EP2676328 - ANTENNA ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.09.2018 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.10.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL, IS | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2017/46] |
Former [2013/52] | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAWORTH, Stephen 70 Reading Road Finchampstead Wokingham Berkshire RG40 4RA / GB | [2013/52] | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [2017/46] |
Former [2013/52] | Kreuz, Georg Maria Huawei Technologies Dessauerstrasse 3 80992 Munich / DE | Application number, filing date | 11871316.3 | 25.08.2011 | [2017/46] | WO2011CN78890 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013026204 | Date: | 28.02.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2676328 | Date: | 25.12.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.02.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2676328 | Date: | 15.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 28.02.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.01.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q23/00, H01Q1/02, H01Q1/24, H01Q1/40 | [2015/08] | CPC: |
H01Q1/40 (EP);
H01Q1/02 (EP);
H01Q1/246 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2013/52] | H01Q23/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/52] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANTENNENANORDNUNG | [2013/52] | English: | ANTENNA ASSEMBLY | [2013/52] | French: | ENSEMBLE ANTENNE | [2013/52] | Entry into regional phase | 16.09.2013 | National basic fee paid | 16.09.2013 | Search fee paid | 16.09.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.09.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.09.2013 | Examination requested [2013/52] | 24.07.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.06.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.10.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 09.10.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.10.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.06.2017 | Opposition(s) | 17.08.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.08.2011 | AL | 15.11.2017 | AT | 15.11.2017 | CY | 15.11.2017 | CZ | 15.11.2017 | DK | 15.11.2017 | EE | 15.11.2017 | ES | 15.11.2017 | FI | 15.11.2017 | HR | 15.11.2017 | IT | 15.11.2017 | LT | 15.11.2017 | LV | 15.11.2017 | MC | 15.11.2017 | MK | 15.11.2017 | NL | 15.11.2017 | PL | 15.11.2017 | PT | 15.11.2017 | RO | 15.11.2017 | RS | 15.11.2017 | SE | 15.11.2017 | SI | 15.11.2017 | SK | 15.11.2017 | SM | 15.11.2017 | TR | 15.11.2017 | BG | 15.02.2018 | NO | 15.02.2018 | GR | 16.02.2018 | IS | 15.03.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 25.08.2011 | |
AT | 15.11.2017 | ||
CY | 15.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.11.2017 | ||
DK | 15.11.2017 | ||
EE | 15.11.2017 | ||
ES | 15.11.2017 | ||
FI | 15.11.2017 | ||
HR | 15.11.2017 | ||
IT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LV | 15.11.2017 | ||
MC | 15.11.2017 | ||
MK | 15.11.2017 | ||
NL | 15.11.2017 | ||
PL | 15.11.2017 | ||
PT | 15.11.2017 | ||
RO | 15.11.2017 | ||
RS | 15.11.2017 | ||
SE | 15.11.2017 | ||
SI | 15.11.2017 | ||
SK | 15.11.2017 | ||
SM | 15.11.2017 | ||
TR | 15.11.2017 | ||
BG | 15.02.2018 | ||
NO | 15.02.2018 | ||
GR | 16.02.2018 | ||
Former [2020/27] | HU | 25.08.2011 | |
AT | 15.11.2017 | ||
CY | 15.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.11.2017 | ||
DK | 15.11.2017 | ||
EE | 15.11.2017 | ||
ES | 15.11.2017 | ||
FI | 15.11.2017 | ||
HR | 15.11.2017 | ||
IT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LV | 15.11.2017 | ||
MC | 15.11.2017 | ||
NL | 15.11.2017 | ||
PL | 15.11.2017 | ||
PT | 15.11.2017 | ||
RO | 15.11.2017 | ||
RS | 15.11.2017 | ||
SE | 15.11.2017 | ||
SI | 15.11.2017 | ||
SK | 15.11.2017 | ||
SM | 15.11.2017 | ||
TR | 15.11.2017 | ||
BG | 15.02.2018 | ||
NO | 15.02.2018 | ||
GR | 16.02.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 15.11.2017 | |
CY | 15.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.11.2017 | ||
DK | 15.11.2017 | ||
EE | 15.11.2017 | ||
ES | 15.11.2017 | ||
FI | 15.11.2017 | ||
HR | 15.11.2017 | ||
IT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LV | 15.11.2017 | ||
MC | 15.11.2017 | ||
NL | 15.11.2017 | ||
PL | 15.11.2017 | ||
RO | 15.11.2017 | ||
RS | 15.11.2017 | ||
SE | 15.11.2017 | ||
SI | 15.11.2017 | ||
SK | 15.11.2017 | ||
SM | 15.11.2017 | ||
TR | 15.11.2017 | ||
BG | 15.02.2018 | ||
NO | 15.02.2018 | ||
GR | 16.02.2018 | ||
Former [2019/15] | AT | 15.11.2017 | |
CY | 15.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.11.2017 | ||
DK | 15.11.2017 | ||
EE | 15.11.2017 | ||
ES | 15.11.2017 | ||
