EP2680175 - DESIGN ASSISTANCE SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 28.02.2020 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.02.2020 | Revocation of patent | published on 01.04.2020 [2020/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Omron Corporation 801, Minamifudodo-cho Horikawahigashiiru Shiokoji-dori Shimogyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 600-8530 / JP | [2014/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SASAKI, Hiromi c/o OMRON Corporation 801, Minamifudodo-cho, Horikawahigashiiru Shiokoji-dori, Shimogyo-Ku, Kyoto-shi Kyoto 600-8530 / JP | 02 /
YOSHIDA, Hiroshi c/o OMRON Corporation 801, Minamifudodo-cho, Horikawahigashiiru Shiokoji-dori, Shimogyo-Ku, Kyoto-shi Kyoto 600-8530 / JP | 03 /
IWAMURA, Shintaro c/o OMRON Corporation 801, Minamifudodo-cho, Horikawahigashiiru Shiokoji-dori, Shimogyo-Ku, Kyoto-shi Kyoto 600-8530 / JP | 04 /
NAMIE, Masaki c/o OMRON Corporation 801, Minamifudodo-cho, Horikawahigashiiru Shiokoji-dori, Shimogyo-Ku, Kyoto-shi Kyoto 600-8530 / JP | [2014/01] | Representative(s) | Horn Kleimann Waitzhofer Schmid-Dreyer Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Theresienhöhe 12 80339 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/08] | Horn Kleimann Waitzhofer Patentanwälte PartG mbB Ganghoferstrasse 29a 80339 München / DE | ||
Former [2014/01] | Horn Kleimann Waitzhofer Elsenheimerstraße 65 DE-80687 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11860768.8 | 23.03.2011 | [2016/08] | WO2011JP56943 | Priority number, date | JP20110056397 | 15.03.2011 Original published format: JP 2011056397 | [2014/01] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012124154 | Date: | 20.09.2012 | Language: | JA | [2012/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2680175 | Date: | 01.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2680175 | Date: | 24.02.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 20.09.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.10.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/24 | [2014/47] | CPC: |
H04L41/145 (EP,US);
G05B19/056 (EP,US);
H04L41/12 (US);
H04L41/22 (EP,US);
G05B2219/13164 (EP,US);
G05B2219/23043 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2014/01] | G06F17/50 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/01] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DESIGNHILFSSYSTEM | [2014/01] | English: | DESIGN ASSISTANCE SYSTEM | [2014/01] | French: | SYSTÈME D'AIDE À LA CONCEPTION | [2014/01] | Entry into regional phase | 27.09.2013 | Translation filed | 27.09.2013 | National basic fee paid | 27.09.2013 | Search fee paid | 27.09.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.09.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.12.2012 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 27.09.2013 | Examination requested [2014/01] | 30.04.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.08.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.11.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 24.11.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.12.2015 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 08.12.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.08.2015 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
21.11.2016
ADMISSIBLE WAGO Kontakttechnik GmbH & Co. KG Hansastraße 27 32423 Minden / DE Opponent's representative Wunsch, Alexander Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | 02
22.11.2016
ADMISSIBLE SICK AG Erwin-Sick-Strasse 1 79183 Waldkirch / DE Opponent's representative Ludewigt, Christoph Sick AG Intellectual Property Erwin-Sick-Strasse 1 79183 Waldkirch / DE | 03
24.11.2016
ADMISSIBLE Phoenix Contact GmbH & Co. KG Flachsmarktstrasse 8 32825 Blomberg / DE Opponent's representative Blumbach · Zinngrebe Patentanwälte PartG mbB Elisabethenstrasse 11 64283 Darmstadt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/52] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
21.11.2016
ADMISSIBLE WAGO Kontakttechnik GmbH & Co. KG Hansastraße 27 32423 Minden / DE Opponent's representative Wunsch, Alexander Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | ||
