EP2685419 - IMAGE PROCESSING DEVICE, IMAGE PROCESSING METHOD, AND COMPUTER-READABLE MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2014/03] | IMAGE PROCESSING DEVICE, IMAGE PROCESSING METHOD, AND CONTROL PROGRAM | ||
[2017/41] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.11.2018 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.12.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.09.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Omron Corporation 801, Minamifudodo-cho Horikawahigashiiru Shiokoji-dori Shimogyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 600-8530 / JP | [2014/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AOKI, Hiromatsu c/o Omron Corporation 801, Minamifudodo-cho Horikawahigashiiru Shiokoji-dori, Shimogyo-ku, Kyoto-shi Kyoto 600-8530 / JP | [2014/03] | Representative(s) | Kilian Kilian & Partner mbB Zielstattstraße 23a 81379 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/03] | Kilian Kilian & Partner Aidenbachstraße 54 81379 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11860381.0 | 22.03.2011 | [2018/02] | WO2011JP56793 | Priority number, date | JP20110053617 | 10.03.2011 Original published format: JP 2011053617 | [2014/03] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012120697 | Date: | 13.09.2012 | Language: | JA | [2012/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2685419 | Date: | 15.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2685419 | Date: | 10.01.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 13.09.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.08.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G06K9/00, G06K9/46, G06T7/90, H04N1/62 | [2017/41] | CPC: |
H04N1/62 (EP,US);
G06T7/90 (EP,US);
G06V10/56 (EP,US);
G06V40/168 (US);
G06V40/171 (EP,US);
G06T2207/30201 (EP,US);
H04N1/628 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2014/38] | G06T7/40, G06K9/46, G06K9/00, H04N1/62 | ||
Former IPC [2014/03] | G06T1/00, G06T7/00, H04N1/46 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/03] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BILDVERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG, BILDVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN UND COMPUTERLESBARES MEDIUM | [2017/41] | English: | IMAGE PROCESSING DEVICE, IMAGE PROCESSING METHOD, AND COMPUTER-READABLE MEDIUM | [2017/41] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT D'IMAGES, PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT D'IMAGES ET SUPPORT D'ENREGISTREMENT LISIBLE PAR ORDINATEUR | [2017/41] |
Former [2014/03] | BILDVERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG, BILDVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN UND STEUERPROGRAMM | ||
Former [2014/03] | IMAGE PROCESSING DEVICE, IMAGE PROCESSING METHOD, AND CONTROL PROGRAM | ||
Former [2014/03] | DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT D'IMAGES, PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT D'IMAGES ET PROGRAMME DE COMMANDE | Entry into regional phase | 13.08.2013 | Translation filed | 30.09.2013 | National basic fee paid | 30.09.2013 | Search fee paid | 30.09.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.09.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.09.2013 | Examination requested [2014/03] | 14.03.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.12.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.04.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.12.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.02.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.09.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.11.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 29.11.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.11.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.12.2015 | Opposition(s) | 11.10.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.03.2011 | AL | 10.01.2018 | AT | 10.01.2018 | CY | 10.01.2018 | CZ | 10.01.2018 | DK | 10.01.2018 | EE | 10.01.2018 | ES | 10.01.2018 | FI | 10.01.2018 | HR | 10.01.2018 | IT | 10.01.2018 | LT | 10.01.2018 | LV | 10.01.2018 | MC | 10.01.2018 | MK | 10.01.2018 | NL | 10.01.2018 | PL | 10.01.2018 | PT | 10.01.2018 | RO | 10.01.2018 | RS | 10.01.2018 | SE | 10.01.2018 | SI | 10.01.2018 | SK | 10.01.2018 | SM | 10.01.2018 | TR | 10.01.2018 | IE | 22.03.2018 | LU | 22.03.2018 | MT | 22.03.2018 | BE | 31.03.2018 | CH | 31.03.2018 | FR | 31.03.2018 | LI | 31.03.2018 | BG | 10.04.2018 | GB | 10.04.2018 | NO | 10.04.2018 | GR | 11.04.2018 | IS | 10.05.2018 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/27] | HU | 22.03.2011 | |
