EP2687544 - PRODUCTION METHOD FOR HYDROPHILIC MODIFIED POLYROTAXANE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.08.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Seika Chemicals Co., Ltd. 346-1, Miyanishi Harima-cho Kako-gun Hyogo 675-0145 / JP | For all designated states Advanced Softmaterials Inc. 4-6 Kashiwanoha 5-chome Kashiwa-shi Chiba 277-0882 / JP | [2014/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAMASAKI Tomoaki c/o SUMITOMO SEIKA CHEMICALS CO. LTD. 1 Irifune-cho Shikama-ku Himeji-shi Hyogo 672-8076 / JP | 02 /
OKAZAKI Shinya c/o SUMITOMO SEIKA CHEMICALS CO. LTD. 1 Irifune-cho Shikama-ku Himeji-shi Hyogo 672-8076 / JP | 03 /
OKAZAKI Hiroki c/o SUMITOMO SEIKA CHEMICALS CO. LTD. 1 Irifune-cho Shikama-ku Himeji-shi Hyogo 672-8076 / JP | 04 /
HAMAMOTO Shigeki c/o SUMITOMO SEIKA CHEMICALS CO. LTD. 1 Irifune-cho Shikama-ku Himeji-shi Hyogo 672-8076 / JP | 05 /
HAYASHI Yuki c/o ADVANCED SOFTMATERIALS INC. 4-6 Kashiwanoha 5-chome Kashiwa-shi Chiba 277-0882 / JP | 06 /
IWATA Minoru c/o ADVANCED SOFTMATERIALS INC. 4-6 Kashiwanoha 5-chome Kashiwa-shi Chiba 277-0882 / JP | [2014/04] | Representative(s) | Webster, Jeremy Mark, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/42] | Webster, Jeremy Mark, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | ||
Former [2014/04] | Webster, Jeremy Mark, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | Application number, filing date | 11860852.0 | 05.12.2011 | [2015/42] | WO2011JP78020 | Priority number, date | JP20110055504 | 14.03.2011 Original published format: JP 2011055504 | [2014/04] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012124218 | Date: | 20.09.2012 | Language: | JA | [2012/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2687544 | Date: | 22.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2687544 | Date: | 14.10.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 20.09.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.10.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C08B37/16, C08G65/06, C08J3/12 | [2014/04] | CPC: |
C08B37/0015 (EP,US);
C08B37/0012 (KR);
C08G65/06 (KR);
C08G65/332 (EP,US);
C08G65/3331 (EP,US);
C08G65/33396 (EP,US);
C08G83/007 (EP,US);
C08J3/12 (KR,US);
C08J5/18 (US);
| C-Set: |
C08L5/16, C08L71/02 (US,EP);
C08L71/02, C08L5/16 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/04] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON HYDROPHILEM MODIFIZIERTEM POLYROTAXAN | [2014/04] | English: | PRODUCTION METHOD FOR HYDROPHILIC MODIFIED POLYROTAXANE | [2014/04] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE POLYROTAXANE MODIFIÉ HYDROPHILE | [2014/04] | Entry into regional phase | 18.09.2013 | Translation filed | 30.09.2013 | National basic fee paid | 30.09.2013 | Search fee paid | 30.09.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.09.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.09.2013 | Examination requested [2014/04] | 30.04.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.09.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 07.09.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 07.09.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.04.2015 | Opposition(s) | 15.07.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.12.2011 | AL | 14.10.2015 | AT | 14.10.2015 | BE | 14.10.2015 | BG | 14.10.2015 | CY | 14.10.2015 | CZ | 14.10.2015 | DK | 14.10.2015 | EE | 14.10.2015 | FI | 14.10.2015 | HR | 14.10.2015 | LT | 14.10.2015 | LV | 14.10.2015 | MC | 14.10.2015 | MK | 14.10.2015 | MT | 14.10.2015 | NL | 14.10.2015 | PL | 14.10.2015 | RO | 14.10.2015 | RS | 14.10.2015 | SE | 14.10.2015 | SI | 14.10.2015 | SK | 14.10.2015 | SM | 14.10.2015 | TR | 14.10.2015 | IE | 05.12.2015 | LU | 05.12.2015 | CH | 31.12.2015 | LI | 31.12.2015 | NO | 14.01.2016 | GR | 15.01.2016 | IS | 14.02.2016 | PT | 15.02.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/45] | HU | 05.12.2011 | |
AT | 14.10.2015 | ||
BE | 14.10.2015 | ||
BG | 14.10.2015 | ||
CY | 14.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 14.10.2015 | ||
DK | 14.10.2015 | ||
EE | 14.10.2015 | ||
FI | 14.10.2015 | ||
HR | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LV | 14.10.2015 | ||
MC | 14.10.2015 | ||