02
22.11.2016
ADMISSIBLE SICK AG Erwin-Sick-Strasse 1 79183 Waldkirch/Breisgau / DE Opponent's representative Ludewigt, Christoph Sick AG Intellectual Property Erwin-Sick-Strasse 1 79183 Waldkirch / DE | |||
03
24.11.2016
ADMISSIBLE Phoenix Contact GmbH & Co. KG Flachsmarktstrasse 8 32825 Blomberg / DE Opponent's representative Blumbach Zinngrebe Patentanwälte Elisabethenstrasse 11 64283 Darmstadt / DE | 23.01.2017 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 02.08.2017 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 08.12.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 18.04.2018 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 12.09.2019 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 17.10.2019 | 17.10.2019 | Date of oral proceedings | 14.11.2019 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 24.11.2019 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2020/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.03.2011 | AL | 24.02.2016 | AT | 24.02.2016 | BE | 24.02.2016 | CY | 24.02.2016 | CZ | 24.02.2016 | DK | 24.02.2016 | EE | 24.02.2016 | ES | 24.02.2016 | FI | 24.02.2016 | HR | 24.02.2016 | IS | 24.02.2016 | IT | 24.02.2016 | LT | 24.02.2016 | LV | 24.02.2016 | MC | 24.02.2016 | MK | 24.02.2016 | NL | 24.02.2016 | PL | 24.02.2016 | RO | 24.02.2016 | RS | 24.02.2016 | SE | 24.02.2016 | SI | 24.02.2016 | SK | 24.02.2016 | SM | 24.02.2016 | TR | 24.02.2016 | IE | 23.03.2016 | LU | 23.03.2016 | CH | 31.03.2016 | LI | 31.03.2016 | MT | 31.03.2016 | FR | 25.04.2016 | BG | 24.05.2016 | GB | 24.05.2016 | NO | 24.05.2016 | GR | 25.05.2016 | PT | 24.06.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 23.03.2011 | |
AT | 24.02.2016 | ||
BE | 24.02.2016 | ||
CY | 24.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2016 | ||
DK | 24.02.2016 | ||
EE | 24.02.2016 | ||
ES | 24.02.2016 | ||
FI | 24.02.2016 | ||
HR | 24.02.2016 | ||
IS | 24.02.2016 | ||
IT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LV | 24.02.2016 | ||
MC | 24.02.2016 | ||
MK | 24.02.2016 | ||
NL | 24.02.2016 | ||
PL | 24.02.2016 | ||
RO | 24.02.2016 | ||
RS | 24.02.2016 | ||
SE | 24.02.2016 | ||
SI | 24.02.2016 | ||
SK | 24.02.2016 | ||
SM | 24.02.2016 | ||
TR | 24.02.2016 | ||
IE | 23.03.2016 | ||
LU | 23.03.2016 | ||
CH | 31.03.2016 | ||
LI | 31.03.2016 | ||
MT | 31.03.2016 | ||
FR | 25.04.2016 | ||
BG | 24.05.2016 | ||
GB | 24.05.2016 | ||
NO | 24.05.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
PT | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 23.03.2011 | |
AT | 24.02.2016 | ||
BE | 24.02.2016 | ||
CY | 24.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2016 | ||
DK | 24.02.2016 | ||
EE | 24.02.2016 | ||
ES | 24.02.2016 | ||
FI | 24.02.2016 | ||
HR | 24.02.2016 | ||
IT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LV | 24.02.2016 | ||
MC | 24.02.2016 | ||
MK | 24.02.2016 | ||
MT | 24.02.2016 | ||
NL | 24.02.2016 | ||
PL | 24.02.2016 | ||
RO | 24.02.2016 | ||
RS | 24.02.2016 | ||
SE | 24.02.2016 | ||
SI | 24.02.2016 | ||
SK | 24.02.2016 | ||
SM | 24.02.2016 | ||
TR | 24.02.2016 | ||
IE | 23.03.2016 | ||
LU | 23.03.2016 | ||
CH | 31.03.2016 | ||
LI | 31.03.2016 | ||
FR | 25.04.2016 | ||
BG | 24.05.2016 | ||
GB | 24.05.2016 | ||
NO | 24.05.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
PT | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 23.03.2011 | |
AT | 24.02.2016 | ||
BE | 24.02.2016 | ||
CY | 24.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2016 | ||
DK | 24.02.2016 | ||
EE | 24.02.2016 | ||
ES | 24.02.2016 | ||
FI | 24.02.2016 | ||
HR | 24.02.2016 | ||
IT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LV | 24.02.2016 | ||
MC | 24.02.2016 | ||
MK | 24.02.2016 | ||
MT | 24.02.2016 | ||
NL | 24.02.2016 | ||
PL | 24.02.2016 | ||
RO | 24.02.2016 | ||
RS | 24.02.2016 | ||
SE | 24.02.2016 | ||
SI | 24.02.2016 | ||
SK | 24.02.2016 | ||
SM | 24.02.2016 | ||
IE | 23.03.2016 | ||
CH | 31.03.2016 | ||
LI | 31.03.2016 | ||
FR | 25.04.2016 | ||
BG | 24.05.2016 | ||
GB | 24.05.2016 | ||
