EP2679823 - SCROLL COMPRESSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 16.12.2016 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.12.2016 | Withdrawal of application | published on 18.01.2017 [2017/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6-6 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2014/01] | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6-6 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IIJIMA Ryota c/o Hitachi, Ltd. 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | 02 /
KOYAMA Masaki c/o Hitachi, Ltd. 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | [2014/01] | Representative(s) | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Patentanwälte PartG mbB Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/01] | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11859605.5 | 22.02.2011 | WO2011JP53841 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012114455 | Date: | 30.08.2012 | Language: | JA | [2012/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2679823 | Date: | 01.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 30.08.2012 | Classification | IPC: | F04C18/02 | [2014/01] | CPC: |
F04C18/0215 (EP);
F04C28/26 (EP);
F04C29/126 (EP);
F04C23/008 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/01] | Title | German: | SPIRALVERDICHTER | [2014/01] | English: | SCROLL COMPRESSOR | [2014/01] | French: | COMPRESSEUR À SPIRALE | [2014/01] | Entry into regional phase | 22.08.2013 | Translation filed | 23.09.2013 | National basic fee paid | 23.09.2013 | Search fee paid | 23.09.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.09.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.08.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.09.2013 | Examination requested [2014/01] | 06.12.2016 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2017/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH0861269 (NIPPON SOKEN, et al); | [A]JPH11351167 (DAIKIN IND LTD); | [A]JP2004143951 (TOKYO GAS CO LTD); | [A]JP2003500611 (LG ELECTRONICS INC.); | [A]JP2006046114 (TOSHIBA CARRIER KK) | by applicant | JP2004143951 |