EP2684566 - PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION FOR PREVENTING AND TREATING COMPLICATIONS OF DIABETES CONTAINING A HOMONOIA RIPARIA EXTRACT OR A FRACTION THEREOF AS AN ACTIVE INGREDIENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2014/03] | PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION FOR PREVENTING AND TREATING COMPLICATIONS OF DIABETES CONTAINING A TRADITIONAL ORIENTAL MEDICINE EXTRACT OR A FRACTION THEREOF AS AN ACTIVE INGREDIENT | ||
[2016/28] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.11.2017 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.11.2016 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Korea Institute of Oriental Medicine 461-24, Jeonmin-dong Yuseoung-gu Daejeon 305-811 / KR | [2014/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Jin, Sook 804 Banseokblassbill 1615-17 Bongcheon-dong Gwanak-gu Seoul 151-050 / KR | 02 /
KIM, Jung, Hyun 238-18 Yangpyeong-dong 1 ga Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 150-101 / KR | 03 /
KIM, Young, Sook 109-203 Jangdae Prugio Apt. 479 Jangdae-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-308 / KR | 04 /
KIM, Chan-Sik 308 Korea Institute of Oriental Medicine Domitory 461-24 Jeonmin-dong Yuseoung-gu Daejeon 305-811 / KR | 05 /
KIM, Ohn, Soon 922 Gwanpyeong-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-509 / KR | 06 /
SHON, Eun, Jin 510-1205 Songnimmaeul Apt. 5-danji Hagi-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-759 / KR | 07 /
YOO, Nam-Hee 301 Daeun Villa 103-30 Doma 2-dong Seo-gu Daejeon 302-162 / KR | 08 /
LEE, Yun, Mi 201, 360-5 Jeonmin-dong Yuseoung-gu Daejeon 305-390 / KR | 09 /
JUNG, Dong, Ho 569-27 Gayang-dong Dong-gu Daejeon 300-090 / KR | [2014/03] | Representative(s) | Office Freylinger P.O. Box 48 8001 Strassen / LU | [2014/03] | Application number, filing date | 11860294.5 | 07.03.2011 | [2016/52] | WO2011KR00896 | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012121423 | Date: | 13.09.2012 | Language: | KO | [2012/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2684566 | Date: | 15.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2684566 | Date: | 28.12.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 13.09.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.07.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A61K36/47, A61P3/10, A61P35/00, A61P17/00, A23L29/206, A23K50/75 | [2016/28] | CPC: |
A61K36/47 (EP,US);
A61K36/00 (US);
A23K20/10 (EP,US);
A23K50/10 (EP,US);
A23K50/30 (EP,US);
A23K50/75 (EP,US);
A23L13/426 (EP,US);
A23L2/52 (EP,US);
A23L23/00 (EP,US);
A23L29/03 (US);
A23L33/105 (EP,US);
A61P17/00 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2014/03] | A61K36/47, A23L1/29, A61P3/10, A61P35/00, A61P17/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/03] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PHARMAZEUTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR VORBEUGUNG UND BEHANDLUNG VON KOMPLIKATIONEN BEI DIABETES MIT EINEM HOMONOIA RIPARIA EXTRAKT ODER EINER FRAKTION DARAUS ALS WIRKSTOFF | [2016/28] | English: | PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION FOR PREVENTING AND TREATING COMPLICATIONS OF DIABETES CONTAINING A HOMONOIA RIPARIA EXTRACT OR A FRACTION THEREOF AS AN ACTIVE INGREDIENT | [2016/28] | French: | COMPOSITION PHARMACEUTIQUE DESTINÉE À LA PRÉVENTION ET AU TRAITEMENT DES COMPLICATIONS DU DIABÈTE CONTENANT UN EXTRAIT DE HOMONOIA RIPARIA OU UNE FRACTION DE CELUI-CI EN TANT QUE PRINCIPE ACTIF | [2016/28] |
Former [2014/03] | PHARMAZEUTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR VORBEUGUNG UND BEHANDLUNG VON KOMPLIKATIONEN BEI DIABETES MIT EINEM TRADITIONELLEN ORIENTALISCHEN ARZNEIMITTELEXTRAKT ODER EINER FRAKTION DARAUS ALS WIRKSTOFF | ||
