EP2672193 - BOILER HAVING INTEGRATED NITROGEN TANK AND HEAT EXCHANGER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.04.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.04.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.05.2016 [2016/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Choi, Jin-min 601, Villa Apt. 302-86, Ichon-dong Yongsan-gu Seoul 140-854 / KR | For all designated states Choi, Sung-hwan 102-302, SK Cheongamdae 64-29 Cheongam-dong Yongsan-gu Seoul 140-050 / KR | [2013/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2013/50] | Representative(s) | Spengler, Robert Potthast & Spengler Patentanwälte PartG mbB Magirus-Deutz-Straße 12 89077 Ulm / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/50] | Spengler, Robert Küfergasse 11 89073 Ulm / DE | Application number, filing date | 11857910.1 | 11.05.2011 | WO2011KR03459 | Priority number, date | KR20110009872 | 01.02.2011 Original published format: KR 20110009872 | KR20110029297 | 31.03.2011 Original published format: KR 20110029297 | [2013/50] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012105732 | Date: | 09.08.2012 | Language: | KO | [2012/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2672193 | Date: | 11.12.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 09.08.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.08.2014 | Classification | IPC: | F24H1/48, F24D3/02, F24D3/08, F24D11/00, F24D3/10, F24H1/52, F28D20/00, F28D7/02 | [2014/38] | CPC: |
F24D3/087 (EP);
F24H1/48 (KR);
F24D3/00 (KR);
F24D3/1008 (EP);
F24D3/1016 (EP);
F24H1/188 (EP);
F24H1/52 (KR);
F24H9/18 (KR);
F28D20/0034 (EP);
F28D2020/0078 (EP);
F28D2020/0091 (EP);
F28D7/024 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2013/50] | F24H1/48, F24D3/02, F24D3/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/50] | Title | German: | KESSEL MIT INTEGRIERTEM STICKSTOFFTANK UND WÄRMETAUSCHER | [2013/50] | English: | BOILER HAVING INTEGRATED NITROGEN TANK AND HEAT EXCHANGER | [2013/50] | French: | CHAUDIÈRE COMPRENANT UN VASE À AZOTE INTÉGRÉ ET UN ÉCHANGEUR DE CHALEUR | [2013/50] | Entry into regional phase | 30.08.2013 | Translation filed | 30.08.2013 | National basic fee paid | 30.08.2013 | Search fee paid | 30.08.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.08.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.08.2013 | Examination requested [2013/50] | 03.03.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.07.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.12.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/21] | 12.01.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2016/21] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.07.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]DE8529850U (WAMSLER HERD UND OFEN GMBH, MUENCHEN) [X] 1-3 * figure 1; claim 1 * [I] 4; | [XI]EP0759526 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1-3 * paragraphs [0018] - [0019]; figure 3 * [I] 4; | [X]DE19719795 (WINKELMANN & PANNHOFF GMBH & C [DE]) [X] 1-3* column 2, lines 59-68; figures 1,2 *; | [XI]EP1028293 (SCANFERLA GIORGIO [IT]) [X] 1-3,5,6 * paragraphs [0043] , [0053] , [0054] , [0057]; figures 2-4 * [I] 4; | [XA]DE102004001035 (VOLKMANN NORBERT [DE]) [X] 1-3,5,6 * abstract * [A] 4 | International search | [A]KR950003002Y (CHEIL PRECISION CO LTD [KR]); | [A]JPH08200815 (HITACHI AIR CONDITIONING & REF); | [A]KR980009060U (CHOI, JIN MIN); | [A]KR980009069U (PARK, JONG WOO); | [A]KR20020008442 (LEE MAN HO [KR]); | [A]JP2006090643 (HITACHI HOUSETEC CO LTD) |