EP2687545 - HYDROPHILIC MODIFIED POLYROTAXANE COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.12.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL, IS | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Seika Chemicals Co., Ltd. 346-1, Miyanishi Harima-cho Kako-gun, Hyogo 675-0145 / JP | For all designated states Advanced Softmaterials Inc. 4-6 Kashiwanoha 5-chome Kashiwa-shi Chiba 277-0882 / JP | [2014/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAMASAKI Tomoaki c/o SUMITOMO SEIKA CHEMICALS CO. LTD. 1 Irifune-cho Shikama-ku Himeji-shi Hyogo 672-8076 / JP | 02 /
OKAZAKI Shinya c/o SUMITOMO SEIKA CHEMICALS CO. LTD. 1 Irifune-cho Shikama-ku Himeji-shi Hyogo 672-8076 / JP | 03 /
OKAZAKI Hiroki c/o SUMITOMO SEIKA CHEMICALS CO. LTD. 1 Irifune-cho Shikama-ku Himeji-shi Hyogo 672-8076 / JP | 04 /
HAMAMOTO Shigeki c/o SUMITOMO SEIKA CHEMICALS CO. LTD. 1 Irifune-cho Shikama-ku Himeji-shi Hyogo 672-8076 / JP | 05 /
ZHAO Changming c/o ADVANCED SOFTMATERIALS INC. 4-6 Kashiwanoha 5-chome Kashiwa-shi Chiba 277-0882 / JP | 06 /
IWATA Minoru c/o ADVANCED SOFTMATERIALS INC. 4-6 Kashiwanoha 5-chome Kashiwa-shi Chiba 277-0882 / JP | 07 /
HAYASHI Yuki c/o ADVANCED SOFTMATERIALS INC. 4-6 Kashiwanoha 5-chome Kashiwa-shi Chiba 277-0882 / JP | [2014/04] | Representative(s) | Webster, Jeremy Mark, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/06] | Webster, Jeremy Mark, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | ||
Former [2014/04] | Webster, Jeremy Mark, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | Application number, filing date | 11860938.7 | 05.12.2011 | [2017/06] | WO2011JP78026 | Priority number, date | JP20110055503 | 14.03.2011 Original published format: JP 2011055503 | JP20110055504 | 14.03.2011 Original published format: JP 2011055504 | JP20110239400 | 31.10.2011 Original published format: JP 2011239400 | [2014/04] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012124220 | Date: | 20.09.2012 | Language: | JA | [2012/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2687545 | Date: | 22.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2687545 | Date: | 08.02.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 20.09.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.10.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C08B37/16, C08G65/06 | [2014/04] | CPC: |
A61K31/724 (EP,US);
C08G65/06 (KR);
A61K31/192 (EP,US);
A61K31/216 (EP,US);
A61K31/353 (EP,US);
C08B37/0012 (KR);
C08B37/0015 (EP,US);
C08G65/2606 (EP,US);
C08G65/3331 (EP,US);
C08G65/33396 (EP,US);
C08G83/007 (EP,US);
C08K5/005 (EP,US);
C08K5/053 (EP,US);
C08K5/16 (EP,US);
C08L101/005 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08K5/005, C08L5/16 (US,EP);
C08K5/005, C08L71/02 (EP,US);
C08K5/053, C08L5/16 (US,EP);
C08K5/16, C08L71/02 (EP,US);
C08L5/16, C08K5/005 (US);
C08L5/16, C08K5/005, C08L71/02 (US,EP);
C08L5/16, C08K5/053 (US);
C08L5/16, C08K5/053, C08L71/02 (US,EP); | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/04] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HYDROPHILE MODIFIZIERTE POLYROTAXANZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2014/04] | English: | HYDROPHILIC MODIFIED POLYROTAXANE COMPOSITION | [2014/04] | French: | COMPOSITION DE POLYROTAXANE MODIFIÉ HYDROPHILE | [2014/04] | Entry into regional phase | 18.09.2013 | Translation filed | 30.09.2013 | National basic fee paid | 30.09.2013 | Search fee paid | 30.09.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.09.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.09.2013 | Examination requested [2014/04] | 13.05.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.07.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.01.