Former [2014/03] | PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION FOR PREVENTING AND TREATING COMPLICATIONS OF DIABETES CONTAINING A TRADITIONAL ORIENTAL MEDICINE EXTRACT OR A FRACTION THEREOF AS AN ACTIVE INGREDIENT | ||
Former [2014/03] | COMPOSITION PHARMACEUTIQUE DESTINÉE À LA PRÉVENTION ET AU TRAITEMENT DES COMPLICATIONS DU DIABÈTE CONTENANT UN EXTRAIT MÉDICINAL ORIENTAL TRADITIONNEL OU UNE FRACTION DE CELUI-CI EN TANT QUE PRINCIPE ACTIF | Entry into regional phase | 04.10.2013 | Translation filed | 04.10.2013 | National basic fee paid | 04.10.2013 | Search fee paid | 04.10.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.10.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.06.2012 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: KR | 04.10.2013 | Examination requested [2014/03] | 17.02.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.07.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.11.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 17.11.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.11.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.07.2016 | Opposition(s) | 29.09.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.03.2011 | AL | 28.12.2016 | AT | 28.12.2016 | BE | 28.12.2016 | CY | 28.12.2016 | CZ | 28.12.2016 | DK | 28.12.2016 | EE | 28.12.2016 | ES | 28.12.2016 | FI | 28.12.2016 | HR | 28.12.2016 | IT | 28.12.2016 | LT | 28.12.2016 | LV | 28.12.2016 | MC | 28.12.2016 | MK | 28.12.2016 | NL | 28.12.2016 | PL | 28.12.2016 | RO | 28.12.2016 | RS | 28.12.2016 | SE | 28.12.2016 | SI | 28.12.2016 | SK | 28.12.2016 | SM | 28.12.2016 | TR | 28.12.2016 | IE | 07.03.2017 | LU | 07.03.2017 | MT | 07.03.2017 | BG | 28.03.2017 | GB | 28.03.2017 | NO | 28.03.2017 | GR | 29.03.2017 | IS | 28.04.2017 | PT | 28.04.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 07.03.2011 | |
AT | 28.12.2016 | ||
BE | 28.12.2016 | ||
CY | 28.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2016 | ||
DK | 28.12.2016 | ||
EE | 28.12.2016 | ||
ES | 28.12.2016 | ||
FI | 28.12.2016 | ||
HR | 28.12.2016 | ||
IT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LV | 28.12.2016 | ||
MC | 28.12.2016 | ||
MK | 28.12.2016 | ||
NL | 28.12.2016 | ||
PL | 28.12.2016 | ||
RO | 28.12.2016 | ||
RS | 28.12.2016 | ||
SE | 28.12.2016 | ||
SI | 28.12.2016 | ||
SK | 28.12.2016 | ||
SM | 28.12.2016 | ||
TR | 28.12.2016 | ||
IE | 07.03.2017 | ||
LU | 07.03.2017 | ||
MT | 07.03.2017 | ||
BG | 28.03.2017 | ||
GB | 28.03.2017 | ||
NO | 28.03.2017 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
IS | 28.04.2017 | ||
PT | 28.04.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 07.03.2011 | |
AT | 28.12.2016 | ||
BE | 28.12.2016 | ||
CY | 28.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2016 | ||
DK | 28.12.2016 | ||
EE | 28.12.2016 | ||
ES | 28.12.2016 | ||
FI | 28.12.2016 | ||
HR | 28.12.2016 | ||
IT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LV | 28.12.2016 | ||
MC | 28.12.2016 | ||
MK | 28.12.2016 | ||
NL | 28.12.2016 | ||
PL | 28.12.2016 | ||
RO | 28.12.2016 | ||
RS | 28.12.2016 | ||
SE | 28.12.2016 | ||
SI | 28.12.2016 | ||
SK | 28.12.2016 | ||
SM | 28.12.2016 | ||
IE | 07.03.2017 | ||
LU | 07.03.2017 | ||
MT | 07.03.2017 | ||
BG | 28.03.2017 | ||
GB | 28.03.2017 | ||
NO | 28.03.2017 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
IS | 28.04.2017 | ||
PT | 28.04.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 07.03.2011 | |
AT | 28.12.2016 | ||
BE | 28.12.2016 | ||
CY | 28.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2016 | ||
DK | 28.12.2016 | ||
EE | 28.12.2016 | ||
ES | 28.12.2016 | ||
FI | 28.12.2016 | ||
HR | 28.12.2016 | ||
IT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LV | 28.12.2016 | ||
MC | 28.12.2016 | ||
NL | 28.12.2016 | ||
PL | 28.12.2016 | ||
RO | 28.12.2016 | ||
RS | 28.12.2016 | ||
SE | 28.12.2016 | ||
SI | 28.12.2016 | ||
