EP2682901 - TEXT STRING CUT-OUT METHOD AND TEXT STRING CUT-OUT DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 07.04.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.04.2017 | Refusal of application | published on 10.05.2017 [2017/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Glory Ltd. 3-1 Shimoteno 1-chome Himeji-shi Hyogo 670-8567 / JP | [2014/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GOTO, Masanori c/o GLORY LTD. 3-1 Shimoteno 1-chome Himeji-shi Hyogo 670-8567 / JP | 02 /
YONEZAWA, Toru c/o GLORY LTD. 3-1 Shimoteno 1-chome Himeji-shi Hyogo 670-8567 / JP | 03 /
KUROIWA, Motoko c/o GLORY LTD. 3-1 Shimoteno 1-chome Himeji-shi Hyogo 670-8567 / JP | [2014/02] | Representative(s) | SSM Sandmair Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt Partnerschaft mbB Joseph-Wild-Straße 20 81829 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/02] | Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx Patentanwälte Stuntzstraße 16 81677 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11860608.6 | 04.03.2011 | WO2011JP55042 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012120587 | Date: | 13.09.2012 | Language: | JA | [2012/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2682901 | Date: | 08.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 13.09.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.07.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G06K9/20, G07D7/20, G06K9/00, G06K9/18, G06K9/32, G06K9/34 | [2014/36] | CPC: |
G06V30/147 (EP,US);
G06V30/15 (EP,US);
G06V30/224 (US);
G06V30/40 (EP,US);
G06V30/10 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2014/02] | G06K9/20 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/02] | Title | German: | AUSSCHNITTVERFAHREN FÜR TEXTELEMENTE AUSSCHNITTVORRICHTUNG FÜR TEXTELEMENTE | [2014/02] | English: | TEXT STRING CUT-OUT METHOD AND TEXT STRING CUT-OUT DEVICE | [2014/02] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE TRONCATION DE CHAÎNE DE TEXTE ET DISPOSITIF DE TRONCATION DE CHAÎNE DE TEXTE | [2014/02] | Entry into regional phase | 02.09.2013 | Translation filed | 02.09.2013 | National basic fee paid | 02.09.2013 | Search fee paid | 02.09.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.09.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.09.2013 | Examination requested [2014/02] | 19.02.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.08.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.12.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.11.2016 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2017/19] | 23.11.2016 | Date of oral proceedings | 23.12.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2017/19] | 23.12.2016 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.08.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5915039 (LORIE RAYMOND AMAND [US], et al) [X] 1-11 * column 6, line 39 - column 8, line 15 *; | [A] - OBEID H R ET AL, "License Plate Localization in ALPR Systems", INNOVATIONS IN INFORMATION TECHNOLOGY, 4TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, PI, (20071118), ISBN 978-1-4244-1840-4, pages 486 - 490, XP031226620 [A] 1-11 * Section 3.2 * | [A] - ERIK RODNER ET AL, "Difference of Boxes Filters Revisited: Shadow Suppression and Efficient Character Segmentation", DOCUMENT ANALYSIS SYSTEMS, 2008. DAS '08. THE EIGHTH IAPR INTERNATIONAL WORKSHOP ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20080916), ISBN 978-0-7695-3337-7, pages 263 - 269, XP031360494 [A] 1-11 * Section 2.2 * | [A] - Vassilios Vonikakis ET AL, "ADAPTIVE DOCUMENT BINARIZATION A human vision approach", 2nd International Conference on Computer Vision Theory and Applications VISAPP, (20070308), pages 1 - 6, URL: http://www.researchgate.net/publication/221415249_Adaptive_document_binarization_-_a_human_vision_approach, (20140723), XP055131303 [A] 1-11 * Section 2, Figure 3. * | [A] - NORMAN F BRICKMAN ET AL, "Word Autocorrelation Redundancy Match (WARM) Technology", IBM JOURNAL OF RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT,, (19821101), vol. 26, no. 6, pages 681 - 686, XP001379913 [A] 1-11 * Section 2 "Preliminary screening";; figure 2 * | International search | [A]JPH04104385 (NTT DATA TSUSHIN KK); | [A]JPH09259219 (SHARP KK); | [A]JP2010225013 (HITACHI OMRON TERMINAL SOLU) |