EP2727789 - CONTROL DEVICE FOR VEHICLE DRIVE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.11.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.11.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | [2014/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TABATA Atsushi c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | 02 /
IMAMURA Tatsuya c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | [2014/19] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [2014/19] | Application number, filing date | 11868439.8 | 28.06.2011 | [2017/52] | WO2011JP64844 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013001616 | Date: | 03.01.2013 | Language: | JA | [2013/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2727789 | Date: | 07.05.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2727789 | Date: | 27.12.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 03.01.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.11.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B60W10/10, B60K6/445, B60K6/547, B60W10/06, B60W10/08, B60W20/00, B60K6/442, B60K17/02, F16H45/00, B60W10/02, B60W30/188 | [2017/29] | CPC: |
B60W20/10 (EP,US);
B60W10/026 (CN);
B60K6/445 (EP,CN,US);
B60K6/547 (EP,CN,US);
B60W10/023 (EP,US);
B60W10/06 (EP,CN,US);
B60W10/08 (EP,CN,US);
B60W10/10 (EP,CN,US);
B60W30/1882 (US);
|
Former IPC [2016/52] | B60W10/10, B60K6/445, B60K6/547, B60W10/06, B60W10/08, B60W20/00, B60K6/442, B60K17/02, F16H45/00 | ||
Former IPC [2014/19] | B60W10/10, B60K6/445, B60K6/547, B60W10/06, B60W10/08, B60W20/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/19] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STEUERUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR EINE FAHRZEUGANTRIEBSVORRICHTUNG | [2014/19] | English: | CONTROL DEVICE FOR VEHICLE DRIVE DEVICE | [2014/19] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE POUR DISPOSITIF DE PROPULSION DE VÉHICULE | [2014/19] | Entry into regional phase | 10.01.2014 | Translation filed | 10.01.2014 | National basic fee paid | 10.01.2014 | Search fee paid | 10.01.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.01.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.01.2012 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 10.01.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.01.2014 | Examination requested [2014/19] | 21.07.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.11.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 15.11.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.11.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.07.2017 | Opposition(s) | 28.09.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.06.2011 | AL | 27.12.2017 | AT | 27.12.2017 | CY | 27.12.2017 | CZ | 27.12.2017 | DK | 27.12.2017 | EE | 27.12.2017 | ES | 27.12.2017 | FI | 27.12.2017 | HR | 27.12.2017 | IT | 27.12.2017 | LT | 27.12.2017 | LV | 27.12.2017 | MC | 27.12.2017 | MK | 27.12.2017 | NL | 27.12.2017 | PL | 27.12.2017 | PT | 27.12.2017 | RO | 27.12.2017 | RS | 27.12.2017 | SE | 27.12.2017 | SI | 27.12.2017 | SK | 27.12.2017 | SM | 27.12.2017 | TR | 27.12.2017 | BG | 27.03.2018 | NO | 27.03.2018 | GR | 28.03.2018 | IS | 27.04.2018 | GB | 28.06.2018 | IE | 28.06.2018 | LU | 28.06.2018 | MT | 28.06.2018 | BE | 30.06.2018 | CH | 30.06.2018 | FR | 30.06.2018 | LI | 30.06.2018 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 28.06.2011 | |
AT | 27.12.2017 | ||
CY | 27.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 27.12.2017 | ||
DK | 27.12.2017 | ||
EE | 27.12.2017 | ||
ES | 27.12.2017 | ||
FI | 27.12.2017 | ||
HR | 27.12.2017 | ||
IT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LV | 27.12.2017 | ||
MC | 27.12.2017 | ||
MK | 27.12.2017 | ||
NL | 27.12.2017 | ||
PL | 27.12.2017 | ||
PT | 27.12.2017 | ||
RO | 27.12.2017 | ||
RS | 27.12.2017 | ||
SE | 27.12.2017 | ||
SI | 27.12.2017 | ||
SK | 27.12.2017 | ||
SM | 27.12.2017 | ||