SK | 28.12.2016 | ||
SM | 28.12.2016 | ||
IE | 07.03.2017 | ||
LU | 07.03.2017 | ||
MT | 07.03.2017 | ||
BG | 28.03.2017 | ||
GB | 28.03.2017 | ||
NO | 28.03.2017 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
IS | 28.04.2017 | ||
PT | 28.04.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 07.03.2011 | |
AT | 28.12.2016 | ||
BE | 28.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2016 | ||
DK | 28.12.2016 | ||
EE | 28.12.2016 | ||
ES | 28.12.2016 | ||
FI | 28.12.2016 | ||
HR | 28.12.2016 | ||
IT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LV | 28.12.2016 | ||
MC | 28.12.2016 | ||
NL | 28.12.2016 | ||
PL | 28.12.2016 | ||
RO | 28.12.2016 | ||
RS | 28.12.2016 | ||
SE | 28.12.2016 | ||
SI | 28.12.2016 | ||
SK | 28.12.2016 | ||
SM | 28.12.2016 | ||
IE | 07.03.2017 | ||
LU | 07.03.2017 | ||
MT | 07.03.2017 | ||
BG | 28.03.2017 | ||
GB | 28.03.2017 | ||
NO | 28.03.2017 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
IS | 28.04.2017 | ||
PT | 28.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 28.12.2016 | |
BE | 28.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2016 | ||
DK | 28.12.2016 | ||
EE | 28.12.2016 | ||
ES | 28.12.2016 | ||
FI | 28.12.2016 | ||
HR | 28.12.2016 | ||
IT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LV | 28.12.2016 | ||
MC | 28.12.2016 | ||
NL | 28.12.2016 | ||
PL | 28.12.2016 | ||
RO | 28.12.2016 | ||
RS | 28.12.2016 | ||
SE | 28.12.2016 | ||
SI | 28.12.2016 | ||
SK | 28.12.2016 | ||
SM | 28.12.2016 | ||
IE | 07.03.2017 | ||
LU | 07.03.2017 | ||
MT | 07.03.2017 | ||
BG | 28.03.2017 | ||
GB | 28.03.2017 | ||
NO | 28.03.2017 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
IS | 28.04.2017 | ||
PT | 28.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | AT | 28.12.2016 | |
BE | 28.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2016 | ||
DK | 28.12.2016 | ||
EE | 28.12.2016 | ||
ES | 28.12.2016 | ||
FI | 28.12.2016 | ||
HR | 28.12.2016 | ||
IT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LV | 28.12.2016 | ||
MC | 28.12.2016 | ||
NL | 28.12.2016 | ||
PL | 28.12.2016 | ||
RO | 28.12.2016 | ||
RS | 28.12.2016 | ||
SE | 28.12.2016 | ||
SI | 28.12.2016 | ||
SK | 28.12.2016 | ||
SM | 28.12.2016 | ||
IE | 07.03.2017 | ||
LU | 07.03.2017 | ||
BG | 28.03.2017 | ||
GB | 28.03.2017 | ||
NO | 28.03.2017 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
IS | 28.04.2017 | ||
PT | 28.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 28.12.2016 | |
BE | 28.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2016 | ||
DK | 28.12.2016 | ||
EE | 28.12.2016 | ||
ES | 28.12.2016 | ||
FI | 28.12.2016 | ||
HR | 28.12.2016 | ||
IT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LV | 28.12.2016 | ||
MC | 28.12.2016 | ||
NL | 28.12.2016 | ||
PL | 28.12.2016 | ||
RO | 28.12.2016 | ||
RS | 28.12.2016 | ||
SE | 28.12.2016 | ||
SK | 28.12.2016 | ||
SM | 28.12.2016 | ||
LU | 07.03.2017 | ||
BG | 28.03.2017 | ||
NO | 28.03.2017 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
IS | 28.04.2017 | ||
PT | 28.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/01] | AT | 28.12.2016 | |
BE | 28.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2016 | ||
DK | 28.12.2016 | ||
EE | 28.12.2016 | ||
ES | 28.12.2016 | ||
FI | 28.12.2016 | ||
HR | 28.12.2016 | ||
IT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LV | 28.12.2016 | ||
MC | 28.12.2016 | ||
NL | 28.12.2016 | ||
PL | 28.12.2016 | ||
RO | 28.12.2016 | ||
RS | 28.12.2016 | ||
SE | 28.12.2016 | ||
SK | 28.12.2016 | ||
SM | 28.12.2016 | ||
BG | 28.03.2017 | ||
NO | 28.03.2017 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
IS | 28.04.2017 | ||
PT | 28.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/41] | AT | 28.12.2016 | |
BE | 28.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2016 | ||
EE | 28.12.2016 | ||