AL | 10.01.2018 | ||
AT | 10.01.2018 | ||
CY | 10.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 10.01.2018 | ||
DK | 10.01.2018 | ||
EE | 10.01.2018 | ||
ES | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
HR | 10.01.2018 | ||
IT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LV | 10.01.2018 | ||
MC | 10.01.2018 | ||
NL | 10.01.2018 | ||
PL | 10.01.2018 | ||
PT | 10.01.2018 | ||
RO | 10.01.2018 | ||
RS | 10.01.2018 | ||
SE | 10.01.2018 | ||
SI | 10.01.2018 | ||
SK | 10.01.2018 | ||
SM | 10.01.2018 | ||
TR | 10.01.2018 | ||
IE | 22.03.2018 | ||
LU | 22.03.2018 | ||
MT | 22.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
CH | 31.03.2018 | ||
FR | 31.03.2018 | ||
LI | 31.03.2018 | ||
BG | 10.04.2018 | ||
GB | 10.04.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IS | 10.05.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 10.01.2018 | |
AT | 10.01.2018 | ||
CY | 10.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 10.01.2018 | ||
DK | 10.01.2018 | ||
EE | 10.01.2018 | ||
ES | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
HR | 10.01.2018 | ||
IT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LV | 10.01.2018 | ||
MC | 10.01.2018 | ||
NL | 10.01.2018 | ||
PL | 10.01.2018 | ||
RO | 10.01.2018 | ||
RS | 10.01.2018 | ||
SE | 10.01.2018 | ||
SI | 10.01.2018 | ||
SK | 10.01.2018 | ||
SM | 10.01.2018 | ||
TR | 10.01.2018 | ||
IE | 22.03.2018 | ||
LU | 22.03.2018 | ||
MT | 22.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
CH | 31.03.2018 | ||
FR | 31.03.2018 | ||
LI | 31.03.2018 | ||
BG | 10.04.2018 | ||
GB | 10.04.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IS | 10.05.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 10.01.2018 | |
AT | 10.01.2018 | ||
CY | 10.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 10.01.2018 | ||
DK | 10.01.2018 | ||
EE | 10.01.2018 | ||
ES | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
HR | 10.01.2018 | ||
IT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LV | 10.01.2018 | ||
MC | 10.01.2018 | ||
NL | 10.01.2018 | ||
PL | 10.01.2018 | ||
RO | 10.01.2018 | ||
RS | 10.01.2018 | ||
SE | 10.01.2018 | ||
SI | 10.01.2018 | ||
SK | 10.01.2018 | ||
SM | 10.01.2018 | ||
IE | 22.03.2018 | ||
LU | 22.03.2018 | ||
MT | 22.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
CH | 31.03.2018 | ||
FR | 31.03.2018 | ||
LI | 31.03.2018 | ||
BG | 10.04.2018 | ||
GB | 10.04.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IS | 10.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AL | 10.01.2018 | |
AT | 10.01.2018 | ||
CY | 10.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 10.01.2018 | ||
DK | 10.01.2018 | ||
EE | 10.01.2018 | ||
ES | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
HR | 10.01.2018 | ||
IT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LV | 10.01.2018 | ||
MC | 10.01.2018 | ||
NL | 10.01.2018 | ||
PL | 10.01.2018 | ||
RO | 10.01.2018 | ||
RS | 10.01.2018 | ||
SE | 10.01.2018 | ||
SI | 10.01.2018 | ||
SK | 10.01.2018 | ||
SM | 10.01.2018 | ||
IE | 22.03.2018 | ||
LU | 22.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
CH | 31.03.2018 | ||
FR | 31.03.2018 | ||
LI | 31.03.2018 | ||
BG | 10.04.2018 | ||
GB | 10.04.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IS | 10.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 10.01.2018 | |
AT | 10.01.2018 | ||
CY | 10.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 10.01.2018 | ||
DK | 10.01.2018 | ||
EE | 10.01.2018 | ||
ES | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
HR | 10.01.2018 | ||
IT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LV | 10.01.2018 | ||
MC | 10.01.2018 | ||
NL | 10.01.2018 | ||
PL | 10.01.2018 | ||
RO | 10.01.2018 | ||
RS | 10.01.2018 | ||
