EP2687546 - PRODUCTION METHOD FOR POWDERED HYDROPHILIC MODIFIED POLYROTAXANE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.07.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Seika Chemicals Co., Ltd. 346-1, Miyanishi Harima-cho Kako-gun Hyogo 675-0145 / JP | For all designated states Advanced Softmaterials Inc. 4-6 Kashiwanoha 5-chome Kashiwa-shi Chiba 277-0882 / JP | [2014/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAMASAKI Tomoaki c/o SUMITOMO SEIKA CHEMICALS CO. LTD. 1 Irifune-cho Shikama-ku Himeji-shi Hyogo 672-8076 / JP | 02 /
OKAZAKI Shinya c/o SUMITOMO SEIKA CHEMICALS CO. LTD. 1 Irifune-cho Shikama-ku Himeji-shi Hyogo 672-8076 / JP | 03 /
OKAZAKI Hiroki c/o SUMITOMO SEIKA CHEMICALS CO. LTD. 1 Irifune-cho Shikama-ku Himeji-shi Hyogo 672-8076 / JP | 04 /
HAMAMOTO Shigeki c/o SUMITOMO SEIKA CHEMICALS CO. LTD. 1 Irifune-cho Shikama-ku Himeji-shi Hyogo 672-8076 / JP | 05 /
HAYASHI Yuki c/o ADVANCED SOFTMATERIALS INC. 4-6 Kashiwanoha 5-chome Kashiwa-shi Chiba 277-0882 / JP | 06 /
IWATA Minoru c/o ADVANCED SOFTMATERIALS INC. 4-6 Kashiwanoha 5-chome Kashiwa-shi Chiba 277-0882 / JP | [2014/04] | Representative(s) | Webster, Jeremy Mark, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/39] | Webster, Jeremy Mark, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | ||
Former [2014/04] | Webster, Jeremy Mark, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | Application number, filing date | 11861040.1 | 05.12.2011 | [2015/39] | WO2011JP78019 | Priority number, date | JP20110055503 | 14.03.2011 Original published format: JP 2011055503 | [2014/04] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012124217 | Date: | 20.09.2012 | Language: | JA | [2012/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2687546 | Date: | 22.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2687546 | Date: | 23.09.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 20.09.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.10.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C08B37/16, C08G65/06, C08J3/12 | [2014/04] | CPC: |
C08B37/0015 (EP,US);
C08B37/0012 (KR);
C08G65/06 (KR);
C08G65/2606 (EP,US);
C08G65/3331 (EP,US);
C08G65/33396 (EP,US);
C08J3/12 (KR);
C08J3/122 (EP,US);
C08L71/02 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08L71/02, C08L5/16 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/04] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR PULVERFÖRMIGES HYDROPHILES MODIFIZIERTES POLYROTAXAN | [2014/04] | English: | PRODUCTION METHOD FOR POWDERED HYDROPHILIC MODIFIED POLYROTAXANE | [2014/04] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE POLYROTAXANE MODIFIÉ HYDROPHILE RÉDUIT EN POUDRE | [2014/04] | Entry into regional phase | 18.09.2013 | Translation filed | 30.09.2013 | National basic fee paid | 30.09.2013 | Search fee paid | 30.09.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.09.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.09.2013 | Examination requested [2014/04] | 22.04.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.08.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 17.08.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 17.08.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.04.2015 | Opposition(s) | 24.06.