EP2709375 - DATA MAPPING METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR OPTICAL PATH TRANSPORT UNIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.09.2020 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.10.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.06.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.01.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2019/46] |
Former [2014/12] | For all designated states ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHONG, Changlong ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2014/12] | Representative(s) | Aipex B.V. Vestdijk 51 5611 CA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2019/46] | Aipex B.V. P.O. Box 30223 3001 DE Rotterdam / NL | ||
Former [2014/12] | Tischner, Oliver Lavoix Munich Bayerstrasse 83 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11865380.7 | 21.10.2011 | [2019/46] | WO2011CN81138 | Priority number, date | CN201110118557 | 09.05.2011 Original published format: CN201110118557 | [2014/12] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012151856 | Date: | 15.11.2012 | Language: | ZH | [2012/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2709375 | Date: | 19.03.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2709375 | Date: | 13.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 15.11.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.11.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q11/00, H04J3/16, H04J3/06 | [2014/50] | CPC: |
H04J3/1652 (EP);
H04J3/062 (EP);
H04J3/0685 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2014/12] | H04Q11/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/12] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DATENMAPPINGVERFAHREN UND SYSTEM FÜR STRAHLENGANGTRANSPORTEINHEIT | [2014/12] | English: | DATA MAPPING METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR OPTICAL PATH TRANSPORT UNIT | [2014/12] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME DE MAPPAGE DE DONNÉES POUR UNITÉ DE TRANSPORT OPTIQUE | [2014/12] | Entry into regional phase | 06.12.2013 | Translation filed | 09.12.2013 | National basic fee paid | 09.12.2013 | Search fee paid | 09.12.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.12.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.12.2013 | Examination requested [2014/12] | 27.05.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.01.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.05.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.06.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.10.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 08.10.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.10.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.01.2019 | Opposition(s) | 14.08.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 08.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.10.2011 | AL | 13.11.2019 | AT | 13.11.2019 | CY | 13.11.2019 | CZ | 13.11.2019 | DK | 13.11.2019 | EE | 13.11.2019 | ES | 13.11.2019 | FI | 13.11.2019 | HR | 13.11.2019 | IT | 13.11.2019 | LT | 13.11.2019 | LV | 13.11.2019 | MC | 13.11.2019 | MK | 13.11.2019 | MT | 13.11.2019 | NL | 13.11.2019 | PL | 13.11.2019 | RO | 13.11.2019 | RS | 13.11.2019 | SE | 13.11.2019 | SI | 13.11.2019 | SK | 13.11.2019 | SM | 13.11.2019 | TR | 13.11.2019 | BG | 13.02.2020 | NO | 13.02.2020 | GR | 14.02.2020 | IS | 13.03.2020 | PT | 13.03.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 21.10.2011 | |
AL | 13.11.2019 | ||
AT | 13.11.2019 | ||
CY | 13.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.11.2019 | ||
DK | 13.11.2019 | ||
EE | 13.11.2019 | ||
ES | 13.11.2019 | ||
FI | 13.11.2019 | ||
HR | 13.11.2019 | ||
IT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
MC | 13.11.2019 | ||
MT | 13.11.2019 | ||
NL | 13.11.2019 | ||
PL | 13.11.2019 | ||
RO | 13.11.2019 | ||
RS | 13.11.2019 | ||
SE | 13.11.2019 | ||
SI | 13.11.2019 | ||
SK | 13.11.2019 | ||
SM | 13.11.2019 | ||
TR | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
NO | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
IS | 13.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 13.11.2019 | |
AT | 13.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.11.2019 | ||
DK | 13.11.2019 | ||
EE | 13.11.2019 | ||
ES | 13.11.2019 | ||
FI | 13.11.2019 | ||
HR | 13.11.2019 | ||
IT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
MC | 13.11.2019 | ||
NL | 13.11.2019 | ||
PL | 13.11.2019 | ||
RO | 13.11.2019 | ||
RS | 13.11.2019 | ||
SE | 13.11.2019 | ||
SI | 13.11.2019 | ||
SK | 13.11.2019 | ||
SM | 13.11.2019 | ||
TR | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
NO | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
IS | 13.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AL | 13.11.2019 | |
AT | 13.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.11.2019 | ||
DK | 13.11.2019 | ||
EE | 13.11.2019 | ||
ES | 13.11.2019 | ||
FI | 13.11.2019 | ||
HR | 13.11.2019 | ||
IT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
MC | 13.11.2019 | ||
NL | 13.11.2019 | ||
PL | 13.11.2019 | ||
RO | 13.11.2019 | ||
RS | 13.11.2019 | ||
SE | 13.11.2019 | ||
SI | 13.11.2019 | ||
SK | 13.11.2019 | ||
SM | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
NO | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
IS | 13.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 13.11.2019 | |