SE | 10.01.2018 | ||
SI | 10.01.2018 | ||
SK | 10.01.2018 | ||
SM | 10.01.2018 | ||
IE | 22.03.2018 | ||
LU | 22.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
CH | 31.03.2018 | ||
LI | 31.03.2018 | ||
BG | 10.04.2018 | ||
GB | 10.04.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IS | 10.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | AL | 10.01.2018 | |
AT | 10.01.2018 | ||
CY | 10.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 10.01.2018 | ||
DK | 10.01.2018 | ||
EE | 10.01.2018 | ||
ES | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
HR | 10.01.2018 | ||
IT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LV | 10.01.2018 | ||
MC | 10.01.2018 | ||
NL | 10.01.2018 | ||
PL | 10.01.2018 | ||
RO | 10.01.2018 | ||
RS | 10.01.2018 | ||
SE | 10.01.2018 | ||
SK | 10.01.2018 | ||
SM | 10.01.2018 | ||
IE | 22.03.2018 | ||
LU | 22.03.2018 | ||
BG | 10.04.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IS | 10.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/04] | AL | 10.01.2018 | |
AT | 10.01.2018 | ||
CY | 10.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 10.01.2018 | ||
DK | 10.01.2018 | ||
EE | 10.01.2018 | ||
ES | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
HR | 10.01.2018 | ||
IT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LV | 10.01.2018 | ||
MC | 10.01.2018 | ||
NL | 10.01.2018 | ||
PL | 10.01.2018 | ||
RO | 10.01.2018 | ||
RS | 10.01.2018 | ||
SE | 10.01.2018 | ||
SK | 10.01.2018 | ||
SM | 10.01.2018 | ||
LU | 22.03.2018 | ||
BG | 10.04.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IS | 10.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AL | 10.01.2018 | |
AT | 10.01.2018 | ||
CY | 10.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 10.01.2018 | ||
DK | 10.01.2018 | ||
EE | 10.01.2018 | ||
ES | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
HR | 10.01.2018 | ||
IT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LV | 10.01.2018 | ||
MC | 10.01.2018 | ||
NL | 10.01.2018 | ||
PL | 10.01.2018 | ||
RO | 10.01.2018 | ||
RS | 10.01.2018 | ||
SE | 10.01.2018 | ||
SK | 10.01.2018 | ||
SM | 10.01.2018 | ||
BG | 10.04.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IS | 10.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | AL | 10.01.2018 | |
AT | 10.01.2018 | ||
CY | 10.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 10.01.2018 | ||
DK | 10.01.2018 | ||
EE | 10.01.2018 | ||
ES | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
HR | 10.01.2018 | ||
IT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LV | 10.01.2018 | ||
NL | 10.01.2018 | ||
PL | 10.01.2018 | ||
RO | 10.01.2018 | ||
RS | 10.01.2018 | ||
SE | 10.01.2018 | ||
SK | 10.01.2018 | ||
BG | 10.04.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IS | 10.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AL | 10.01.2018 | |
AT | 10.01.2018 | ||
CY | 10.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 10.01.2018 | ||
EE | 10.01.2018 | ||
ES | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
HR | 10.01.2018 | ||
IT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LV | 10.01.2018 | ||
NL | 10.01.2018 | ||
PL | 10.01.2018 | ||
RO | 10.01.2018 | ||
RS | 10.01.2018 | ||
SE | 10.01.2018 | ||
SK | 10.01.2018 | ||
BG | 10.04.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IS | 10.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | AL | 10.01.2018 | |
AT | 10.01.2018 | ||
CY | 10.01.2018 | ||
EE | 10.01.2018 | ||
ES | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
HR | 10.01.2018 | ||
IT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LV | 10.01.2018 | ||
NL | 10.01.2018 | ||
PL | 10.01.2018 | ||
RO | 10.01.2018 | ||
RS | 10.01.2018 | ||
SE | 10.01.2018 | ||
BG | 10.04.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IS | 10.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | AL | 10.01.2018 | |
AT | 10.01.2018 | ||
CY | 10.01.2018 | ||
ES | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
HR | 10.01.2018 | ||
IT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LV | 10.01.2018 | ||
NL | 10.01.2018 | ||
PL | 10.01.2018 | ||
RS | 10.01.2018 | ||
SE | 10.01.2018 | ||