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.12.2011 | AL | 23.09.2015 | AT | 23.09.2015 | BE | 23.09.2015 | BG | 23.09.2015 | CY | 23.09.2015 | CZ | 23.09.2015 | DK | 23.09.2015 | EE | 23.09.2015 | FI | 23.09.2015 | HR | 23.09.2015 | LT | 23.09.2015 | LV | 23.09.2015 | MC | 23.09.2015 | MK | 23.09.2015 | MT | 23.09.2015 | NL | 23.09.2015 | PL | 23.09.2015 | RO | 23.09.2015 | RS | 23.09.2015 | SE | 23.09.2015 | SI | 23.09.2015 | SK | 23.09.2015 | SM | 23.09.2015 | TR | 23.09.2015 | IE | 05.12.2015 | LU | 05.12.2015 | NO | 23.12.2015 | GR | 24.12.2015 | CH | 31.12.2015 | LI | 31.12.2015 | IS | 23.01.2016 | PT | 25.01.2016 | [2018/47] |
Former [2018/45] | HU | 05.12.2011 | |
AT | 23.09.2015 | ||
BE | 23.09.2015 | ||
BG | 23.09.2015 | ||
CY | 23.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 23.09.2015 | ||
DK | 23.09.2015 | ||
EE | 23.09.2015 | ||
FI | 23.09.2015 | ||
HR | 23.09.2015 | ||
LT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LV | 23.09.2015 | ||
MC | 23.09.2015 | ||
MK | 23.09.2015 | ||
MT | 23.09.2015 | ||
NL | 23.09.2015 | ||
PL | 23.09.2015 | ||
RO | 23.09.2015 | ||
RS | 23.09.2015 | ||
SE | 23.09.2015 | ||
SI | 23.09.2015 | ||
SK | 23.09.2015 | ||
SM | 23.09.2015 | ||
TR | 23.09.2015 | ||
IE | 05.12.2015 | ||
LU | 05.12.2015 | ||
NO | 23.12.2015 | ||
GR | 24.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
IS | 23.01.2016 | ||
PT | 25.01.2016 | ||
Former [2018/31] | HU | 05.12.2011 | |
AT | 23.09.2015 | ||
BE | 23.09.2015 | ||
BG | 23.09.2015 | ||
CY | 23.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 23.09.2015 | ||
DK | 23.09.2015 | ||
EE | 23.09.2015 | ||
FI | 23.09.2015 | ||
HR | 23.09.2015 | ||
LT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LV | 23.09.2015 | ||
MC | 23.09.2015 | ||
MK | 23.09.2015 | ||
MT | 23.09.2015 | ||
NL | 23.09.2015 | ||
PL | 23.09.2015 | ||
RO | 23.09.2015 | ||
RS | 23.09.2015 | ||
SE | 23.09.2015 | ||
SI | 23.09.2015 | ||
SK | 23.09.2015 | ||
SM | 23.09.2015 | ||
IE | 05.12.2015 | ||
LU | 05.12.2015 | ||
NO | 23.12.2015 | ||
GR | 24.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
IS | 23.01.2016 | ||
PT | 25.01.2016 | ||
Former [2017/39] | HU | 05.12.2011 | |
AT | 23.09.2015 | ||
BE | 23.09.2015 | ||
BG | 23.09.2015 | ||
CY | 23.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 23.09.2015 | ||
DK | 23.09.2015 | ||
EE | 23.09.2015 | ||
FI | 23.09.2015 | ||
HR | 23.09.2015 | ||
LT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LV | 23.09.2015 | ||
MC | 23.09.2015 | ||
MT | 23.09.2015 | ||
NL | 23.09.2015 | ||
PL | 23.09.2015 | ||
RO | 23.09.2015 | ||
RS | 23.09.2015 | ||
SE | 23.09.2015 | ||
SI | 23.09.2015 | ||
SK | 23.09.2015 | ||
SM | 23.09.2015 | ||
IE | 05.12.2015 | ||
LU | 05.12.2015 | ||
NO | 23.12.2015 | ||
GR | 24.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
IS | 23.01.2016 | ||
PT | 25.01.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 23.09.2015 | |
BE | 23.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 23.09.2015 | ||
DK | 23.09.2015 | ||
EE | 23.09.2015 | ||
FI | 23.09.2015 | ||
HR | 23.09.2015 | ||
LT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LV | 23.09.2015 | ||
MC | 23.09.2015 | ||
NL | 23.09.2015 | ||
PL | 23.09.2015 | ||
RO | 23.09.2015 | ||
RS | 23.09.2015 | ||
SE | 23.09.2015 | ||
SI | 23.09.2015 | ||
SK | 23.09.2015 | ||