FI | 15.11.2017 | ||
HR | 15.11.2017 | ||
IT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LV | 15.11.2017 | ||
MC | 15.11.2017 | ||
NL | 15.11.2017 | ||
PL | 15.11.2017 | ||
RO | 15.11.2017 | ||
RS | 15.11.2017 | ||
SE | 15.11.2017 | ||
SI | 15.11.2017 | ||
SK | 15.11.2017 | ||
SM | 15.11.2017 | ||
BG | 15.02.2018 | ||
NO | 15.02.2018 | ||
GR | 16.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 15.11.2017 | |
CY | 15.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.11.2017 | ||
DK | 15.11.2017 | ||
EE | 15.11.2017 | ||
ES | 15.11.2017 | ||
FI | 15.11.2017 | ||
HR | 15.11.2017 | ||
IT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LV | 15.11.2017 | ||
NL | 15.11.2017 | ||
PL | 15.11.2017 | ||
RO | 15.11.2017 | ||
RS | 15.11.2017 | ||
SE | 15.11.2017 | ||
SI | 15.11.2017 | ||
SK | 15.11.2017 | ||
SM | 15.11.2017 | ||
BG | 15.02.2018 | ||
NO | 15.02.2018 | ||
GR | 16.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 15.11.2017 | |
CY | 15.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.11.2017 | ||
DK | 15.11.2017 | ||
EE | 15.11.2017 | ||
ES | 15.11.2017 | ||
FI | 15.11.2017 | ||
HR | 15.11.2017 | ||
IT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LV | 15.11.2017 | ||
NL | 15.11.2017 | ||
PL | 15.11.2017 | ||
RO | 15.11.2017 | ||
RS | 15.11.2017 | ||
SE | 15.11.2017 | ||
SK | 15.11.2017 | ||
SM | 15.11.2017 | ||
BG | 15.02.2018 | ||
NO | 15.02.2018 | ||
GR | 16.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 15.11.2017 | |
CY | 15.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.11.2017 | ||
DK | 15.11.2017 | ||
EE | 15.11.2017 | ||
ES | 15.11.2017 | ||
FI | 15.11.2017 | ||
HR | 15.11.2017 | ||
IT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LV | 15.11.2017 | ||
NL | 15.11.2017 | ||
PL | 15.11.2017 | ||
RS | 15.11.2017 | ||
SE | 15.11.2017 | ||
SK | 15.11.2017 | ||
SM | 15.11.2017 | ||
BG | 15.02.2018 | ||
NO | 15.02.2018 | ||
GR | 16.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | AT | 15.11.2017 | |
CY | 15.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.11.2017 | ||
DK | 15.11.2017 | ||
EE | 15.11.2017 | ||
ES | 15.11.2017 | ||
FI | 15.11.2017 | ||
HR | 15.11.2017 | ||
LT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LV | 15.11.2017 | ||
NL | 15.11.2017 | ||
PL | 15.11.2017 | ||
RS | 15.11.2017 | ||
SE | 15.11.2017 | ||
SK | 15.11.2017 | ||
SM | 15.11.2017 | ||
BG | 15.02.2018 | ||
NO | 15.02.2018 | ||
GR | 16.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | AT | 15.11.2017 | |
CY | 15.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.11.2017 | ||
DK | 15.11.2017 | ||
EE | 15.11.2017 | ||
ES | 15.11.2017 | ||
FI | 15.11.2017 | ||
HR | 15.11.2017 | ||
LT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LV | 15.11.2017 | ||
NL | 15.11.2017 | ||
RS | 15.11.2017 | ||
SE | 15.11.2017 | ||
SK | 15.11.2017 | ||
BG | 15.02.2018 | ||
NO | 15.02.2018 | ||
GR | 16.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 15.11.2017 | |
ES | 15.11.2017 | ||
FI | 15.11.2017 | ||
HR | 15.11.2017 | ||
LT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LV | 15.11.2017 | ||
NL | 15.11.2017 | ||
RS | 15.11.2017 | ||
SE | 15.11.2017 | ||
BG | 15.02.2018 | ||
NO | 15.02.2018 | ||
GR | 16.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 15.11.2017 | |
ES | 15.11.2017 | ||
FI | 15.11.2017 | ||
HR | 15.11.2017 | ||
LT | 15.11.2017 | ||
NL | 15.11.2017 | ||
RS | 15.11.2017 | ||
SE | 15.11.2017 | ||
NO | 15.02.2018 | ||
GR | 16.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | ES | 15.11.2017 | |
FI | 15.11.2017 | ||
LT | 15.11.2017 | ||
NL | 15.11.2017 | ||
NO | 15.02.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US5267297 (KAWANO MINORI [JP], et al) [X] 1,8,10,11,13-15 * abstract * * column 7, lines 1-46 * [Y] 3-6 [I] 2,9,12; | [XI]US2009002260 (BOOTH BARRY [US]) [X] 1,8,10,11 * figures 1,2 * * paragraphs [0054] - [0058] * [I] 2,7,12; | [XI]DE102006056501 (SAINT GOBAIN SEKURIT D GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,10,11 * figure 1 * * paragraphs [0025] - [0031] * [I] 2,9; | [Y]US7043280 (SHIELDS RICHARD A [US], et al) [Y] 3-6 * figures 2,3 * * column 4, paragraphs 52-65 *; | [A]DE102009028620 (ENDRESS & HAUSER GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0060] - [0065] *; | [A]EP2113963 (NOKIA SIEMENS NETWORKS OY [FI]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0020] - [0031]; figures 1-3 * | International search | [X]CN201689982U (WEIBO TELECOM EQUIPMENT MFG CO LTD); | [Y]CN101950846 (TONGYU COMM INC); | [X]CN101895018 (HUBEI WEIAO ELECTRONIC TECHNOLOGY CO LTD); | [A]CN102035061 (GUANGDONG TONGYU COMM CO LTD); | [A]US2011188205 (MACMANUS GERARD [US], et al) | by applicant | US5267297 |