EP2700234 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR LOSSY COMPRESS-ENCODING DATA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2014/09] | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR LOSSY COMPRESS-ENCODING DATA AND CORRESPONDING METHOD AND DEVICE FOR RECONSTRUCTING DATA | ||
[2018/50] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.07.2020 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.05.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.05.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.04.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.12.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dolby International AB Apollo Building, 3E Herikerbergweg 1-35 1101 CN Amsterdam Zuidoost / NL | [2019/21] |
Former [2017/15] | For all designated states Dolby International AB Apollo Building, 3E Herikerbergweg 1-13 1101 CN Amsterdam Zuidoost / NL | ||
Former [2014/09] | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JIANG, Wenfei 8th Floor, Building A Technology Fortune Center No. 8 Xueqing Road Haidian District Beijing 100192 / CN | 02 /
CHEN, Zhibo 8th Floor, Building A Technology Fortune Center No. 8 Xueqing Road Haidian District Beijing 100192 / CN | 03 /
ZHANG, Fan 8th Floor, Building A Technology Fortune Center No. 8 Xueqing Road Haidian District Beijing 100192 / CN | [2014/09] | Representative(s) | Dolby International AB Patent Group Europe 77 Sir John Rogerson's Quay Block C Grand Canal Docklands Dublin, D02 VK60 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/25] | Dolby International AB Patent Group Europe Apollo Building, 3E Herikerbergweg 1-35 1101 CN Amsterdam Zuidoost / NL | ||
Former [2014/09] | Labelle, Lilian Technicolor R&D France 1-5 Rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy Les Moulineaux / FR | Application number, filing date | 11863936.8 | 22.04.2011 | [2019/25] | WO2011CN00705 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012142731 | Date: | 26.10.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2700234 | Date: | 26.02.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.10.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2700234 | Date: | 19.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 26.10.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.10.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H04N19/86, H04N19/132, H04N19/18, H04N19/467, H04N19/147 | [2014/46] | CPC: |
H04N19/132 (EP,CN,US);
H04N19/85 (KR);
H04N19/147 (EP,CN,US);
H04N19/50 (CN,US);
H04N19/124 (KR,US);
H04N19/18 (EP,CN,US);
H04N19/467 (EP,CN,US);
H04N19/60 (CN,US);
H04N19/70 (KR);
|
Former IPC [2014/09] | H04N7/46, H04N7/50 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/09] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG FÜR VERLUSTBEHAFTETE KOMPRIMIERENDE CODIERUNG VON DATEN | [2018/50] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR LOSSY COMPRESS-ENCODING DATA | [2018/50] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE CODAGE À COMPRESSION AVEC PERTE DE DONNÉES | [2018/50] |
Former [2014/09] | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG FÜR VERLUSTBEHAFTETE KOMPRIMIERENDE CODIERUNG VON DATEN UND ENTSPRECHENDES VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR REKONSTRUKTION VON DATEN | ||
Former [2014/09] | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR LOSSY COMPRESS-ENCODING DATA AND CORRESPONDING METHOD AND DEVICE FOR RECONSTRUCTING DATA | ||
Former [2014/09] | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE CODAGE À COMPRESSION AVEC PERTE DE DONNÉES ET PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE RECONSTRUCTION DE DONNÉES CORRESPONDANTS | Entry into regional phase | 04.11.2013 | National basic fee paid | 04.11.2013 | Search fee paid | 04.11.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.11.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.11.2013 | Examination requested [2014/09] | 08.04.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.08.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.09.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.11.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.03.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.12.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.04.2019 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 10.04.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 10.04.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.05.2019 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 13.05.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP19180800.5 / EP3573337 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.08.2015 | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 22.11.2013 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   07.01.2014 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 19.06.2019 | CY | 19.06.2019 | HR | 19.06.2019 | LT | 19.06.2019 | LV | 19.06.2019 | MC | 19.06.2019 | MK | 19.06.2019 | MT | 19.06.2019 | SI | 19.06.2019 | SM | 19.06.2019 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | AL | 19.06.2019 | |
CY | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
MC | 19.06.2019 | ||
MT | 19.06.2019 | ||
SI | 19.06.2019 | ||
SM | 19.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/52] | AL | 19.06.2019 | |
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
MC | 19.06.2019 | ||
SI | 19.06.2019 | ||
SM | 19.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 19.06.2019 | |
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
SI | 19.06.2019 | ||
SM | 19.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/14] | AL | 19.06.2019 | |
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
SM | 19.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 19.06.2019 | |
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | LT | 19.06.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [YDA] - THONG T DO ET AL, "Compressive sensing with adaptive pixel domain reconstruction for block-based video coding", INTERNATIONAL CONF. ON IMAGE PROCESSING (ICIP 2010), USA, (20100926), ISBN 978-1-4244-7992-4, pages 3377 - 3380, XP031814139 [YD] 1-4,7-13 * abstract * * section 2.3 * [A] 5,6 | [YA] - JEAN-MARC THIESSE ET AL, "Data hiding of motion information in chroma and luma samples for video compression", 2010 IEEE INTERNATIONAL WORKSHOP ON MULTIMEDIA SIGNAL PROCESSING (MMSP '10), SAINT MALO, FRANCE, 4-6 OCT. 2010, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, USA, (20101004), ISBN 978-1-4244-8110-1, pages 217 - 221, XP031830585 [Y] 1-4,7-13 * abstract * * section III * [A] 5,6 | [A] - J-M THIESSE ET AL, "Data hiding of intra prediction information in chroma samples for video compression", INTERNATIONAL CONF. ON IMAGE PROCESSING (ICIP 2010), USA, (20100926), ISBN 978-1-4244-7992-4, pages 2861 - 2864, XP031813491 [A] 1-13 * abstract * * section 3 * | [A] - URHAN O ET AL, "Parameter Embedding Mode and Optimal Post-Process Filtering for Improved WDCT Image Compression", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON CIRCUITS AND SYSTEMS FOR VIDEO TECHNOLOGY, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (20080401), vol. 18, no. 4, ISSN 1051-8215, pages 528 - 532, XP011204311 [A] 1-13 * abstract * * section II * | [AD] - DADKHAH M R ET AL, "Compressive sensing with modified Total Variation minimization algorithm", 2010 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ACOUSTICS SPEECH AND SIGNAL PROCESSING (ICASSP), IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20100314), ISBN 978-1-4244-4295-9, pages 1310 - 1313, XP031697373 [AD] 9 * the whole document * | [A] - SUNG MIN KIM ET AL, Data Hiding on H.264/AVC Compressed Video, IMAGE ANALYSIS AND RECOGNITION; [LECTURE NOTES IN COMPUTER SCIENCE], SPRINGER BERLIN HEIDELBERG, BERLIN, HEIDELBERG, PAGE(S) 698 - 707, (20070822), ISBN 978-3-540-74258-6, XP019097872 [A] 5 * abstract * * section 4 * | International search | [A]US5321522 (ESCHBACH REINER [US]); | [A]WO9929115 (ROCKWELL INTERNATIONAL CORP [US]); | [A]US2002080408 (BUDGE SCOTT E [US], et al); | [A]WO2008063334 (CALISTA TECHNOLOGIES [US], et al); | [A]US2009110066 (WANG LIMIN [US], et al) | by applicant | - T.T.DO; X. LU; J. SOLE, "Compressive sensing with adaptive pixel domain reconstruction for block-based video coding", PROCEEDINGS OF ICIP, (20100926), pages 3377 - 3380, XP031814139 |