IE | 05.12.2015 | ||
LU | 05.12.2015 | ||
NO | 23.12.2015 | ||
GR | 24.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
IS | 23.01.2016 | ||
PT | 25.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 23.09.2015 | |
CZ | 23.09.2015 | ||
DK | 23.09.2015 | ||
EE | 23.09.2015 | ||
FI | 23.09.2015 | ||
HR | 23.09.2015 | ||
LT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LV | 23.09.2015 | ||
MC | 23.09.2015 | ||
NL | 23.09.2015 | ||
PL | 23.09.2015 | ||
RO | 23.09.2015 | ||
RS | 23.09.2015 | ||
SE | 23.09.2015 | ||
SI | 23.09.2015 | ||
SK | 23.09.2015 | ||
IE | 05.12.2015 | ||
LU | 05.12.2015 | ||
NO | 23.12.2015 | ||
GR | 24.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
IS | 23.01.2016 | ||
PT | 25.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | AT | 23.09.2015 | |
CZ | 23.09.2015 | ||
DK | 23.09.2015 | ||
EE | 23.09.2015 | ||
FI | 23.09.2015 | ||
HR | 23.09.2015 | ||
LT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LV | 23.09.2015 | ||
MC | 23.09.2015 | ||
NL | 23.09.2015 | ||
PL | 23.09.2015 | ||
RO | 23.09.2015 | ||
RS | 23.09.2015 | ||
SE | 23.09.2015 | ||
SK | 23.09.2015 | ||
IE | 05.12.2015 | ||
LU | 05.12.2015 | ||
NO | 23.12.2015 | ||
GR | 24.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
IS | 23.01.2016 | ||
PT | 25.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/45] | AT | 23.09.2015 | |
CZ | 23.09.2015 | ||
DK | 23.09.2015 | ||
EE | 23.09.2015 | ||
FI | 23.09.2015 | ||
HR | 23.09.2015 | ||
LT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LV | 23.09.2015 | ||
MC | 23.09.2015 | ||
NL | 23.09.2015 | ||
PL | 23.09.2015 | ||
RO | 23.09.2015 | ||
RS | 23.09.2015 | ||
SE | 23.09.2015 | ||
SK | 23.09.2015 | ||
IE | 05.12.2015 | ||
LU | 05.12.2015 | ||
NO | 23.12.2015 | ||
GR | 24.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
IS | 23.01.2016 | ||
PT | 25.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 23.09.2015 | |
CZ | 23.09.2015 | ||
DK | 23.09.2015 | ||
EE | 23.09.2015 | ||
FI | 23.09.2015 | ||
HR | 23.09.2015 | ||
LT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LV | 23.09.2015 | ||
MC | 23.09.2015 | ||
NL | 23.09.2015 | ||
PL | 23.09.2015 | ||
RO | 23.09.2015 | ||
RS | 23.09.2015 | ||
SE | 23.09.2015 | ||
SK | 23.09.2015 | ||
LU | 05.12.2015 | ||
NO | 23.12.2015 | ||
GR | 24.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
IS | 23.01.2016 | ||
PT | 25.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/34] | AT | 23.09.2015 | |
CZ | 23.09.2015 | ||
EE | 23.09.2015 | ||
FI | 23.09.2015 | ||
HR | 23.09.2015 | ||
LT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LV | 23.09.2015 | ||
MC | 23.09.2015 | ||
NL | 23.09.2015 | ||
PL | 23.09.2015 | ||
RO | 23.09.2015 | ||
RS | 23.09.2015 | ||
SE | 23.09.2015 | ||
SK | 23.09.2015 | ||
LU | 05.12.2015 | ||
NO | 23.12.2015 | ||
GR | 24.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
IS | 23.01.2016 | ||
PT | 25.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/33] | AT | 23.09.2015 | |
CZ | 23.09.2015 | ||
EE | 23.09.2015 | ||
FI | 23.09.2015 | ||
HR | 23.09.2015 | ||
LT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LV | 23.09.2015 | ||
MC | 23.09.2015 | ||
NL | 23.09.2015 | ||
PL | 23.09.2015 | ||
RO | 23.09.2015 | ||
RS | 23.09.2015 | ||
SE | 23.09.2015 | ||
SK | 23.09.2015 | ||
NO | 23.12.2015 | ||