NO | 24.05.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
PT | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2017/47] | AT | 24.02.2016 | |
BE | 24.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2016 | ||
DK | 24.02.2016 | ||
EE | 24.02.2016 | ||
ES | 24.02.2016 | ||
FI | 24.02.2016 | ||
HR | 24.02.2016 | ||
IT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LV | 24.02.2016 | ||
MT | 24.02.2016 | ||
NL | 24.02.2016 | ||
PL | 24.02.2016 | ||
RO | 24.02.2016 | ||
RS | 24.02.2016 | ||
SE | 24.02.2016 | ||
SI | 24.02.2016 | ||
SK | 24.02.2016 | ||
SM | 24.02.2016 | ||
IE | 23.03.2016 | ||
CH | 31.03.2016 | ||
LI | 31.03.2016 | ||
FR | 25.04.2016 | ||
BG | 24.05.2016 | ||
GB | 24.05.2016 | ||
NO | 24.05.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
PT | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2017/26] | AT | 24.02.2016 | |
BE | 24.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2016 | ||
DK | 24.02.2016 | ||
EE | 24.02.2016 | ||
ES | 24.02.2016 | ||
FI | 24.02.2016 | ||
HR | 24.02.2016 | ||
IT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LV | 24.02.2016 | ||
NL | 24.02.2016 | ||
PL | 24.02.2016 | ||
RO | 24.02.2016 | ||
RS | 24.02.2016 | ||
SE | 24.02.2016 | ||
SI | 24.02.2016 | ||
SK | 24.02.2016 | ||
SM | 24.02.2016 | ||
IE | 23.03.2016 | ||
CH | 31.03.2016 | ||
LI | 31.03.2016 | ||
FR | 25.04.2016 | ||
BG | 24.05.2016 | ||
GB | 24.05.2016 | ||
NO | 24.05.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
PT | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2017/16] | AT | 24.02.2016 | |
BE | 24.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2016 | ||
DK | 24.02.2016 | ||
EE | 24.02.2016 | ||
ES | 24.02.2016 | ||
FI | 24.02.2016 | ||
HR | 24.02.2016 | ||
IT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LV | 24.02.2016 | ||
NL | 24.02.2016 | ||
PL | 24.02.2016 | ||
RO | 24.02.2016 | ||
RS | 24.02.2016 | ||
SE | 24.02.2016 | ||
SI | 24.02.2016 | ||
SK | 24.02.2016 | ||
SM | 24.02.2016 | ||
IE | 23.03.2016 | ||
CH | 31.03.2016 | ||
LI | 31.03.2016 | ||
BG | 24.05.2016 | ||
NO | 24.05.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
PT | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 24.02.2016 | |
BE | 24.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2016 | ||
DK | 24.02.2016 | ||
EE | 24.02.2016 | ||
ES | 24.02.2016 | ||
FI | 24.02.2016 | ||
HR | 24.02.2016 | ||
IT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LV | 24.02.2016 | ||
NL | 24.02.2016 | ||
PL | 24.02.2016 | ||
RO | 24.02.2016 | ||
RS | 24.02.2016 | ||
SE | 24.02.2016 | ||
SK | 24.02.2016 | ||
SM | 24.02.2016 | ||
IE | 23.03.2016 | ||
CH | 31.03.2016 | ||
LI | 31.03.2016 | ||
NO | 24.05.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
PT | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 24.02.2016 | |
BE | 24.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2016 | ||
DK | 24.02.2016 | ||
EE | 24.02.2016 | ||
ES | 24.02.2016 | ||
FI | 24.02.2016 | ||
HR | 24.02.2016 | ||
IT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LV | 24.02.2016 | ||
NL | 24.02.2016 | ||
PL | 24.02.2016 | ||
RO | 24.02.2016 | ||
RS | 24.02.2016 | ||
SE | 24.02.2016 | ||
SK | 24.02.2016 | ||
SM | 24.02.2016 | ||
NO | 24.05.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
PT | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 24.02.2016 | |
CZ | 24.02.2016 | ||
DK | 24.02.2016 | ||
EE | 24.02.2016 | ||
ES | 24.02.2016 | ||
FI | 24.02.2016 | ||
HR | 24.02.2016 | ||
IT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LV | 24.02.2016 | ||
NL | 24.02.2016 | ||
PL | 24.02.2016 | ||
RO | 24.02.2016 | ||
RS | 24.02.2016 | ||
SE | 24.02.2016 | ||
SK | 24.02.2016 | ||
SM | 24.02.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
NO | 24.05.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
PT | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 24.02.2016 | |
DK | 24.02.2016 | ||
EE | 24.02.2016 | ||
ES | 24.02.2016 | ||
FI | 24.02.2016 | ||
HR | 24.02.2016 | ||
IT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LV | 24.02.2016 | ||
NL | 24.02.2016 | ||
PL | 24.02.2016 | ||
RS | 24.02.2016 | ||