TR | 27.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
NO | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IS | 27.04.2018 | ||
GB | 28.06.2018 | ||
IE | 28.06.2018 | ||
LU | 28.06.2018 | ||
MT | 28.06.2018 | ||
BE | 30.06.2018 | ||
CH | 30.06.2018 | ||
FR | 30.06.2018 | ||
LI | 30.06.2018 | ||
Former [2020/29] | HU | 28.06.2011 | |
AT | 27.12.2017 | ||
CY | 27.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 27.12.2017 | ||
DK | 27.12.2017 | ||
EE | 27.12.2017 | ||
ES | 27.12.2017 | ||
FI | 27.12.2017 | ||
HR | 27.12.2017 | ||
IT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LV | 27.12.2017 | ||
MC | 27.12.2017 | ||
NL | 27.12.2017 | ||
PL | 27.12.2017 | ||
PT | 27.12.2017 | ||
RO | 27.12.2017 | ||
RS | 27.12.2017 | ||
SE | 27.12.2017 | ||
SI | 27.12.2017 | ||
SK | 27.12.2017 | ||
SM | 27.12.2017 | ||
TR | 27.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
NO | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IS | 27.04.2018 | ||
GB | 28.06.2018 | ||
IE | 28.06.2018 | ||
LU | 28.06.2018 | ||
MT | 28.06.2018 | ||
BE | 30.06.2018 | ||
CH | 30.06.2018 | ||
FR | 30.06.2018 | ||
LI | 30.06.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | HU | 28.06.2011 | |
AT | 27.12.2017 | ||
CY | 27.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 27.12.2017 | ||
DK | 27.12.2017 | ||
EE | 27.12.2017 | ||
ES | 27.12.2017 | ||
FI | 27.12.2017 | ||
HR | 27.12.2017 | ||
IT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LV | 27.12.2017 | ||
MC | 27.12.2017 | ||
NL | 27.12.2017 | ||
PL | 27.12.2017 | ||
PT | 27.12.2017 | ||
RO | 27.12.2017 | ||
RS | 27.12.2017 | ||
SI | 27.12.2017 | ||
SK | 27.12.2017 | ||
SM | 27.12.2017 | ||
TR | 27.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
NO | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IS | 27.04.2018 | ||
GB | 28.06.2018 | ||
IE | 28.06.2018 | ||
LU | 28.06.2018 | ||
MT | 28.06.2018 | ||
BE | 30.06.2018 | ||
CH | 30.06.2018 | ||
FR | 30.06.2018 | ||
LI | 30.06.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 27.12.2017 | |
CY | 27.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 27.12.2017 | ||
DK | 27.12.2017 | ||
EE | 27.12.2017 | ||
ES | 27.12.2017 | ||
FI | 27.12.2017 | ||
HR | 27.12.2017 | ||
IT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LV | 27.12.2017 | ||
MC | 27.12.2017 | ||
NL | 27.12.2017 | ||
PL | 27.12.2017 | ||
RO | 27.12.2017 | ||
RS | 27.12.2017 | ||
SI | 27.12.2017 | ||
SK | 27.12.2017 | ||
SM | 27.12.2017 | ||
TR | 27.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
NO | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IS | 27.04.2018 | ||
GB | 28.06.2018 | ||
IE | 28.06.2018 | ||
LU | 28.06.2018 | ||
MT | 28.06.2018 | ||
BE | 30.06.2018 | ||
CH | 30.06.2018 | ||
FR | 30.06.2018 | ||
LI | 30.06.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AT | 27.12.2017 | |
CY | 27.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 27.12.2017 | ||
DK | 27.12.2017 | ||
EE | 27.12.2017 | ||
ES | 27.12.2017 | ||
FI | 27.12.2017 | ||
HR | 27.12.2017 | ||
IT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LV | 27.12.2017 | ||
MC | 27.12.2017 | ||
NL | 27.12.2017 | ||
PL | 27.12.2017 | ||
RO | 27.12.2017 | ||
RS | 27.12.2017 | ||
SI | 27.12.2017 | ||
SK | 27.12.2017 | ||
SM | 27.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
NO | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IS | 27.04.2018 | ||
GB | 28.06.2018 | ||
IE | 28.06.2018 | ||
LU | 28.06.2018 | ||
MT | 28.06.2018 | ||
BE | 30.06.2018 | ||
CH | 30.06.2018 | ||
FR | 30.06.2018 | ||
LI | 30.06.2018 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AT | 27.12.2017 | |
CY | 27.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 27.12.2017 | ||
DK | 27.12.2017 | ||
EE | 27.12.2017 | ||
ES | 27.12.2017 | ||
FI | 27.12.2017 | ||
HR | 27.12.2017 | ||
IT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LV | 27.12.2017 | ||
MC | 27.12.2017 | ||