ES | 28.12.2016 | ||
FI | 28.12.2016 | ||
HR | 28.12.2016 | ||
IT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LV | 28.12.2016 | ||
NL | 28.12.2016 | ||
PL | 28.12.2016 | ||
RO | 28.12.2016 | ||
RS | 28.12.2016 | ||
SE | 28.12.2016 | ||
SK | 28.12.2016 | ||
SM | 28.12.2016 | ||
BG | 28.03.2017 | ||
NO | 28.03.2017 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
IS | 28.04.2017 | ||
PT | 28.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/36] | BE | 28.12.2016 | |
CZ | 28.12.2016 | ||
EE | 28.12.2016 | ||
ES | 28.12.2016 | ||
FI | 28.12.2016 | ||
HR | 28.12.2016 | ||
LT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LV | 28.12.2016 | ||
NL | 28.12.2016 | ||
PL | 28.12.2016 | ||
RO | 28.12.2016 | ||
RS | 28.12.2016 | ||
SE | 28.12.2016 | ||
SK | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.03.2017 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
IS | 28.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/31] | FI | 28.12.2016 | |
HR | 28.12.2016 | ||
LT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LV | 28.12.2016 | ||
NL | 28.12.2016 | ||
RS | 28.12.2016 | ||
SE | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.03.2017 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/28] | FI | 28.12.2016 | |
HR | 28.12.2016 | ||
LT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LV | 28.12.2016 | ||
RS | 28.12.2016 | ||
SE | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.03.2017 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 28.12.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]CN101531696 ; | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2009, no. 81, Database accession no. 2009-P08422, XP002726864 & CN101531696 A 20090916 (CHENGDU MILITARY DISTRICT KUMING GEN HOSPTIAL) [X] 1-8,10-14 * abstract * | [X] - BOGAR, "Panduvirkku Karisalai Ilagam", KEY ATTRIBUTES OF TKDL PD03/13, (19940101), pages 1 - 12, XP003025050 [X] 1-6,8-14 * pages 7,10 * | [A] - PUSHPANGADAN P ET AL, "Ethnomedical and ethnobotanical investigations among some scheduled caste communities of travancore, kerala, india", JOURNAL OF ETHNOPHARMACOLOGY, ELSEVIER IRELAND LTD, IE, vol. 16, no. 2-3, doi:10.1016/0378-8741(86)90088-7, ISSN 0378-8741, (19860601), pages 175 - 190, (19860601), XP025813244 [A] 1-14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0378-8741(86)90088-7 | [A] - SHIDDAMALLAYYA N ET AL, "Medico-botanical survey of Kumar parvatha Kukke Subramanya, Mangalore, Karnataka", INDIAN JOURNAL OF TRADITIONAL KNOWLEDGE, RESOURCES, NEW DELHI, NEW DELHI - INDIA, (20100101), vol. 9, no. 1, ISSN 0972-5938, pages 96 - 99, XP018027611 [A] 1-14 * the whole document * | International search | [X]JP2004182712 (KOEI PERFUMERY); | [E]KR20110058156 (KOREA INST ORIENTAL MEDICINE [KR]); | [X] - YANG, SHU MIN ET AL., "Chemical constituents from the roots of Homonoia riparia", ACTA PHARMACEUTICA SINICA, (2007), vol. 42, no. 3, pages 292 - 296, XP008170406 | by applicant | - VINSON, J. A. ET AL., J. NUTRITINAL BIOCHEMISTRY, (1996), vol. 7, pages 559 - 663 | - SMITH, P. R. ET AL., EUR. J. BIOCHEM., (1992), vol. 210, pages 729 - 739 | - BROWNLEE, M. ET AL., SCIENCES, (1986), vol. 232, pages 1629 - 1632 | - YOKOZAWA, T. ET AL., J. OF TRAD. MED., (2001), vol. 18, pages 107 - 112 | - KIM ET AL., Diabetes, Korean Diabetes Association, KOREA MEDICAL BOOK PUBLISHING, vol. 483 | - SOULIS-LIPAROTA, T. ET AL., DIABETOLOGIA, (1995), vol. 38, pages 357 - 394 | - NAKAMURA, N. ET AL., FREE RADIC BIOL. MED., (2000), vol. 29, pages 17 - 25 | - BROWNLEE, M. ET AL., N. ENGL. MED., (1988), vol. 318, pages 1315 - 1321 | - EDELSTEIN, D. ET AL., DIABETES, (1992), vol. 41, pages 26 - 29 | - TOKUDA H. ET AL., Book of Abstract of 53rd GA Congress joint with SIF, (2005), page 076 | - VINSON, J.A. ET AL., J. NUTR. BIOCHEM., (1996), vol. 7, pages 659 - 663 |