SE | 24.02.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
NO | 24.05.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
PT | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | AT | 24.02.2016 | |
DK | 24.02.2016 | ||
ES | 24.02.2016 | ||
FI | 24.02.2016 | ||
HR | 24.02.2016 | ||
IT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LV | 24.02.2016 | ||
NL | 24.02.2016 | ||
PL | 24.02.2016 | ||
RS | 24.02.2016 | ||
SE | 24.02.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
NO | 24.05.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
PT | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 24.02.2016 | |
ES | 24.02.2016 | ||
FI | 24.02.2016 | ||
HR | 24.02.2016 | ||
IT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LV | 24.02.2016 | ||
NL | 24.02.2016 | ||
PL | 24.02.2016 | ||
RS | 24.02.2016 | ||
SE | 24.02.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
NO | 24.05.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
PT | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | AT | 24.02.2016 | |
ES | 24.02.2016 | ||
FI | 24.02.2016 | ||
HR | 24.02.2016 | ||
IT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
NL | 24.02.2016 | ||
PL | 24.02.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
NO | 24.05.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
PT | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 24.02.2016 | |
ES | 24.02.2016 | ||
FI | 24.02.2016 | ||
HR | 24.02.2016 | ||
IT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
NL | 24.02.2016 | ||
PL | 24.02.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
NO | 24.05.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | ES | 24.02.2016 | |
FI | 24.02.2016 | ||
HR | 24.02.2016 | ||
NO | 24.05.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2006107856 (RIIP INC [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * figures 1, 4 * * page 9, line 6 - line 17 * * page 10, line 5 - line 14 ** page 11, line 5 - line 20 *; | [A]US7263070 (DELKER JASON [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * figures 1, 2 * * column 1, line 22 - line 57 * * column 3, line 49 - line 61 * * column 4, line 42 - line 57 *; | [A]EP1950909 (ALCATEL ITALIA [IT]) [A] 1-13 * figures 1, 3 * * column 1, paragraph 2 * * column 3, paragraphs 14, 16 * * column 6, paragraph 38 * * column 9, paragraph 53 * * column 10, paragraphs 62, 63 *; | [A]US2009171629 (HIROSE TAKASHI [JP]) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [A]US7697419 (DONTHI PRAVEEN [US]) [A] 1-13 * figures 1, 9 * * column 2, line 9 - line 20 * * column 3, line 43 - line 59 * * column 4, line 4 - line 19 * | International search | [Y]WO2008001704 (ITOCHU TECHNO SOLUTIONS CORP [JP], et al); | [Y]JP2010218083 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) | by applicant | JP2001320393 | JP2006285757 | JP2007235349 | JP2008097551 | JP2010220161 | Opposition | US5819042 | US5841654 | US2005228517 | EP1950909 | EP2680175 | WO2006107856 | US7263070 | WO2008001704 | US2009171629 | US7697419 | JP2010218083 | DE10204826 | - Sick AG, "Flexi Soft Designer Software", Betriebsanleitung, (20091203), pages 1 - 187, XP055326726 | - Sick AG, "Flexi Soft Modulare Sicherheits-Steuerung Hardware", Betriebsanleitung, (20091112), pages 1 - 71, XP055326735 | - "Interbus, Referenzhandbuch IBS CMD G4, Artikelnummer 2722247", Phoenix Contact, (19980600), XP055326410 | - Phoenix Contact, "Schnelleinstieg UM QS DE PC WORX", AUTOMATIONWORX, (20070400), XP055326425 | - "Interbus, IBS CMD G4-Schnelleinstieg", Phoenix Contact, (20020800), XP055326220 | - "Hinweise zur Dokumentation über TwinCAT Manager System", Beckhoff Automation System, (20160000), pages 1 - 585, XP055333204 | - "TwinCAT System: benutzerinterface", TwinCAT Übersicht, (20160000), pages 1 - 714, XP055333189 | - "Hinweise zur Dokumentation (Handbuch über TwinCAT_Quickstart)", Beckhoff Automation, (20160000), pages 1 - 76, XP055326921 | - Beckhoff, "EtherCAT", System Basis-Dokumentation Version 1.6, (20100210), pages 1 - 67, XP055326172 | - Anonymous, "TwinCAT-SPS und Motion Control auf dem PC", Beckhoff, (20090000), pages 1 - 123, XP055326169 |