EP2692869 - DETECTION METHOD OF BACILLUS ANTHRACIS NUCLEIC ACID AND KIT AND USING THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2014/06] | DETECTION METHOD OF NUCLEIC ACID AND KIT AND USING THEREOF | ||
[2017/17] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.01.2018 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.04.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.01.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.02.2018 [2018/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states National Center For Nanoscience And Technology, China No.11 Beiyitiao ST Zhongguancun Haidian District Beijing 100190 / CN | For all designated states Beijing Entry-Exit Inspection and Quarantine Burea People's Republic of China No.6 Tian Shui Yuan Street Chaoyang District Beijing 100026 / CN | [2014/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIANG, Xingjie No.11 Beiyitiao ST Zhongguancun Haidian District Beijing 100190 / CN | 02 /
DENG, Hua No.11 Beiyitiao ST Zhongguancun Haidian District Beijing 100190 / CN | 03 /
MA, Xiaowei No.11 Beiyitiao ST Zhongguancun Haidian District Beijing 100190 / CN | 04 /
LI, Chan No. 11 Beiyitiao ST Zhongguancun Haidian District Beijing 100190 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2014/06] | 01 /
LIANG, Xingjie No.11 Beiyitiao ST Zhongguancun Haidian District Beijing 100190 / CN | ||
02 /
DENG, Hua No.11 Beiyitiao ST Zhongguancun Haidian District Beijing 100190 / CN | |||
03 /
MA, Xiaowei No.11 Beiyitiao ST Zhongguancun Haidian District Beijing 100190 / CN | Representative(s) | Lavoix Bayerstraße 83 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/06] | Tischner, Oliver Lavoix Munich Bayerstrasse 83 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11862434.5 | 12.04.2011 | WO2011CN72682 | Priority number, date | CN20111078665 | 30.03.2011 Original published format: CN201110078665 | [2014/06] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012129821 | Date: | 04.10.2012 | Language: | ZH | [2012/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2692869 | Date: | 05.02.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 04.10.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.11.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68, C12Q1/70 | [2014/06] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6816 (EP,US);
C12Q1/686 (US);
C12Q1/689 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C12Q1/6816, C12Q2565/107 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/06] | Title | German: | NACHWEISVERFAHREN FÜR BACILLUS ANTHRACIS NUKLEINSÄURE SOWIE KIT UND SEINE VERWENDUNG | [2017/17] | English: | DETECTION METHOD OF BACILLUS ANTHRACIS NUCLEIC ACID AND KIT AND USING THEREOF | [2017/17] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTECTION D'ACIDE NUCLÉIQUE DE BACILLUS ANTHRACIS ET TROUSSE, ET UTILISATION DE CEUX-CI | [2017/17] |
Former [2014/06] | NACHWEISVERFAHREN FÜR NUKLEINSÄURE SOWIE KIT UND SEINE VERWENDUNG | ||
Former [2014/06] | DETECTION METHOD OF NUCLEIC ACID AND KIT AND USING THEREOF | ||
Former [2014/06] | PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTECTION D'ACIDE NUCLÉIQUE ET TROUSSE, ET UTILISATION DE CEUX-CI | Entry into regional phase | 23.09.2013 | Translation filed | 23.09.2013 | National basic fee paid | 23.09.2013 | Search fee paid | 23.09.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.09.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.09.2013 | Examination requested [2014/06] | 12.05.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.01.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.04.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.07.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.11.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.04.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.08.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/06] | 20.09.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2018/06] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.01.