AT | 13.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.11.2019 | ||
DK | 13.11.2019 | ||
EE | 13.11.2019 | ||
ES | 13.11.2019 | ||
FI | 13.11.2019 | ||
HR | 13.11.2019 | ||
IT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
NL | 13.11.2019 | ||
PL | 13.11.2019 | ||
RO | 13.11.2019 | ||
RS | 13.11.2019 | ||
SE | 13.11.2019 | ||
SI | 13.11.2019 | ||
SK | 13.11.2019 | ||
SM | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
NO | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
IS | 13.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 13.11.2019 | |
AT | 13.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.11.2019 | ||
DK | 13.11.2019 | ||
EE | 13.11.2019 | ||
ES | 13.11.2019 | ||
FI | 13.11.2019 | ||
HR | 13.11.2019 | ||
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
NL | 13.11.2019 | ||
PL | 13.11.2019 | ||
RO | 13.11.2019 | ||
RS | 13.11.2019 | ||
SE | 13.11.2019 | ||
SI | 13.11.2019 | ||
SK | 13.11.2019 | ||
SM | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
NO | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
IS | 13.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 13.11.2019 | |
CZ | 13.11.2019 | ||
DK | 13.11.2019 | ||
EE | 13.11.2019 | ||
ES | 13.11.2019 | ||
FI | 13.11.2019 | ||
HR | 13.11.2019 | ||
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
NL | 13.11.2019 | ||
PL | 13.11.2019 | ||
RO | 13.11.2019 | ||
RS | 13.11.2019 | ||
SE | 13.11.2019 | ||
SK | 13.11.2019 | ||
SM | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
NO | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
IS | 13.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 13.11.2019 | |
CZ | 13.11.2019 | ||
DK | 13.11.2019 | ||
EE | 13.11.2019 | ||
ES | 13.11.2019 | ||
FI | 13.11.2019 | ||
HR | 13.11.2019 | ||
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
NL | 13.11.2019 | ||
PL | 13.11.2019 | ||
RO | 13.11.2019 | ||
RS | 13.11.2019 | ||
SE | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
NO | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
IS | 13.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 13.11.2019 | |
CZ | 13.11.2019 | ||
ES | 13.11.2019 | ||
FI | 13.11.2019 | ||
HR | 13.11.2019 | ||
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
NL | 13.11.2019 | ||
PL | 13.11.2019 | ||
RO | 13.11.2019 | ||
RS | 13.11.2019 | ||
SE | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
NO | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
IS | 13.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/32] | AL | 13.11.2019 | |
ES | 13.11.2019 | ||
FI | 13.11.2019 | ||
HR | 13.11.2019 | ||
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
NL | 13.11.2019 | ||
PL | 13.11.2019 | ||
RS | 13.11.2019 | ||
SE | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
NO | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
IS | 13.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | ES | 13.11.2019 | |
FI | 13.11.2019 | ||
HR | 13.11.2019 | ||
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
NL | 13.11.2019 | ||
PL | 13.11.2019 | ||
RS | 13.11.2019 | ||
SE | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
NO | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
IS | 13.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | ES | 13.11.2019 | |
FI | 13.11.2019 | ||
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
NL | 13.11.2019 | ||
PL | 13.11.2019 | ||
SE | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
NO | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
IS | 13.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | ES | 13.11.2019 | |
FI | 13.11.2019 | ||
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
NL | 13.11.2019 | ||
PL | 13.11.2019 | ||
SE | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
NO | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | FI | 13.11.2019 | |
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
SE | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
NO | 13.02.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/21] | NO | 13.02.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP1965528 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,5-7,10 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0006]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0034]; figure 2 * * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0045]; figures 4,5,6,7,8 * [I] 3,4,8,9; | [IA]EP2159943 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [I] 1,2,5-7,10 * paragraph [0001] * * figure 1B * * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0015]; figure 2 * * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0029]; figure 5 * * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0037]; figures 6,7 * * paragraph [0053] - paragraph [0056]; figures 13,14,15,16 * [A] 3,4,8,9; | [IA]US2010303464 (DONG LIMIN [CN], et al) [I] 1,2,5-7,10 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0025] * * paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0074]; figures 3,4,5; tables 1,2 * * paragraph [0098] - paragraph [0100]; figure 10 *[A] 3,4,8,9 | International search | [A]CN1790993 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]); | [A]CN101378399 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]); | [A]CN101729188 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD); | [XP]CN102186127 (ZTE CORP) |