GR | 24.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
IS | 23.01.2016 | ||
PT | 25.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 23.09.2015 | |
CZ | 23.09.2015 | ||
EE | 23.09.2015 | ||
FI | 23.09.2015 | ||
HR | 23.09.2015 | ||
LT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LV | 23.09.2015 | ||
NL | 23.09.2015 | ||
PL | 23.09.2015 | ||
RO | 23.09.2015 | ||
RS | 23.09.2015 | ||
SE | 23.09.2015 | ||
SK | 23.09.2015 | ||
NO | 23.12.2015 | ||
GR | 24.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
IS | 23.01.2016 | ||
PT | 25.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | CZ | 23.09.2015 | |
EE | 23.09.2015 | ||
FI | 23.09.2015 | ||
HR | 23.09.2015 | ||
LT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LV | 23.09.2015 | ||
NL | 23.09.2015 | ||
RO | 23.09.2015 | ||
RS | 23.09.2015 | ||
SE | 23.09.2015 | ||
SK | 23.09.2015 | ||
NO | 23.12.2015 | ||
GR | 24.12.2015 | ||
IS | 23.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CZ | 23.09.2015 | |
EE | 23.09.2015 | ||
FI | 23.09.2015 | ||
HR | 23.09.2015 | ||
LT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LV | 23.09.2015 | ||
NL | 23.09.2015 | ||
RS | 23.09.2015 | ||
SE | 23.09.2015 | ||
NO | 23.12.2015 | ||
GR | 24.12.2015 | ||
IS | 23.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/14] | FI | 23.09.2015 | |
HR | 23.09.2015 | ||
LT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LV | 23.09.2015 | ||
NL | 23.09.2015 | ||
RS | 23.09.2015 | ||
SE | 23.09.2015 | ||
NO | 23.12.2015 | ||
GR | 24.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | FI | 23.09.2015 | |
HR | 23.09.2015 | ||
LT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LV | 23.09.2015 | ||
RS | 23.09.2015 | ||
SE | 23.09.2015 | ||
NO | 23.12.2015 | ||
GR | 24.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 23.09.2015 | |
LT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LV | 23.09.2015 | ||
NO | 23.12.2015 | ||
GR | 24.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/08] | LT | 23.09.2015 | |
NO | 23.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 23.09.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1942163 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP], et al) [A] 1-5* examples 1-7 *; | [A] - Runtao Liu ET AL, "Solvent-Free Synthesis of Unmodified Cyclodextrin-Based Pseudopolyrotaxane and Polyrotaxane by Grinding", Polymer Journal, doi:10.1295/polymj.PJ2006112, (20070115), pages 21 - 23, URL: http://www.nature.com/pj/journal/v39/n1/pdf/pj20075a.pdf, XP055144739 [A] 1-5 * page 21, column 2, paragraph 4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1295/polymj.PJ2006112 | [A] - GUILLAUME FLEURY ET AL, "Synthesis and characterization of high molecular weight polyrotaxanes: towards the control over a wide range of threaded [alpha]-cyclodextrins", SOFT MATTER, (20050101), vol. 1, no. 5, doi:10.1039/b510331b, ISSN 1744-683X, page 378, XP055120936 [A] 1-5 * page 379, column 2, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/b510331b | International search | [Y]JP2007063412 (NISSAN MOTOR, et al); | [Y] - KAGAKU DAIJITEN HENSHU IINKAI, KAGAKU DAIJITEN 2, (1960), pages 658 - 659, XP008171450 | [Y] - KAGAKU DAIJITEN HENSHU IINKAI, KAGAKU DAIJITEN 8, (1962), pages 214 - 215, XP008171449 | by applicant | WO2005052026 | JP2007063412 |