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2017 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2003143604 (STORHOFF JAMES J [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * para. 12, 53-62; fig. 1 *; | [Y]US2004110220 (MIRKIN CHAD A [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * fig. 2, 5; para.320-321 *; | [A]CN101768633 (JIANPING CAI) [A] 1-15* sequences 4, 5 *; | [XI] - SZ-HAU CHEN ET AL, "Optical Detection of Human Papillomavirus Type 16 and Type 18 by Sequence Sandwich Hybridization With Oligonucleotide-Functionalized Au Nanoparticles", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON NANOBIOSCIENCE, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NY, US, (20090601), vol. 8, no. 2, doi:10.1109/TNB.2008.2011733, ISSN 1536-1241, pages 120 - 131, XP011282192 [X] 1,6,11 * abstract; p. 121, para. C; p. 122, para. E, G; p. 126-127, para. F; table 1; scheme 1; fig. 1, 6 * [I] 2-5,7-10,12-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TNB.2008.2011733 | [Y] - JISHAN LI ET AL, "Rolling Circle Amplification Combined with Gold Nanoparticle Aggregates for Highly Sensitive Identification of Single-Nucleotide Polymorphisms", ANALYTICAL CHEMISTRY, (20100301), vol. 82, no. 7, doi:10.1021/ac100336n, ISSN 0003-2700, pages 2811 - 2816, XP055149637 [Y] 1-15 * abstract; p. 2813, para. bridging left- to right-hand col.; table 1; fig. 2B * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ac100336n | [Y] - PODDAR S K, "Symmetric vs asymmetric PCR and molecular beacon probe in the detection of a target gene of adenovirus", MOLECULAR AND CELLULAR PROBES, ACADEMIC PRESS, LONDON, GB, (20000201), vol. 14, no. 1, doi:10.1006/MCPR.1999.0278, ISSN 0890-8508, pages 25 - 32, XP004435441 [Y] 1-15 * abstract; p. 30, right-hand col. - p. 31 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/mcpr.1999.0278 | International search | [Y] - GU, Y. ET AL., "Detection of Surface Plasmon Resonance on Microorganism's DNA with Asymmetric PCR Method.", SPACE MEDICINE & MEDICAL ENGINEERING., (201010), vol. 23, no. 5, pages 319 - 323, XP008170916 | [Y] - HE, Y.Y. ET AL., "Rapid Colorimetric Detection of Methicillin Resistant Staphylococcus Aureus MecA Gene by DNA-modified Colloid Gold Nanoparticles Probes.", CHONGQING MEDICINE., (201004), vol. 39, no. 7, pages 782 - 783, 786, XP008170897 | [Y] - MEHRABI, M. ET AL., "Intercalating Gold Nanoparticles as Universal Labels for DNA Detection.", SMALL., (20070727), vol. 3, no. 9, pages 1491 - 1495, XP055112526 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/smll.200700230 | [Y] - TANG, J F. ET AL., "Visual DNA Microarrays for Simultaneous Detection of Human Immunodeficiency Virus Type-1 and Treponema Pallidum Coupled with Mlultiplex Asymmetric Polimerase Chain Reaction.", DIAGNOSTIC MICROBIOLOGY AND INFECTIOUS DISEASE., (2009), vol. 65., pages 372 - 378, XP026754305 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.diagmicrobio.2009.07.017 | [Y] - GUO, Y.H. ET AL., "Hybridization Colouring Method of Detecting the Products of HBV DNA ASY PCR.", JOURNAL OF THE FOURTH MILITARY MEDICAL UNIVERSITY., (1999), vol. 20, no. 9, pages 827 - 828, S33, XP008170984 | [Y] - LUO, G.H. ET AL., "Biosensor Using Gold Nanoparticle-Oligonucleotide DNA.", JOURNAL OF PREVENTIVE MEDICINE OF CHINESE PEOPLE'S LIBERATION ARMY., (200704), vol. 25, no. 2, pages 91 - 93, XP008170913 | by applicant | - QI Y, APPL ENVIRON MICROBIOL, (2001), vol. 67, no. 8, pages 3720 - 3727 | - SR KLEE, J. APPLIED MICROBIOLOGY, (2006), vol. 100, pages 1364 - 5072 | - HORISBERGERM., SCANNING ELECTRON MICROSCOPY, (1981), vol. 11, pages 9 - 31 | - MIRKIN C A., NATURE, (1996), vol. 382, no. 6592, pages 607 - 609 | - ELGHANIAN R., SCIENCE, (1997), vol. 277, no. 22, pages 1078 - 1081 | - LI H., PNAS, (2004), vol. 101, no. 39, pages 14036 - 14039 | - LI HJ, AM CHEM SOC., (2004), vol. 216, pages 10958 - 10961 | - MIAO CAI, NANO RES., (2010), vol. 3, pages 557 - 563 |