BG | 10.04.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IS | 10.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 10.01.2018 | |
AT | 10.01.2018 | ||
CY | 10.01.2018 | ||
ES | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
HR | 10.01.2018 | ||
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LV | 10.01.2018 | ||
NL | 10.01.2018 | ||
PL | 10.01.2018 | ||
RS | 10.01.2018 | ||
SE | 10.01.2018 | ||
BG | 10.04.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IS | 10.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 10.01.2018 | |
CY | 10.01.2018 | ||
ES | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
HR | 10.01.2018 | ||
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LV | 10.01.2018 | ||
NL | 10.01.2018 | ||
PL | 10.01.2018 | ||
RS | 10.01.2018 | ||
SE | 10.01.2018 | ||
BG | 10.04.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IS | 10.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 10.01.2018 | |
CY | 10.01.2018 | ||
ES | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
HR | 10.01.2018 | ||
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LV | 10.01.2018 | ||
NL | 10.01.2018 | ||
PL | 10.01.2018 | ||
RS | 10.01.2018 | ||
SE | 10.01.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IS | 10.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 10.01.2018 | |
ES | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
HR | 10.01.2018 | ||
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
NL | 10.01.2018 | ||
PL | 10.01.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/36] | CY | 10.01.2018 | |
ES | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
HR | 10.01.2018 | ||
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
NL | 10.01.2018 | ||
PL | 10.01.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | CY | 10.01.2018 | |
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
HR | 10.01.2018 | ||
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
NL | 10.01.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/34] | FI | 10.01.2018 | |
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
NL | 10.01.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2008226147 (HARGROVE JOHN [US], et al) [A] 1,10,11* paragraph [0043]; figure 3 *; | [A]US2008253651 (SAGAWA NAOTSUGU [JP]) [A] 1,8,10,11 * paragraph [0058] - paragraph [0082]; figures 5-8 *; | [A]EP2234063 (SHISEIDO CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-11 * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0113]; figures 12-14 *; | [A] - GIRIJA CHETTY ET AL, "Multimodal feature fusion for video forgery detection", INFORMATION FUSION (FUSION), 2010 13TH CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, (20100726), ISBN 978-0-9824438-1-1, pages 1 - 7, XP031913229 [A] 1,10,11 * the whole document * | [A] - SOBOTTKA K ET AL, "Face localization and facial feature extraction based on shape and color information", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON IMAGE PROCESSING (ICIP) LAUSANNE, SEPT. 16 - 19, 1996; [PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON IMAGE PROCESSING (ICIP)], NEW YORK, IEEE, US, (19960916), vol. 3, doi:10.1109/ICIP.1996.560536, ISBN 978-0-7803-3259-1, pages 483 - 486, XP010202436 [A] 1,10,11 * page 484; figure 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICIP.1996.560536 | [A] - YAO H ET AL, "Face detection and location based on skin chrominance and lip chrominance transformation from color images", PATTERN RECOGNITION, ELSEVIER, GB, (20010801), vol. 34, no. 8, doi:10.1016/S0031-3203(00)00090-X, ISSN 0031-3203, pages 1555 - 1564, XP004362566 [A] 1,10,11 * page 1555 - page 1564; figure 8 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0031-3203(00)00090-X | [A] - BIBI SOMAYEH MOUSAVI ET AL, "Optimized fuzzy system using genetic algorithm to detect faces in color images", ELECTRICAL ENGINEERING (ICEE), 2010 18TH IRANIAN CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20100511), ISBN 978-1-4244-6760-0, pages 177 - 182, XP031706868 [A] 1,10,11 * page 177; figure 1 * | International search | [X]JP2005276182 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD); | [Y]JP2008160474 (CANON KK) | Examination | EP1810594 | by applicant | JP2009231879 |