EP2690171 - RECOMBINANT ALSV FOR PREVENTING PATHOGENIC VIRAL INFECTION OF PLANT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 22.07.2016 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.07.2016 | Withdrawal of application | published on 24.08.2016 [2016/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Incorporated National University Iwate University 18-8, Ueda 3-chome Morioka-shi, Iwate 020-8550 / JP | [2014/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YOSHIKAWA, Nobuyuki c/o Incorporated National University Iwate University 18-8 Ueda 3-chome Morioka-shi Iwate 020-8550 / JP | [2014/05] | Representative(s) | Rigby, Barbara Nicole Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/05] | Rigby, Barbara Nicole Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 11861431.2 | 13.05.2011 | WO2011JP61099 | Priority number, date | JP20110066704 | 24.03.2011 Original published format: JP 2011066704 | [2014/05] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012127697 | Date: | 27.09.2012 | Language: | JA | [2012/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2690171 | Date: | 29.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 27.09.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.08.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C12N7/01, A01H1/00, A01H5/00, A01N63/00, C12N5/10, C12N15/83, C12N15/40 | [2014/05] | CPC: |
C12N15/8283 (EP,US);
A01N63/40 (EP,US);
C12N15/8203 (EP);
C12N2770/34031 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/05] | Title | German: | REKOMBINANTES ALSV ZUR PRÄVENTION VON PATHOGENEN VIRUSINFEKTIONEN BEI PFLANZEN | [2014/05] | English: | RECOMBINANT ALSV FOR PREVENTING PATHOGENIC VIRAL INFECTION OF PLANT | [2014/05] | French: | ALSV RECOMBINANT POUR LA PRÉVENTION D'UNE INFECTION VIRALE PATHOGÈNE D'UNE PLANTE | [2014/05] | Entry into regional phase | 15.10.2013 | Translation filed | 15.10.2013 | National basic fee paid | 15.10.2013 | Search fee paid | 15.10.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.10.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.10.2013 | Examination requested [2014/05] | 19.03.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.07.2016 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2016/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2016 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY] - LI C ET AL, "Stable expression of foreign proteins in herbaceous and apple plants using Apple latent spherical virus RNA2 vectors", ARCHIVES OF VIROLOGY, SPRINGER-VERLAG, (20040801), vol. 149, no. 8, ISSN 0304-8608, pages 1541 - 1558, XP008156197 [X] 7-11 * the whole document * [Y] 1-11 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00705-004-0310-2 | [XY] - CULVER J N ED - LAMBERT PAUL ET AL, "Tobamovirus cross protection using a potexvirus vector", VIROLOGY, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (19961215), vol. 226, no. 2, ISSN 0042-6822, pages 228 - 235, XP002728482 [X] 11 * the whole document * [Y] 1-11 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/viro.1996.0650 | [X] - IGARASHI A ET AL, "Apple latent spherical virus vectors for reliable and effective virus-induced gene silencing among a broad range of plants including tobacco, tomato, Arabidopsis thaliana, cucurbits, and legumes", VIROLOGY, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 386, no. 2, doi:10.1016/J.VIROL.2009.01.039, ISSN 0042-6822, (20090410), pages 407 - 416, (20090225), XP026070970 [X] 7-11 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.virol.2009.01.039 | [A] - Yamagishi, N. et al., "Highgly efficient inoculation method of apple viruses to apple seedlings", Julius-Kühn-Archiv, vol. 427, (2010), pages 226 - 229, URL: http://pub.jki.bund.de/index.php/JKA/article/download/443/1496, XP002728483 [A] 1-11 * the whole document * | [T] - TAKI AYANO ET AL, "Development of apple latent spherical virus-based vaccines against three tospoviruses", VIRUS RESEARCH, (20130710), vol. 176, no. 1, doi:10.1016/J.VIRUSRES.2013.06.015, ISSN 0168-1702, pages 251 - 258, XP028690326 [T] 1-11 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.virusres.2013.06.015 | International search | [Y]WO9958697 (INST OF MOLECULAR AGROBIOLOGY [SG], et al); | [X] - IGARASHI A ET AL., "Apple latent spherical virus vectors for reliable and effective