EP2703240 - OPTIMIZED HYDRAULIC CONTROL DEVICE FOR MINIMIZING LOCKING OF A BRAKE SYSTEM IN A TWO-WHEELED VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.08.2015 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.09.2015 [2015/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Chi, Dong Ik 102-1502 Seoksu Prugio Apt. 374-5 Seoksu 1-dong Manan-gu Anyang-si Gyeonggi-do 430-751 / KR | [2014/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2014/10] | Representative(s) | Gassner, Wolfgang, et al Dr. Gassner & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Marie-Curie-Strasse 1 91052 Erlangen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/10] | Gassner, Wolfgang, et al Dr. Gassner & Partner Patentanwälte Marie-Curie-Strasse 1 91052 Erlangen / DE | Application number, filing date | 11864482.2 | 17.11.2011 | WO2011KR08783 | Priority number, date | KR20110038523 | 25.04.2011 Original published format: KR 20110038523 | [2014/10] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012148057 | Date: | 01.11.2012 | Language: | KO | [2012/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2703240 | Date: | 05.03.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 01.11.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.08.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B60T8/00, B60T8/54, B60T15/00 | [2014/10] | CPC: |
B60T8/26 (EP,US);
B60T8/00 (KR);
F15B15/00 (US);
B60T15/00 (KR);
B60T15/36 (EP,US);
B60T17/18 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/10] | Title | German: | OPTIMIERTE HYDRAULISCHE STEUERUNGSVORRICHTUNG ZUR MINIMIERUNG DER BLOCKIERUNG EINES BREMSSYSTEMS BEI EINEM ZWEIRADFAHRZEUG | [2014/10] | English: | OPTIMIZED HYDRAULIC CONTROL DEVICE FOR MINIMIZING LOCKING OF A BRAKE SYSTEM IN A TWO-WHEELED VEHICLE | [2014/10] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE HYDRAULIQUE OPTIMISÉ POUR RÉDUIRE À UN MINIMUM LE BLOCAGE D'UN SYSTÈME DE FREIN DANS UN VÉHICULE À DEUX ROUES | [2014/10] | Entry into regional phase | 04.11.2013 | Translation filed | 04.11.2013 | National basic fee paid | 04.11.2013 | Search fee paid | 04.11.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.11.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.11.2013 | Examination requested [2014/10] | 27.03.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/40] | 07.05.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]KR20010029581 (CHI DONG IK [KR]) [YD] 1 * the whole document *; | WO0166399 [ ] (CHI DONG IK [KR]) [ ] * the whole document *; | [Y]GB1322875 (USTAV PRO VYZKUM MOTOROVYCH VO) [Y] 1 * page 2, line 3 - line 10; figure . * * page 2, line 29 - line 37 *; | [A]GB471716 (TEVES KG ALFRED) [A] 1 * page 1, line 67 - page 2, line 27; figure 2 *; | [A]GB1084104 (RENAULT) [A] 1 * page 2, line 17 - page 3, line 32; figure 1 *; | [A]US3209542 (GIOVANNI FRANCIA) [A] 1-3 * column 2, line 20 - line 25; figure . * * column 2, line 67 - line 71 *; | [A]GB1420953 (AUTOMOTIVE PROD CO LTD) [A] 2,3 * page 4, line 22 - line 34; figure 4 * | International search | [A]KR20010029581 (CHI DONG IK [KR]); | [A]KR20010094859 (MANDO CORP [KR]); | [A]JPH10175540 (WABCO GMBH); | [A]KR200240213Y (KIM, MYOUNG KIL ET AL.); | [A]KR100430172B (ROBERT BOSCH GMBH) | by applicant | KR20000011021 |