EP2737444 - OFFLINE TRANSACTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 24.09.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.09.2021 | Refusal of application | published on 27.10.2021 [2021/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UPC Konsultointi OY Gerbyntie 18 65230 Vaasa / FI | [2014/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
UDD, Sture Teollisuuskatu 10 K as. 1 FI-65170 Vaasa / FI | [2014/23] | Representative(s) | Kolster Oy Ab (Salmisaarenaukio 1) P.O. Box 204 00181 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2014/23] | Kolster Oy Ab Iso Roobertinkatu 23 PO Box 148 00121 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 11870070.7 | 28.07.2011 | WO2011FI50678 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013014327 | Date: | 31.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2737444 | Date: | 04.06.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.01.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | FI | 31.01.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.10.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q20/30, G06K7/10, G06K19/06, G06Q20/28, G06Q20/38, G06Q20/32 | [2014/48] | CPC: |
G06Q20/28 (EP,CN,US);
G06Q20/385 (US);
G06Q20/3274 (EP,CN,US)
|
Former IPC [2014/23] | G06Q20/30, G06K7/10, G06K19/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/23] | Title | German: | OFFLINE-TRANSAKTION | [2014/23] | English: | OFFLINE TRANSACTION | [2014/23] | French: | TRANSACTION HORS LIGNE | [2014/23] | Entry into regional phase | 10.02.2014 | National basic fee paid | 10.02.2014 | Search fee paid | 10.02.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.02.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.02.2014 | Examination requested [2014/23] | 06.05.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.07.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.11.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.12.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.04.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.05.2021 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2021/43] | 05.05.2021 | Date of oral proceedings | 26.05.2021 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 08.06.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2021/43] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.07.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 19.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 20.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2018 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   22.10.2018 | 31.07.2020 | 10   M06   Fee paid on   20.10.2020 | 31.07.2021 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [X]WO2008060014 (SK TELECOM CO LTD [KR], et al); | [X]US2008201212 (HAMMAD AYMAN [US], et al); | [X]WO2009070114 (SKYCASH SP Z O O [PL], et al); | [A]US2010280957 (GULLBERG PETER [SE]) | by applicant | WO2007090114 |