EP2727874 - ELEVATOR SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.04.2017 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2014/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RAHMAN, Ashiqur c/o Mitsubishi Elevator Europe B.V. Schietboom 20 NL-3900E Veenendaal / NL | 02 /
OFFERHAUS, David, Willem, Lodewijk c/o Mitsubishi Elevator Europe B.V. Schietboom 20 NL-3900E Veenendaal / NL | 03 /
FUJIHATA, Yuji c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2014/19] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2016/25] |
Former [2014/19] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11868708.6 | 30.06.2011 | [2016/25] | WO2011JP65086 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013001643 | Date: | 03.01.2013 | Language: | JA | [2013/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2727874 | Date: | 07.05.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2727874 | Date: | 22.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 03.01.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.03.2015 | Classification | IPC: | B66B5/02 | [2014/19] | CPC: |
B66B5/021 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/19] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUFZUGSYSTEM | [2014/19] | English: | ELEVATOR SYSTEM | [2014/19] | French: | SYSTÈME D'ASCENSEUR | [2014/19] | Entry into regional phase | 09.10.2013 | Translation filed | 09.10.2013 | National basic fee paid | 09.10.2013 | Search fee paid | 09.10.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.10.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.10.2013 | Examination requested [2014/19] | 22.07.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.01.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.05.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 09.05.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.05.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.01.2016 | Opposition(s) | 23.03.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.06.2011 | AL | 22.06.2016 | AT | 22.06.2016 | BE | 22.06.2016 | BG | 22.06.2016 | CY | 22.06.2016 | CZ | 22.06.2016 | DK | 22.06.2016 | EE | 22.06.2016 | ES | 22.06.2016 | FI | 22.06.2016 | HR | 22.06.2016 | IT | 22.06.2016 | LT | 22.06.2016 | LV | 22.06.2016 | MC | 22.06.2016 | MK | 22.06.2016 | NL | 22.06.2016 | PL | 22.06.2016 | RO | 22.06.2016 | RS | 22.06.2016 | SE | 22.06.2016 | SI | 22.06.2016 | SK | 22.06.2016 | SM | 22.06.2016 | TR | 22.06.2016 | CH | 30.06.2016 | IE | 30.06.2016 | LI | 30.06.2016 | LU | 30.06.2016 | MT | 30.06.2016 | FR | 22.08.2016 | GB | 22.09.2016 | NO | 22.09.2016 | GR | 23.09.2016 | IS | 22.10.2016 | PT | 24.10.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/45] | HU | 30.06.2011 | |
AT | 22.06.2016 | ||
BE | 22.06.2016 | ||
BG | 22.06.2016 | ||
CY | 22.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 22.06.2016 | ||
DK | 22.06.2016 | ||
EE | 22.06.2016 | ||
ES | 22.06.2016 | ||
FI | 22.06.2016 | ||
HR | 22.06.2016 | ||
IT | 22.06.2016 | ||
LT | 22.06.2016 | ||
LV | 22.06.2016 | ||
MC | 22.06.2016 | ||
MK | 22.06.2016 | ||
NL | 22.06.2016 | ||
PL | 22.06.2016 | ||
RO | 22.06.2016 | ||
RS | 22.06.2016 | ||
SE | 22.06.2016 | ||
SI | 22.06.2016 | ||
SK | 22.06.2016 | ||
SM | 22.06.2016 | ||
TR | 22.06.2016 | ||
CH | 30.06.2016 | ||
IE | 30.06.2016 | ||
LI | 30.06.2016 | ||
LU | 30.06.2016 | ||
MT | 30.06.2016 | ||
FR | 22.08.2016 | ||
GB | 22.09.2016 | ||
NO | 22.09.2016 | ||
GR | 23.09.2016 | ||
IS | 22.10.2016 | ||
PT | 24.10.2016 | ||
Former [2018/38] | HU | 30.06.2011 | |
AT | 22.06.2016 | ||
BE | 22.06.2016 | ||
BG | 22.06.2016 | ||
