EP2724520 - MOBILE RADIO UNIT WITH A DOSIMETER-RADIOMETER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.10.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.10.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.11.2017 [2017/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Elin, Vladimir Aleksandrovich 1 Neopalimovsky Pereulok 15/7 Suite 7 Moscow 119121 / RU | [2014/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2014/18] | Representative(s) | Smirnov, Alexander A. Smirnov & Co Patent and Trademark Agency Alises 10-69 1046 Riga / LV | [2014/18] | Application number, filing date | 11868241.8 | 05.07.2011 | WO2011RU00486 | Priority number, date | RU20110126013 | 24.06.2011 Original published format: RU 2011126013 | [2014/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012177167 | Date: | 27.12.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2724520 | Date: | 30.04.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.12.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | RU | 27.12.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.11.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H04M1/725, G01T7/00 | [2014/51] | CPC: |
G01T7/00 (EP,US);
H04M1/21 (EP,KR,US);
H04M1/72403 (EP,US);
H04M2250/10 (EP,US);
H04M2250/12 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2014/18] | H04M1/21 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/18] | Title | German: | MOBILFUNK MIT EINEM DOSIMETER-RADIOMETER | [2014/18] | English: | MOBILE RADIO UNIT WITH A DOSIMETER-RADIOMETER | [2014/18] | French: | UNITÉ RADIOÉLECTRIQUE MOBILE DOTÉE D'UN DOSIMÈTRE-RADIOMÈTRE | [2014/18] | Entry into regional phase | 18.04.2013 | National basic fee paid | 18.04.2013 | Search fee paid | 18.04.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.04.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.07.2012 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: RU | 19.04.2013 | Examination requested [2014/18] | 24.04.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.02.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.06.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/47] | 17.07.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/47] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.02.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2017 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2006097171 (BALCHUNAS CURT [US], et al) [I] 1-7 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0027] * * figure 1 *; | [I]US2006170541 (TOMPA GARY S [US], et al) [I] 1-7 * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0038] * * figure 1 *; | [XI]US2008169921 (PEETERS JOHN [US]) [X] 1,5,6 * abstract * * figure 1 * * paragraph [0068] * * paragraph [0070] - paragraph [0072] * * paragraph [0075] - paragraph [0077] * * paragraph [0084] - paragraph [0085] * * paragraph [0124] * * paragraph [0142] - paragraph [0146] * [I] 2-4,7; | [A]WO2009126582 (MIRION TECHNOLOGIES INC [US], et al) [A] 1-7 * paragraph [0029] ** paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0049] * | International search | [Y]US2007018807 (CRAIG WILLIAM W [US], et al); | [X]KR20080033011 (OH JAE YEON [KR]); | [A]US2009012745 (LONGMAN ANDREW [US], et al) |