MK | 14.10.2015 | ||
MT | 14.10.2015 | ||
NL | 14.10.2015 | ||
PL | 14.10.2015 | ||
RO | 14.10.2015 | ||
RS | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
SI | 14.10.2015 | ||
SK | 14.10.2015 | ||
SM | 14.10.2015 | ||
TR | 14.10.2015 | ||
IE | 05.12.2015 | ||
LU | 05.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 14.01.2016 | ||
GR | 15.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
PT | 15.02.2016 | ||
Former [2018/31] | HU | 05.12.2011 | |
AT | 14.10.2015 | ||
BE | 14.10.2015 | ||
BG | 14.10.2015 | ||
CY | 14.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 14.10.2015 | ||
DK | 14.10.2015 | ||
EE | 14.10.2015 | ||
FI | 14.10.2015 | ||
HR | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LV | 14.10.2015 | ||
MC | 14.10.2015 | ||
MK | 14.10.2015 | ||
MT | 14.10.2015 | ||
NL | 14.10.2015 | ||
PL | 14.10.2015 | ||
RO | 14.10.2015 | ||
RS | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
SI | 14.10.2015 | ||
SK | 14.10.2015 | ||
SM | 14.10.2015 | ||
IE | 05.12.2015 | ||
LU | 05.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 14.01.2016 | ||
GR | 15.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
PT | 15.02.2016 | ||
Former [2017/39] | HU | 05.12.2011 | |
AT | 14.10.2015 | ||
BE | 14.10.2015 | ||
BG | 14.10.2015 | ||
CY | 14.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 14.10.2015 | ||
DK | 14.10.2015 | ||
EE | 14.10.2015 | ||
FI | 14.10.2015 | ||
HR | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LV | 14.10.2015 | ||
MC | 14.10.2015 | ||
MT | 14.10.2015 | ||
NL | 14.10.2015 | ||
PL | 14.10.2015 | ||
RO | 14.10.2015 | ||
RS | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
SI | 14.10.2015 | ||
SK | 14.10.2015 | ||
SM | 14.10.2015 | ||
IE | 05.12.2015 | ||
LU | 05.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 14.01.2016 | ||
GR | 15.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
PT | 15.02.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 14.10.2015 | |
BE | 14.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 14.10.2015 | ||
DK | 14.10.2015 | ||
EE | 14.10.2015 | ||
FI | 14.10.2015 | ||
HR | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LV | 14.10.2015 | ||
MC | 14.10.2015 | ||
NL | 14.10.2015 | ||
PL | 14.10.2015 | ||
RO | 14.10.2015 | ||
RS | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
SI | 14.10.2015 | ||
SK | 14.10.2015 | ||
SM | 14.10.2015 | ||
IE | 05.12.2015 | ||
LU | 05.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 14.01.2016 | ||
GR | 15.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
PT | 15.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 14.10.2015 | |
CZ | 14.10.2015 | ||
DK | 14.10.2015 | ||
EE | 14.10.2015 | ||
FI | 14.10.2015 | ||
HR | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LV | 14.10.2015 | ||
MC | 14.10.2015 | ||
NL | 14.10.2015 | ||
PL | 14.10.2015 | ||
RO | 14.10.2015 | ||
RS | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
SI | 14.10.2015 | ||
SK | 14.10.2015 | ||
SM | 14.10.2015 | ||
IE | 05.12.2015 | ||
LU | 05.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 14.01.2016 | ||
GR | 15.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
PT | 15.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | AT | 14.10.2015 | |
CZ | 14.10.2015 | ||
DK | 14.10.2015 | ||
EE | 14.10.2015 | ||
FI | 14.10.2015 | ||
HR | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LV | 14.10.2015 | ||
MC | 14.10.2015 | ||
NL | 14.10.2015 | ||
PL | 14.10.2015 | ||
RO | 14.10.2015 | ||
RS | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
SK | 14.10.2015 | ||
SM | 14.10.2015 | ||
IE | 05.12.2015 | ||
LU | 05.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 14.01.2016 | ||
GR | 15.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
PT | 15.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/45] | AT | 14.10.2015 | |
CZ | 14.10.2015 | ||
DK | 14.10.2015 | ||
EE | 14.10.2015 | ||
FI | 14.10.2015 | ||
HR | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LV | 14.10.2015 | ||
MC | 14.10.2015 | ||
NL | 14.10.2015 | ||
PL | 14.10.2015 | ||
RO | 14.10.2015 | ||
RS | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
SK | 14.10.2015 | ||
SM | 14.10.2015 | ||
IE | 05.12.2015 | ||
