Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2012109771 | Global Dossier | 23.08.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2011CN00255 | 18.02.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10255152 | Global Dossier | 09.04.2019 | B2 | US2013311830 | 21.11.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2011CN00255 | 18.02.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN103348329 | Global Dossier | 09.10.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2011CN00255 | 18.02.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2676202 | Global Dossier | 17.01.2018 | A4 | EP2676202 | 25.12.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2011CN00255 | 18.02.2011 |