02.11.2016 | ||
SE | 02.11.2016 | ||
SI | 02.11.2016 | ||
SK | 02.11.2016 | ||
SM | 02.11.2016 | ||
BG | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/38] | AT | 02.11.2016 | |
BE | 02.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2016 | ||
DK | 02.11.2016 | ||
EE | 02.11.2016 | ||
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
HR | 02.11.2016 | ||
IT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
NL | 02.11.2016 | ||
PL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RO | 02.11.2016 | ||
RS | 02.11.2016 | ||
SE | 02.11.2016 | ||
SK | 02.11.2016 | ||
SM | 02.11.2016 | ||
BG | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 02.11.2016 | |
BE | 02.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2016 | ||
DK | 02.11.2016 | ||
EE | 02.11.2016 | ||
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
HR | 02.11.2016 | ||
IT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
NL | 02.11.2016 | ||
PL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RO | 02.11.2016 | ||
RS | 02.11.2016 | ||
SE | 02.11.2016 | ||
SK | 02.11.2016 | ||
SM | 02.11.2016 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/36] | AT | 02.11.2016 | |
BE | 02.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2016 | ||
DK | 02.11.2016 | ||
EE | 02.11.2016 | ||
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
HR | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
NL | 02.11.2016 | ||
PL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RO | 02.11.2016 | ||
RS | 02.11.2016 | ||
SE | 02.11.2016 | ||
SK | 02.11.2016 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/34] | AT | 02.11.2016 | |
CZ | 02.11.2016 | ||
DK | 02.11.2016 | ||
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
HR | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
NL | 02.11.2016 | ||
PL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RS | 02.11.2016 | ||
SE | 02.11.2016 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/33] | AT | 02.11.2016 | |
DK | 02.11.2016 | ||
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
HR | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
NL | 02.11.2016 | ||
PL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RS | 02.11.2016 | ||
SE | 02.11.2016 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/26] | AT | 02.11.2016 | |
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
HR | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
NL | 02.11.2016 | ||
PL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RS | 02.11.2016 | ||
SE | 02.11.2016 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 02.11.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]JPH10121168 (SANPO SHINDO KOGYO KK) [X] 1 * abstract * [A] 2-7; | [XAY]US3778236 (GOLDMAN A, et al) [X] 1,2 * column 3; claims 1, 5, 6; table 1 * [A] 6,7 [Y] 3-5; | [XA]JPS59159957 (MITSUBISHI METAL CORP) [X] 2,6 * abstract * [A] 1,3-5,7; | [XA]EP0931843 (WIELAND WERKE AG [DE]) [X] 2 * claim 2; table 1 * [A] 1,3-7; | [A]JPH10152735 (SANPO SHINDO KOGYO KK) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [XAY] - TYLER D E ET AL, "Manganese in copper based alloys", JOURNAL OF METALS,, (19730101), vol. 25, no. 1, pages 24 - 29, XP001263204 [X] 1 * pages 24, 26-28;; figures 13, 14 * [A] 2,6,7 [Y] 3-5 | [XA] - POPPLEWELL J M ET AL, "Stress corrosion resistance of some copper base alloys in natural atmospheres", CORROSION, NACE INTERNATIONAL, HOUSTON, TX; US, US, (19750801), vol. 31, no. 8, ISSN 0010-9312, pages 279 - 286, XP009178566 [X] 1,6 * page 280; tables 1, 2 * [A] 2-5,7 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.5006/0010-9312-31.8.279 | [A] - MUKHERJEE D ET AL, "Corrosion resistant and antifouling behavior of Cu-Mn alloys in sea-water", BULLETIN OF ELECTROCHEMISTRY, KARAIKUDI, (19930101), vol. 9, no. 8-10, ISSN 0256-1654, pages 427 - 429, XP009122244 [A] 1-7 * the whole document * | [A] - SCHMIDT ROBERT F ET AL, "MARINE CORROSION OF A WHITE COPPER-BASE ALLOY WITH ZINC, MANGANESE, NICKEL AND ALUMINUM", TRANSACTIONS OF THE AMERICAN FOUNDRYMEN'S SOCIETY,, (19730101), vol. 81, ISSN 0065-8375, pages 471 - 474, XP009178562 [A] 1-7 * the whole document * | International search | [A]US4631171 (MCDONALD ALLEN S [US], et al); | [A]KR19990002539 (MIN; BYONG KWON); | [A]KR20000077017 (OLIN CORP.); | [A]US2009022620 (WEBER KAI [DE]); | [A]US2010061884 (CLARK CRAIG [US], et al) | Opposition | JPH10121168 | US3778236 | JPS59159957 | EP0931843 | AU2005256111B | GB868276 | - TYLER D E et al., "Manganese in copper based alloys", JOURNAL OF MET - ALS, (19730101), vol. 25, no. 1, pages 24 - 29, XP001263204 | - POPPLEWELL J M et al., "Stress corrosion resistance of some copper base alloys in natural atmospheres", CORROSION, HOUSTON, TX ; US , US, (19750801), vol. 31, no. 8, ISSN 0010-9312, pages 279 - 286, XP009178566 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.5006/0010-9312-31.8.279 | - "Kupfer-Zink-Legierungen (Messing und Sondermessing)", Informationsdruck i.5 - Deutsches Kupferinstitut, (20070300), XP055179369 | - "Copper alloys in aquaculture", Wikipedia, (20101105), URL: https://en.wikipedia.org/w/index.php?title=Copper_alloys_in_aquaculture&oldid=394949527, XP055401705 | - Kurt Dies, Kupfer und Kupferlegierungen in der Technik, Springer-Verlag, (19670000), pages 344 - 345, XP055401720 |