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.07.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.10.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 21.10.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 21.10.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 31.07.2015 | Opposition(s) | 09.11.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.12.2011 | AL | 08.02.2017 | AT | 08.02.2017 | CY | 08.02.2017 | CZ | 08.02.2017 | DK | 08.02.2017 | EE | 08.02.2017 | FI | 08.02.2017 | HR | 08.02.2017 | IT | 08.02.2017 | LT | 08.02.2017 | LV | 08.02.2017 | MC | 08.02.2017 | MK | 08.02.2017 | NL | 08.02.2017 | PL | 08.02.2017 | RO | 08.02.2017 | RS | 08.02.2017 | SE | 08.02.2017 | SI | 08.02.2017 | SK | 08.02.2017 | SM | 08.02.2017 | TR | 08.02.2017 | BG | 08.05.2017 | NO | 08.05.2017 | GR | 09.05.2017 | IS | 08.06.2017 | PT | 08.06.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 05.12.2011 | |
AT | 08.02.2017 | ||
CY | 08.02.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.02.2017 | ||
DK | 08.02.2017 | ||
EE | 08.02.2017 | ||
FI | 08.02.2017 | ||
HR | 08.02.2017 | ||
IT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LV | 08.02.2017 | ||
MC | 08.02.2017 | ||
MK | 08.02.2017 | ||
NL | 08.02.2017 | ||
PL | 08.02.2017 | ||
RO | 08.02.2017 | ||
RS | 08.02.2017 | ||
SE | 08.02.2017 | ||
SI | 08.02.2017 | ||
SK | 08.02.2017 | ||
SM | 08.02.2017 | ||
TR | 08.02.2017 | ||
BG | 08.05.2017 | ||
NO | 08.05.2017 | ||
GR | 09.05.2017 | ||
PT | 08.06.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 05.12.2011 | |
AT | 08.02.2017 | ||
CY | 08.02.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.02.2017 | ||
DK | 08.02.2017 | ||
EE | 08.02.2017 | ||
FI | 08.02.2017 | ||
HR | 08.02.2017 | ||
IT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LV | 08.02.2017 | ||
MC | 08.02.2017 | ||
MK | 08.02.2017 | ||
NL | 08.02.2017 | ||
PL | 08.02.2017 | ||
RO | 08.02.2017 | ||
RS | 08.02.2017 | ||
SE | 08.02.2017 | ||
SI | 08.02.2017 | ||
SK | 08.02.2017 | ||
SM | 08.02.2017 | ||
BG | 08.05.2017 | ||
NO | 08.05.2017 | ||
GR | 09.05.2017 | ||
PT | 08.06.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 05.12.2011 | |
AT | 08.02.2017 | ||
CY | 08.02.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.02.2017 | ||
DK | 08.02.2017 | ||
EE | 08.02.2017 | ||
FI | 08.02.2017 | ||
HR | 08.02.2017 | ||
IT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LV | 08.02.2017 | ||
MC | 08.02.2017 | ||
NL | 08.02.2017 | ||
PL | 08.02.2017 | ||
RO | 08.02.2017 | ||
RS | 08.02.2017 | ||
SE | 08.02.2017 | ||
SI | 08.02.2017 | ||
SK | 08.02.2017 | ||
SM | 08.02.2017 | ||
BG | 08.05.2017 | ||
NO | 08.05.2017 | ||
GR | 09.05.2017 | ||
PT | 08.06.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 05.12.2011 | |
AT | 08.02.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.02.2017 | ||
DK | 08.02.2017 | ||
EE | 08.02.2017 | ||
FI | 08.02.2017 | ||
HR | 08.02.2017 | ||
IT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LV | 08.02.2017 | ||
MC | 08.02.2017 | ||
NL | 08.02.2017 | ||
PL | 08.02.2017 | ||
RO | 08.02.2017 | ||
RS | 08.02.2017 | ||
SE | 08.02.2017 | ||
SI | 08.02.2017 | ||
SK | 08.02.2017 | ||
SM | 08.02.2017 | ||
BG | 08.05.2017 | ||
NO | 08.05.2017 | ||
GR | 09.05.2017 | ||
PT | 08.06.2017 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AT | 08.02.2017 | |
CZ | 08.02.2017 | ||
DK | 08.02.2017 | ||
EE | 08.02.2017 | ||
FI | 08.02.2017 | ||
HR | 08.02.2017 | ||
IT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LV | 08.02.2017 | ||
MC | 08.02.2017 | ||
NL | 08.02.2017 | ||
PL | 08.02.2017 | ||
RO | 08.02.2017 | ||
RS | 08.02.2017 | ||
SE | 08.02.2017 | ||
SI | 08.02.2017 | ||
SK | 08.02.2017 | ||
