EP2706671 - SUBSCRIBER APPARATUS AND BASE STATION AND METHOD FOR SELECTING REMOTE RADIO HEADS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 12.06.2015 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.2015 | Withdrawal of application | published on 15.07.2015 [2015/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fujitsu Limited 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2014/11] | For all designated states Fujitsu Limited 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Yi Fujitsu Research and Development Center Co. Ltd. 13F Tower A Ocean International Center No. 56 Dong Si Huan Zhong Rd Chaoyang District Beijing 100025 / CN | 02 /
ZHANG, Yuantao Fujitsu Research and Development Center Co. Ltd. 13F Tower A Ocean International Center No. 56 Dong Si Huan Zhong Rd Chaoyang District Beijing 100025 / CN | 03 /
ZHOU, Hua Fujitsu Research and Development Center Co. Ltd. 13F Tower A Ocean International Center No. 56 Dong Si Huan Zhong Rd Chaoyang District Beijing 100025 / CN | [2014/11] | Representative(s) | Ward, James Norman Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/11] | Ward, James Norman Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | Application number, filing date | 11865055.5 | 06.05.2011 | WO2011CN73778 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012151737 | Date: | 15.11.2012 | Language: | ZH | [2012/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2706671 | Date: | 12.03.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 15.11.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.09.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/04, H04B7/06 | [2014/43] | CPC: |
H04B7/0456 (EP,KR,US);
H04B7/0473 (US);
H04B7/0639 (EP,US);
H04B7/0691 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2014/11] | H04B7/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/11] | Title | German: | TEILNEHMERVORRICHTUNG UND BASISSTATION SOWIE VERFAHREN ZUR AUSWAHL VON REMOTE-FUNKKÖPFEN | [2014/11] | English: | SUBSCRIBER APPARATUS AND BASE STATION AND METHOD FOR SELECTING REMOTE RADIO HEADS | [2014/11] | French: | APPAREIL D'ABONNÉ ET STATION DE BASE ET PROCÉDÉ DE SÉLECTION DE TÊTES RADIO À DISTANCE | [2014/11] | Entry into regional phase | 19.11.2013 | Translation filed | 02.12.2013 | National basic fee paid | 02.12.2013 | Search fee paid | 02.12.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.12.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.12.2013 | Examination requested [2014/11] | 14.04.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.06.2015 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2015/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US6922445 (SAMPATH HEMANTH [US], et al) [Y] 2-6,8-12,15,16 * page 4, column 7, lines 28-32,38-41 * * page 3, column 6, lines 13-17 *; | [XY]US2009238298 (KIM JAE WAN [KR], et al) [X] 1,7,13,14 * sentences 2-4, paragraph 0041; table 8 * * paragraph [0049] * [Y] 2-6,8-12,15,16; | [A]US2011064035 (GUERREIRO IGOR MOACO [BR], et al) [A] 1,7* sentences 4-9, paragraph 0039 * | International search | [A]CN101399722 (HAIER GROUP CO [CN]); | [X]CN101582712 (ZTE CORP [CN]) |