NL | 27.12.2017 | ||
PL | 27.12.2017 | ||
RO | 27.12.2017 | ||
RS | 27.12.2017 | ||
SI | 27.12.2017 | ||
SK | 27.12.2017 | ||
SM | 27.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
NO | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IS | 27.04.2018 | ||
GB | 28.06.2018 | ||
IE | 28.06.2018 | ||
LU | 28.06.2018 | ||
BE | 30.06.2018 | ||
CH | 30.06.2018 | ||
FR | 30.06.2018 | ||
LI | 30.06.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AT | 27.12.2017 | |
CY | 27.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 27.12.2017 | ||
DK | 27.12.2017 | ||
EE | 27.12.2017 | ||
ES | 27.12.2017 | ||
FI | 27.12.2017 | ||
HR | 27.12.2017 | ||
IT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LV | 27.12.2017 | ||
MC | 27.12.2017 | ||
NL | 27.12.2017 | ||
PL | 27.12.2017 | ||
RO | 27.12.2017 | ||
RS | 27.12.2017 | ||
SI | 27.12.2017 | ||
SK | 27.12.2017 | ||
SM | 27.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
NO | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IS | 27.04.2018 | ||
GB | 28.06.2018 | ||
IE | 28.06.2018 | ||
LU | 28.06.2018 | ||
CH | 30.06.2018 | ||
LI | 30.06.2018 | ||
Former [2019/19] | AT | 27.12.2017 | |
CY | 27.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 27.12.2017 | ||
DK | 27.12.2017 | ||
EE | 27.12.2017 | ||
ES | 27.12.2017 | ||
FI | 27.12.2017 | ||
HR | 27.12.2017 | ||
IT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LV | 27.12.2017 | ||
MC | 27.12.2017 | ||
NL | 27.12.2017 | ||
PL | 27.12.2017 | ||
RO | 27.12.2017 | ||
RS | 27.12.2017 | ||
SI | 27.12.2017 | ||
SK | 27.12.2017 | ||
SM | 27.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
NO | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IS | 27.04.2018 | ||
IE | 28.06.2018 | ||
LU | 28.06.2018 | ||
Former [2019/17] | AT | 27.12.2017 | |
CY | 27.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 27.12.2017 | ||
DK | 27.12.2017 | ||
EE | 27.12.2017 | ||
ES | 27.12.2017 | ||
FI | 27.12.2017 | ||
HR | 27.12.2017 | ||
IT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LV | 27.12.2017 | ||
MC | 27.12.2017 | ||
NL | 27.12.2017 | ||
PL | 27.12.2017 | ||
RO | 27.12.2017 | ||
RS | 27.12.2017 | ||
SI | 27.12.2017 | ||
SK | 27.12.2017 | ||
SM | 27.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
NO | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IS | 27.04.2018 | ||
LU | 28.06.2018 | ||
Former [2019/15] | AT | 27.12.2017 | |
CY | 27.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 27.12.2017 | ||
DK | 27.12.2017 | ||
EE | 27.12.2017 | ||
ES | 27.12.2017 | ||
FI | 27.12.2017 | ||
HR | 27.12.2017 | ||
IT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LV | 27.12.2017 | ||
MC | 27.12.2017 | ||
NL | 27.12.2017 | ||
PL | 27.12.2017 | ||
RO | 27.12.2017 | ||
RS | 27.12.2017 | ||
SI | 27.12.2017 | ||
SK | 27.12.2017 | ||
SM | 27.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
NO | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IS | 27.04.2018 | ||
Former [2019/13] | AT | 27.12.2017 | |
CY | 27.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 27.12.2017 | ||
DK | 27.12.2017 | ||
EE | 27.12.2017 | ||
ES | 27.12.2017 | ||
FI | 27.12.2017 | ||
HR | 27.12.2017 | ||
IT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LV | 27.12.2017 | ||
NL | 27.12.2017 | ||
PL | 27.12.2017 | ||
RO | 27.12.2017 | ||
RS | 27.12.2017 | ||
SI | 27.12.2017 | ||
SK | 27.12.2017 | ||
SM | 27.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
NO | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IS | 27.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | AT | 27.12.2017 | |
CY | 27.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 27.12.2017 | ||
DK | 27.12.2017 | ||
EE | 27.12.2017 | ||
ES | 27.12.2017 | ||
FI | 27.12.2017 | ||
HR | 27.12.2017 | ||
IT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LV | 27.12.2017 | ||
NL | 27.12.2017 | ||
PL | 27.12.2017 | ||
RO | 27.12.2017 | ||
RS | 27.12.2017 | ||