SM | 08.02.2017 | ||
BG | 08.05.2017 | ||
NO | 08.05.2017 | ||
GR | 09.05.2017 | ||
PT | 08.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | AT | 08.02.2017 | |
CZ | 08.02.2017 | ||
DK | 08.02.2017 | ||
EE | 08.02.2017 | ||
FI | 08.02.2017 | ||
HR | 08.02.2017 | ||
IT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LV | 08.02.2017 | ||
NL | 08.02.2017 | ||
PL | 08.02.2017 | ||
RO | 08.02.2017 | ||
RS | 08.02.2017 | ||
SE | 08.02.2017 | ||
SI | 08.02.2017 | ||
SK | 08.02.2017 | ||
SM | 08.02.2017 | ||
BG | 08.05.2017 | ||
NO | 08.05.2017 | ||
GR | 09.05.2017 | ||
PT | 08.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 08.02.2017 | |
CZ | 08.02.2017 | ||
DK | 08.02.2017 | ||
EE | 08.02.2017 | ||
FI | 08.02.2017 | ||
HR | 08.02.2017 | ||
IT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LV | 08.02.2017 | ||
NL | 08.02.2017 | ||
PL | 08.02.2017 | ||
RO | 08.02.2017 | ||
RS | 08.02.2017 | ||
SE | 08.02.2017 | ||
SK | 08.02.2017 | ||
SM | 08.02.2017 | ||
BG | 08.05.2017 | ||
NO | 08.05.2017 | ||
GR | 09.05.2017 | ||
PT | 08.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 08.02.2017 | |
CZ | 08.02.2017 | ||
DK | 08.02.2017 | ||
EE | 08.02.2017 | ||
FI | 08.02.2017 | ||
HR | 08.02.2017 | ||
IT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LV | 08.02.2017 | ||
NL | 08.02.2017 | ||
PL | 08.02.2017 | ||
RO | 08.02.2017 | ||
RS | 08.02.2017 | ||
SE | 08.02.2017 | ||
SK | 08.02.2017 | ||
BG | 08.05.2017 | ||
NO | 08.05.2017 | ||
GR | 09.05.2017 | ||
PT | 08.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 08.02.2017 | |
CZ | 08.02.2017 | ||
EE | 08.02.2017 | ||
FI | 08.02.2017 | ||
HR | 08.02.2017 | ||
IT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LV | 08.02.2017 | ||
NL | 08.02.2017 | ||
RO | 08.02.2017 | ||
RS | 08.02.2017 | ||
SE | 08.02.2017 | ||
SK | 08.02.2017 | ||
BG | 08.05.2017 | ||
NO | 08.05.2017 | ||
GR | 09.05.2017 | ||
PT | 08.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | AT | 08.02.2017 | |
CZ | 08.02.2017 | ||
FI | 08.02.2017 | ||
HR | 08.02.2017 | ||
LT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LV | 08.02.2017 | ||
NL | 08.02.2017 | ||
RS | 08.02.2017 | ||
SE | 08.02.2017 | ||
BG | 08.05.2017 | ||
NO | 08.05.2017 | ||
GR | 09.05.2017 | ||
PT | 08.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/41] | AT | 08.02.2017 | |
FI | 08.02.2017 | ||
HR | 08.02.2017 | ||
LT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LV | 08.02.2017 | ||
NL | 08.02.2017 | ||
RS | 08.02.2017 | ||
SE | 08.02.2017 | ||
BG | 08.05.2017 | ||
NO | 08.05.2017 | ||
GR | 09.05.2017 | ||
PT | 08.06.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP2007092024 (UNIV TOKYO) [Y] 1-7 * paragraphs [0045] , [ 0057] *; | [Y]EP2123681 (ADVANCED SOFTMATERIALS INC [JP]) [Y] 1-7 * examples 1-10 *; | [Y]EP2287206 (ADVANCED SOFTMATERIALS INC [JP]) [Y] 1-7 * examples 1-3 *; | [Y] - JUN ARAKI ET AL, "Recent advances in the preparation of cyclodextrin-based polyrotaxanes and their applications to soft materials", SOFT MATTER, (20070808), pages 1456 - 1473, XP055004107 [Y] 1-7 * paragraph [5.4.] * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/b705688e | [Y] - JUN ARAKI ET AL, "New solvent for polyrotaxane. III. Dissolution of a poly(ethylene glycol)/cyclodextrin polyrotaxane in a calcium thiocyanate aqueous solution orN-methylmorpholine-N-oxide monohydrate", JOURNAL OF APPLIED POLYMER SCIENCE, (20070101), vol. 105, no. 4, doi:10.1002/app.26232, ISSN 0021-8995, pages 2265 - 2270, XP055145177 [Y] 1-7 * page 2267, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/app.26232 | International search | [Y]JP2007063412 (NISSAN MOTOR, et al); | [Y]JP2007092024 (UNIV TOKYO) | by applicant | WO2005052026 | JP2007063412 |