EP2757442 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR IMPLEMENTING CLICK AND LOCATE OPERATIONS OF TOUCH SCREEN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 09.11.2018 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.11.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 12.12.2018 [2018/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2014/30] | For all designated states ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LUO, Yijun ZTE Plaza Keji RoadSouth Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2014/30] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/30] | Price, Nigel John King J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 11865425.0 | 22.12.2011 | WO2011CN84464 | Priority number, date | CN201110276130 | 16.09.2011 Original published format: CN201110276130 | [2014/30] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012152011 | Date: | 15.11.2012 | Language: | ZH | [2012/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2757442 | Date: | 23.07.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 15.11.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.02.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/041, G06F3/0488 | [2015/11] | CPC: |
G06F3/0488 (EP,US);
G06F3/041 (US)
|
Former IPC [2014/30] | G06F3/041 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/30] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR IMPLEMENTIERUNG VORRICHTUNG VON KLICK- UND LOKALISIERUNGSOPERATIONEN EINES BERÜHRUNGSBILDSCHIRMS | [2014/30] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR IMPLEMENTING CLICK AND LOCATE OPERATIONS OF TOUCH SCREEN | [2014/30] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE MISE EN UVRE D'OPÉRATIONS DE CLIC ET DE LOCALISATION D'UN ÉCRAN TACTILE | [2014/30] | Entry into regional phase | 14.03.2014 | Translation filed | 14.03.2014 | National basic fee paid | 14.03.2014 | Search fee paid | 14.03.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.03.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.03.2014 | Examination requested [2014/30] | 26.08.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.07.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.11.2018 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2018/50] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.07.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0795811 (NCR INT INC [US]) [X] 1-8 * column 2, line 33 - column 5, line 22 ** figures 1-7 *; | [XI]US2006244735 (WILSON ANDREW D [US]) [X] 1-3,5-7 * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0052] * * paragraph [0072] * * paragraph [0077] - paragraph [0086] * * figures 1,2,6-9 * [I] 4,8; | [XI]US2007097096 (ROSENBERG LOUIS B [US]) [X] 1,3-5,7,8 * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0044] * * figures 1-7, 9 * [I] 2,6; | [XI]US2009207144 (BRIDGER SIMON JAMES [NZ]) [X] 1,2,5,6 * paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0036] * * figures 2-4 * [I] 3,4,7,8 | International search | [A]CN101446872 (VTRON TECHNOLOGIES LTD [CN]); | [A]WO2010089740 (GHASSABIAN BENJAMIN FIROOZ [IL]); | [X]CN101840287 (WUXI ARF ELECTRONICS CO LTD) |