SK | 27.12.2017 | ||
SM | 27.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
NO | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IS | 27.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 27.12.2017 | |
CY | 27.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 27.12.2017 | ||
EE | 27.12.2017 | ||
ES | 27.12.2017 | ||
FI | 27.12.2017 | ||
HR | 27.12.2017 | ||
IT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LV | 27.12.2017 | ||
NL | 27.12.2017 | ||
PL | 27.12.2017 | ||
RO | 27.12.2017 | ||
RS | 27.12.2017 | ||
SK | 27.12.2017 | ||
SM | 27.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
NO | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IS | 27.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 27.12.2017 | |
CY | 27.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 27.12.2017 | ||
EE | 27.12.2017 | ||
ES | 27.12.2017 | ||
FI | 27.12.2017 | ||
HR | 27.12.2017 | ||
IT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LV | 27.12.2017 | ||
NL | 27.12.2017 | ||
PL | 27.12.2017 | ||
RS | 27.12.2017 | ||
SK | 27.12.2017 | ||
SM | 27.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
NO | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IS | 27.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/38] | AT | 27.12.2017 | |
CY | 27.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 27.12.2017 | ||
EE | 27.12.2017 | ||
ES | 27.12.2017 | ||
FI | 27.12.2017 | ||
HR | 27.12.2017 | ||
LT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LV | 27.12.2017 | ||
NL | 27.12.2017 | ||
PL | 27.12.2017 | ||
RS | 27.12.2017 | ||
SK | 27.12.2017 | ||
SM | 27.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
NO | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IS | 27.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 27.12.2017 | |
CZ | 27.12.2017 | ||
EE | 27.12.2017 | ||
ES | 27.12.2017 | ||
FI | 27.12.2017 | ||
HR | 27.12.2017 | ||
LT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LV | 27.12.2017 | ||
NL | 27.12.2017 | ||
PL | 27.12.2017 | ||
RS | 27.12.2017 | ||
SK | 27.12.2017 | ||
SM | 27.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
NO | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/34] | FI | 27.12.2017 | |
HR | 27.12.2017 | ||
LT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LV | 27.12.2017 | ||
NL | 27.12.2017 | ||
RS | 27.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
NO | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/25] | FI | 27.12.2017 | |
HR | 27.12.2017 | ||
LT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LV | 27.12.2017 | ||
RS | 27.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
NO | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/23] | FI | 27.12.2017 | |
HR | 27.12.2017 | ||
LT | 27.12.2017 | ||
RS | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | FI | 27.12.2017 | |
LT | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.03.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2008196954 (SOLIMAN IHAB [US], et al) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [A]US2009326778 (SOLIMAN IHAB S [US], et al) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [A]US2011005215 (OTA HIROFUMI [JP], et al) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [A]US2011005216 (YAMASHITA TOSHIYA [JP], et al) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2007009582 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE], et al) [A] 1-7 * the whole document * | International search | [X]JP2010111317 (DENSO CORP); | [Y]JP2010137711 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP); | [Y]JP2008184009 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP); | [Y]JP2007269256 (FUJI HEAVY IND LTD); | [Y]JP2010215190 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP); | [A]JP2000225871 (MAZDA MOTOR); | [A]JP2007191049 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) | by applicant | JP2009220618 |