LU | 05.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 14.01.2016 | ||
GR | 15.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
PT | 15.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 14.10.2015 | |
CZ | 14.10.2015 | ||
DK | 14.10.2015 | ||
EE | 14.10.2015 | ||
FI | 14.10.2015 | ||
HR | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LV | 14.10.2015 | ||
MC | 14.10.2015 | ||
NL | 14.10.2015 | ||
PL | 14.10.2015 | ||
RO | 14.10.2015 | ||
RS | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
SK | 14.10.2015 | ||
SM | 14.10.2015 | ||
LU | 05.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 14.01.2016 | ||
GR | 15.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
PT | 15.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | AT | 14.10.2015 | |
CZ | 14.10.2015 | ||
EE | 14.10.2015 | ||
FI | 14.10.2015 | ||
HR | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LV | 14.10.2015 | ||
MC | 14.10.2015 | ||
NL | 14.10.2015 | ||
PL | 14.10.2015 | ||
RO | 14.10.2015 | ||
RS | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
SK | 14.10.2015 | ||
SM | 14.10.2015 | ||
LU | 05.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 14.01.2016 | ||
GR | 15.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
PT | 15.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 14.10.2015 | |
CZ | 14.10.2015 | ||
EE | 14.10.2015 | ||
FI | 14.10.2015 | ||
HR | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LV | 14.10.2015 | ||
MC | 14.10.2015 | ||
NL | 14.10.2015 | ||
PL | 14.10.2015 | ||
RO | 14.10.2015 | ||
RS | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
SK | 14.10.2015 | ||
LU | 05.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 14.01.2016 | ||
GR | 15.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
PT | 15.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/34] | AT | 14.10.2015 | |
CZ | 14.10.2015 | ||
FI | 14.10.2015 | ||
HR | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LV | 14.10.2015 | ||
MC | 14.10.2015 | ||
NL | 14.10.2015 | ||
PL | 14.10.2015 | ||
RS | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
LU | 05.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 14.01.2016 | ||
GR | 15.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
PT | 15.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/33] | AT | 14.10.2015 | |
FI | 14.10.2015 | ||
HR | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LV | 14.10.2015 | ||
MC | 14.10.2015 | ||
NL | 14.10.2015 | ||
PL | 14.10.2015 | ||
RS | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 14.01.2016 | ||
GR | 15.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
PT | 15.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 14.10.2015 | |
FI | 14.10.2015 | ||
HR | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LV | 14.10.2015 | ||
NL | 14.10.2015 | ||
PL | 14.10.2015 | ||
RS | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 14.01.2016 | ||
GR | 15.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
PT | 15.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 14.10.2015 | |
FI | 14.10.2015 | ||
HR | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
NL | 14.10.2015 | ||
PL | 14.10.2015 | ||
RS | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 14.01.2016 | ||
GR | 15.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
PT | 15.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | HR | 14.10.2015 | |
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
NL | 14.10.2015 | ||
RS | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
NO | 14.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/22] | LT | 14.10.2015 | |
NL | 14.10.2015 | ||
NO | 14.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | LT | 14.10.2015 | |
NO | 14.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/20] | LT | 14.10.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1921105 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP], et al) [A] 1-5 * page 8 - page 18 *; | [T]EP2653482 (SUMITOMO SEIKA CHEMICALS [JP], et al) [T] * paragraph [0008]; examples 1-8; table 1 * | International search | [Y]JP2007063412 (NISSAN MOTOR, et al); | [Y] - KAGAKU DAIJITEN HENSHU IINKAI, KAGAKU DAIJITEN 2, (1960), pages 658 - 659, XP008171450 | by applicant | WO2005052026 | JP2007063412 |