08.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] |
10.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.07.2022 [2022/28] |
03.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.07.2022 [2022/27] |
20.11.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.12.2020 [2020/52] |
07.08.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.09.2020 [2020/37] |
10.07.2020 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] |
28.02.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.04.2020 [2020/14] |
22.11.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.12.2019 [2019/52] |
08.11.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.12.2019 [2019/50] |
18.10.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.11.2019 [2019/47] |
21.06.2019 |
Change - divisional application(s) |
published on 24.07.2019 [2019/30] |
17.05.2019 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 19.06.2019 [2019/25] |
13.05.2019 |
New entry: Information about intention to grant a patent |
|
13.05.2019 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
04.05.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
19.04.2019 |
Change - applicant |
published on 22.05.2019 [2019/21] |
15.04.2019 |
Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO |
|
15.04.2019 |
Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO |
|
15.04.2019 |
Deletion: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
13.04.2019 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
13.04.2019 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
02.12.2018 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
09.11.2018 |
Change - German title |
published on 12.12.2018 [2018/50] |
09.11.2018 |
Change - English title |
published on 12.12.2018 [2018/50] |
09.11.2018 |
Change - French title |
published on 12.12.2018 [2018/50] |
02.05.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
02.05.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.03.2017 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
10.03.2017 |
Change - applicant |
published on 12.04.2017 [2017/15] |
11.02.2017 |
Change - representative |
|
06.01.2017 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
09.12.2016 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
22.04.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
28.09.2015 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
15.08.2015 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
07.08.2015 |
First examination report |
|
30.05.2015 |
Change - representative |
|
29.04.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
15.04.2015 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
14.10.2014 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 12.11.2014 [2014/46] |
10.10.2014 |
Change - classification |
published on 12.11.2014 [2014/46] |
10.10.2014 |
Change - classification |
published on 12.11.2014 [2014/46] |
27.06.2014 |
Change - extension states |
published on 30.07.2014 [2014/31] |
06.05.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.01.2014 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 26.02.2014 [2014/09] |
24.01.2014 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 26.02.2014 [2014/09] |
20.01.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.01.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.12.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.12.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
15.11.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
15.11.2013 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
05.11.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
15.01.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.11.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
26.10.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|