virus- induced gene silencing among a broad range of plants including tobacco, tomato, Arabidopsis thaliana, cucurbits, and legumes.", VIROLOGY, (2009), vol. 386, no. 2, pages 407 - 416, XP026070970 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.virol.2009.01.039 | [Y] - GILARDI P ET AL., "Pepper mild mottle virus coat protein alone can elicit the Capsicum spp. L3 gene-mediated resistance.", MOL. PLANT-MICROBE INTERACT., (1998), vol. 11, pages 1253 - 1257, XP055127227 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1094/MPMI.1998.11.12.1253 | [Y] - GILARDI P ET AL., "The coat protein of tobamovirus acts as elicitor of both L2 and L4 gene-mediated resistance in Capsicum.", J. GEN. VIROL., (2004), vol. 85, pages 2077 - 2085, XP055127228 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1099/vir.0.80017-0 | [X] - LI C ET AL., "Stable expression of foreign protein in herbaceous and apple plants using Apple latent spherical virus RNA 2 vectors.", ARCH. VIROL., (2004), vol. 149, pages 1541 - 1558, XP008156197 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00705-004-0310-2 | by applicant | JPH053789 | JPH0568540 | JPH10203901 | JPH11279013 | JP2000264806 | - LI, C.; YOSHIKAWA, N.; TAKAHASHI, T.; ITO, T.; YOSHIDA, K.; KOGANEZAWA, H, "Nucleotide sequence and genome organization of apple latent spherical virus: a new virus classified into the family Comoviridae", J. GEN. VIROL., (2000), vol. 81, pages 541 - 547 | - LI, C.; SASAKI, N.; ISOGAI, M.; YOSHIKAWA, N., "Stable expression of foreign proteins in herbaceous and apple plants using Apple latent spherical virus RNA2 vectors", ARCH. VIROL., (2004), vol. 149, pages 1541 - 1558 | - YAEGASHI, H.; YAMATSUTA, T.; TAKAHASHI, T.; LI, C.; ISOGAI, M.; KOBORI, T.; OHKI, S.; YOSHIKAWA, N, "Characterization of virus-induced gene silencing in tobacco plants infected with apple latent spherical virus", ARCH. VIROL., (2007), vol. 152, pages 1839 - 1849 | - IGARASI, A.; YAMAGATA, K.; SUGAI, T.; TAKAHASHI, Y.; SUGAWARA, E.; TAMURA, A.; YAEGASHI, H.; YAMAGISHI, N.; TAKAHASHI, T.; ISOGAI,, "Apple latent spherical virus vectors for reliable and effective virus-induced gene silencing among abroad range of plants including tobacco, tomato, Arabidopsis thaliana, cucurbits, and legumes", VIROLOGY, (2009), vol. 386, pages 407 - 416 | - HAMILTOM, A.; VOINNET, O.; CHAPPELL, L.; BAULCOMBE, D., "Two classes of short interfering RNA in RNA silencing", EMBO. J., (2002), vol. 21, pages 4671 - 4679 | - KOSAKA, Y.; FUKUNISHI, T., "Multiple Inoculation with Three Attenuated Viruses for the Control of Cucumber Virus Disease", PLANT DIS., (1997), vol. 81, pages 733 - 738 | - VOINNET O., "RNA silencing as a plant immune system against viruses", TRENDS GENET., (2001), vol. 17, pages 449 - 459 | - KUMAGAI, M.H.; DONSON, J.; DELLA-CIOPPA, G.; HARVEY, D.; HANLEY, K.; GRILL, L.K., "Cytoplasmic inhibition of carotenoid biosynthesis with virus-derived RNA", PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1995), vol. 92, pages 1679 - 1683 | - Virus Gaku, ASAKURA PUBLISHING CO., LTD., (1997), pages 427 - 434,461- | - Sakumotsu Byogai Jiten, ZENKOKU NOSON KYOIKU KYOKAI, (1988), pages 321 - 322 | - KOSAKA, Y.; RYANG, BO-SONG.; KOBORI, T.; SHIOMI, H.; YASUHARA, H.; KATAOKA, M., "Effectiveness of an Attenuated Zucchini yellow mosaic virus Isolate for Cross-Protecting Cucumber", PLANT DIS., (2006), vol. 90, pages 67 - 72 | - WANG, WEI-QIN.; NATSUAKI, T.; KOSAKA, Y., "Comparison of the nucleotide and amino acid sequences of parental and attenuated isolates of Zucchini yellow mosaic virus", J. GEN. PLANT PATHOL., (2006), vol. 72, pages 52 - 56 | - BEACHY, R.N., "Coat-protein-mediated resistance to tobacco mosaic virus: discovery mechanisms and exploitation", PHILOS. TRANS. R. SOC. LOND. B. BIOL. SCI., (1999), vol. 354, pages 659 - 664 | - LIN, S-S.; HENRIQUES, R.; WU, H-W.; NIU, Q-W.; YEN, S-D; CHUA, N-H, "Strategies and mechanisms of plant virus resistance", PLANT BIOTECHNOL. REP., (2007), vol. 1, pages 125 - 134 | - KAZUHISA TSUDA; YOSHITAKA KOSAKA; TAKASHI KOBORI; HIROSHI SHIOMI; KEIICHI MUSUMI; MITSUNOBU KATAOKA, "Effects of Fertilizer Application on Yield and Vitamin C Content of Tomato Inoculated with the Attenuated Isolate CM95 of Cucumber Mosaic virus", JAPANESE JOURNAL OF PHYTOPATHOLOGY, (2005), vol. 71, pages 1 - 5 |