CY | 22.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 22.06.2016 | ||
DK | 22.06.2016 | ||
EE | 22.06.2016 | ||
ES | 22.06.2016 | ||
FI | 22.06.2016 | ||
HR | 22.06.2016 | ||
IT | 22.06.2016 | ||
LT | 22.06.2016 | ||
LV | 22.06.2016 | ||
MC | 22.06.2016 | ||
MK | 22.06.2016 | ||
NL | 22.06.2016 | ||
PL | 22.06.2016 | ||
RO | 22.06.2016 | ||
RS | 22.06.2016 | ||
SE | 22.06.2016 | ||
SI | 22.06.2016 | ||
SK | 22.06.2016 | ||
SM | 22.06.2016 | ||
CH | 30.06.2016 | ||
IE | 30.06.2016 | ||
LI | 30.06.2016 | ||
LU | 30.06.2016 | ||
MT | 30.06.2016 | ||
FR | 22.08.2016 | ||
GB | 22.09.2016 | ||
NO | 22.09.2016 | ||
GR | 23.09.2016 | ||
IS | 22.10.2016 | ||
PT | 24.10.2016 | ||
Former [2018/31] | HU | 30.06.2011 | |
AT | 22.06.2016 | ||
BE | 22.06.2016 | ||
CY | 22.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 22.06.2016 | ||
DK | 22.06.2016 | ||
EE | 22.06.2016 | ||
ES | 22.06.2016 | ||
FI | 22.06.2016 | ||
HR | 22.06.2016 | ||
IT | 22.06.2016 | ||
LT | 22.06.2016 | ||
LV | 22.06.2016 | ||
MC | 22.06.2016 | ||
MK | 22.06.2016 | ||
NL | 22.06.2016 | ||
PL | 22.06.2016 | ||
RO | 22.06.2016 | ||
RS | 22.06.2016 | ||
SE | 22.06.2016 | ||
SI | 22.06.2016 | ||
SK | 22.06.2016 | ||
SM | 22.06.2016 | ||
CH | 30.06.2016 | ||
IE | 30.06.2016 | ||
LI | 30.06.2016 | ||
LU | 30.06.2016 | ||
MT | 30.06.2016 | ||
FR | 22.08.2016 | ||
GB | 22.09.2016 | ||
NO | 22.09.2016 | ||
GR | 23.09.2016 | ||
IS | 22.10.2016 | ||
PT | 24.10.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 30.06.2011 | |
AT | 22.06.2016 | ||
BE | 22.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 22.06.2016 | ||
DK | 22.06.2016 | ||
EE | 22.06.2016 | ||
ES | 22.06.2016 | ||
FI | 22.06.2016 | ||
HR | 22.06.2016 | ||
IT | 22.06.2016 | ||
LT | 22.06.2016 | ||
LV | 22.06.2016 | ||
MC | 22.06.2016 | ||
MK | 22.06.2016 | ||
NL | 22.06.2016 | ||
PL | 22.06.2016 | ||
RO | 22.06.2016 | ||
RS | 22.06.2016 | ||
SE | 22.06.2016 | ||
SI | 22.06.2016 | ||
SK | 22.06.2016 | ||
SM | 22.06.2016 | ||
CH | 30.06.2016 | ||
IE | 30.06.2016 | ||
LI | 30.06.2016 | ||
FR | 22.08.2016 | ||
GB | 22.09.2016 | ||
NO | 22.09.2016 | ||
GR | 23.09.2016 | ||
IS | 22.10.2016 | ||
PT | 24.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/38] | AT | 22.06.2016 | |
BE | 22.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 22.06.2016 | ||
DK | 22.06.2016 | ||
EE | 22.06.2016 | ||
ES | 22.06.2016 | ||
FI | 22.06.2016 | ||
HR | 22.06.2016 | ||
IT | 22.06.2016 | ||
LT | 22.06.2016 | ||
LV | 22.06.2016 | ||
MC | 22.06.2016 | ||
NL | 22.06.2016 | ||
PL | 22.06.2016 | ||
RO | 22.06.2016 | ||
RS | 22.06.2016 | ||
SE | 22.06.2016 | ||
SI | 22.06.2016 | ||
SK | 22.06.2016 | ||
SM | 22.06.2016 | ||
CH | 30.06.2016 | ||
IE | 30.06.2016 | ||
LI | 30.06.2016 | ||
FR | 22.08.2016 | ||
GB | 22.09.2016 | ||
NO | 22.09.2016 | ||
GR | 23.09.2016 | ||
IS | 22.10.2016 | ||
PT | 24.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/25] | AT | 22.06.2016 | |
BE | 22.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 22.06.2016 | ||
DK | 22.06.2016 | ||
EE | 22.06.2016 | ||
ES | 22.06.2016 | ||
FI | 22.06.2016 | ||
HR | 22.06.2016 | ||
IT | 22.06.2016 | ||
LT | 22.06.2016 | ||
LV | 22.06.2016 | ||
MC | 22.06.2016 | ||
NL | 22.06.2016 | ||
PL | 22.06.2016 | ||
RO | 22.06.2016 | ||
RS | 22.06.2016 | ||
SE | 22.06.2016 | ||
SK | 22.06.2016 | ||
SM | 22.06.2016 | ||
CH | 30.06.2016 | ||
IE | 30.06.2016 | ||
LI | 30.06.2016 | ||
NO | 22.09.2016 | ||
GR | 23.09.2016 | ||
IS | 22.10.2016 | ||
PT | 24.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/23] | AT | 22.06.2016 | |
BE | 22.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 22.06.2016 | ||
EE | 22.06.2016 | ||
ES | 22.06.2016 | ||
