EP2676202 - GENERATING TEST DATA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 05.01.2018 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.01.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 07.02.2018 [2018/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EntIT Software LLC 1140 Enterprise Way, Building G Sunnyvale, California 94089 / US | [2017/46] |
Former [2016/25] | For all designated states Hewlett Packard Enterprise Development L.P. 11445 Compaq Center Drive West Houston, TX 77070 / US | ||
Former [2013/52] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Development Company, L.P. 11445 Compaq Center Drive West Houston, TX 77070 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WEI, Yongdong c/o Hewlett-Packard Company Building 6, No. 690 Bi Bo Road Zhangjiang Micro-Electric Port Shanghai 201203 / CN | [2013/52] | Representative(s) | HGF Fountain Precinct Balm Green Sheffield S1 2JA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/52] | Zinkler, Franz Patentanwälte Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler Zinkler & Partner Postfach 246 82043 Pullach bei München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11858666.8 | 18.02.2011 | WO2011CN00255 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012109771 | Date: | 23.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2676202 | Date: | 25.12.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.08.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 23.08.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.12.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G06F11/36 | [2013/52] | CPC: |
G06F11/3684 (EP,US);
G06F11/263 (US);
G03G15/55 (US);
G06F11/0748 (US);
G06F11/22 (US);
G06F11/2294 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/52] | Title | German: | ERSTELLUNG VON TESTDATEN | [2013/52] | English: | GENERATING TEST DATA | [2013/52] | French: | GÉNÉRATION DE DONNÉES DE TEST | [2013/52] | Entry into regional phase | 09.08.2013 | National basic fee paid | 09.08.2013 | Search fee paid | 09.08.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.08.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.08.2013 | Examination requested [2013/52] | 22.12.2017 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2018/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2014 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   24.04.2014 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2008256111 (HAHAM URI [IL], et al) [X] 1-7,10-12,14 * abstract * * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0044] * [I] 8,9,13,15; | [A]US2010185694 (COPTY SHADY [IL]) [A] 8,9,13,15 * abstract ** paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0028] * | International search | [A]CN1752945 (INST OF SOFTWARE CAS [CN]); | [A]US2006224777 (SAND ANNE R [US], et al); | [A]US2006230083 (ALLYN GREGG R [US], et al); | [A]US2008301813 (NEYSTADT JOHN [IL], et al) |