FI | 22.06.2016 | ||
HR | 22.06.2016 | ||
IT | 22.06.2016 | ||
LT | 22.06.2016 | ||
LV | 22.06.2016 | ||
MC | 22.06.2016 | ||
NL | 22.06.2016 | ||
PL | 22.06.2016 | ||
RO | 22.06.2016 | ||
RS | 22.06.2016 | ||
SE | 22.06.2016 | ||
SK | 22.06.2016 | ||
SM | 22.06.2016 | ||
CH | 30.06.2016 | ||
LI | 30.06.2016 | ||
NO | 22.09.2016 | ||
GR | 23.09.2016 | ||
IS | 22.10.2016 | ||
PT | 24.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/17] | AT | 22.06.2016 | |
BE | 22.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 22.06.2016 | ||
EE | 22.06.2016 | ||
ES | 22.06.2016 | ||
FI | 22.06.2016 | ||
HR | 22.06.2016 | ||
IT | 22.06.2016 | ||
LT | 22.06.2016 | ||
LV | 22.06.2016 | ||
MC | 22.06.2016 | ||
NL | 22.06.2016 | ||
PL | 22.06.2016 | ||
RO | 22.06.2016 | ||
RS | 22.06.2016 | ||
SE | 22.06.2016 | ||
SK | 22.06.2016 | ||
SM | 22.06.2016 | ||
NO | 22.09.2016 | ||
GR | 23.09.2016 | ||
IS | 22.10.2016 | ||
PT | 24.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 22.06.2016 | |
BE | 22.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 22.06.2016 | ||
EE | 22.06.2016 | ||
ES | 22.06.2016 | ||
FI | 22.06.2016 | ||
HR | 22.06.2016 | ||
IT | 22.06.2016 | ||
LT | 22.06.2016 | ||
LV | 22.06.2016 | ||
NL | 22.06.2016 | ||
PL | 22.06.2016 | ||
RO | 22.06.2016 | ||
RS | 22.06.2016 | ||
SE | 22.06.2016 | ||
SK | 22.06.2016 | ||
SM | 22.06.2016 | ||
NO | 22.09.2016 | ||
GR | 23.09.2016 | ||
IS | 22.10.2016 | ||
PT | 24.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | BE | 22.06.2016 | |
CZ | 22.06.2016 | ||
EE | 22.06.2016 | ||
FI | 22.06.2016 | ||
HR | 22.06.2016 | ||
IT | 22.06.2016 | ||
LT | 22.06.2016 | ||
LV | 22.06.2016 | ||
NL | 22.06.2016 | ||
PL | 22.06.2016 | ||
RO | 22.06.2016 | ||
RS | 22.06.2016 | ||
SE | 22.06.2016 | ||
SK | 22.06.2016 | ||
NO | 22.09.2016 | ||
GR | 23.09.2016 | ||
IS | 22.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | CZ | 22.06.2016 | |
EE | 22.06.2016 | ||
FI | 22.06.2016 | ||
HR | 22.06.2016 | ||
IT | 22.06.2016 | ||
LT | 22.06.2016 | ||
LV | 22.06.2016 | ||
NL | 22.06.2016 | ||
RO | 22.06.2016 | ||
RS | 22.06.2016 | ||
SE | 22.06.2016 | ||
BE | 30.06.2016 | ||
NO | 22.09.2016 | ||
GR | 23.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | FI | 22.06.2016 | |
HR | 22.06.2016 | ||
LT | 22.06.2016 | ||
LV | 22.06.2016 | ||
NL | 22.06.2016 | ||
RS | 22.06.2016 | ||
SE | 22.06.2016 | ||
BE | 30.06.2016 | ||
NO | 22.09.2016 | ||
GR | 23.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/52] | FI | 22.06.2016 | |
HR | 22.06.2016 | ||
LT | 22.06.2016 | ||
LV | 22.06.2016 | ||
NL | 22.06.2016 | ||
RS | 22.06.2016 | ||
SE | 22.06.2016 | ||
NO | 22.09.2016 | ||
GR | 23.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | FI | 22.06.2016 | |
HR | 22.06.2016 | ||
LT | 22.06.2016 | ||
LV | 22.06.2016 | ||
RS | 22.06.2016 | ||
NO | 22.09.2016 | ||
GR | 23.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | FI | 22.06.2016 | |
HR | 22.06.2016 | ||
LT | 22.06.2016 | ||
LV | 22.06.2016 | ||
RS | 22.06.2016 | ||
NO | 22.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 22.06.2016 | |
LT | 22.06.2016 | ||
NO | 22.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 22.06.2016 | |
NO | 22.09.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO2010082650 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP], et al) [I] 1,2,5 * paragraph [0029] * | International search | [X]WO2010082650 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP], et al); | [Y]WO2007037031 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP], et al); | [Y]JP2003276964 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) | by applicant | JP2005112601 |