EP2756967 - TIRE PRESSURE MONITORING SYSTEM AND MONITORING ASSEMBLY FOR VEHICLE-MOUNTED POWER-DRAWING INTERFACE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.03.2017 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Steelmate Co., Ltd. Steelmate Industry Park Heping Avenue Dongfu Road Dongfeng Zhongshan, Guangdong 528425 / CN | [2014/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Zhitao Steelmate Industry Park Heping Avenue Dongfu Road Dongfeng Town Zhongshan Guangdong 528425 / CN | [2014/30] | Representative(s) | Gulde & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Wallstraße 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | [2014/30] | Application number, filing date | 11872287.5 | 15.11.2011 | [2016/19] | WO2011CN82234 | Priority number, date | CN201110270132 | 13.09.2011 Original published format: CN201110270132 | [2014/30] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013037163 | Date: | 21.03.2013 | Language: | ZH | [2013/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2756967 | Date: | 23.07.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2756967 | Date: | 11.05.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 21.03.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.03.2015 | Classification | IPC: | B60C23/04, H01R13/502, H01R13/02, H01R13/00, H02J7/00, H01R103/00, H01R24/58, H01R31/06 | [2015/51] | CPC: |
B60C23/0433 (EP,US);
B60C23/02 (US);
H01R2103/00 (EP,US);
H01R2201/26 (EP,US);
H01R24/58 (EP,US);
H01R31/065 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2015/18] | B60C23/04, H01R13/502, H01R13/02, H01R13/00, H02J7/00 | ||
Former IPC [2014/30] | B60C23/04, H01R13/502, H01R13/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/30] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | REIFENDRUCK-ÜBERWACHUNGSSYSTEM UND ÜBERWACHUNGSANORDNUNG FÜR EINE FAHRZEUGMONTIERTE STROMENTNAHMESCHNITTSTELLE | [2014/30] | English: | TIRE PRESSURE MONITORING SYSTEM AND MONITORING ASSEMBLY FOR VEHICLE-MOUNTED POWER-DRAWING INTERFACE | [2014/30] | French: | SYSTÈME DE SURVEILLANCE DE PRESSION DE GONFLAGE DE PNEU ET ENSEMBLE DE SURVEILLANCE POUR INTERFACE D'APPEL D'ÉNERGIE MONTÉE SUR VÉHICULE | [2014/30] | Entry into regional phase | 24.05.2013 | Translation filed | 24.05.2013 | National basic fee paid | 24.05.2013 | Search fee paid | 24.05.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.05.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.05.2013 | Examination requested [2014/30] | 12.10.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.12.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.03.2016 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 01.03.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 01.03.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.03.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.04.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.12.2015 | Opposition(s) | 14.02.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.11.2011 | AL | 11.05.2016 | AT | 11.05.2016 | BE | 11.05.2016 | BG | 11.05.2016 | CY | 11.05.2016 | CZ | 11.05.2016 | DK | 11.05.2016 | EE | 11.05.2016 | FI | 11.05.2016 | HR | 11.05.2016 | IS | 11.05.2016 | LT | 11.05.2016 | LV | 11.05.2016 | MC | 11.05.2016 | MK | 11.05.2016 | NL | 11.05.2016 | PL | 11.05.2016 | RO | 11.05.2016 | RS | 11.05.2016 | SE | 11.05.2016 | SI | 11.05.2016 | SK | 11.05.2016 | SM | 11.05.2016 | TR | 11.05.2016 | NO | 11.08.2016 | GR | 12.08.2016 | IE | 15.11.2016 | MT | 15.11.2016 | CH | 30.11.2016 | LI | 30.11.2016 | LU | 30.11.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/45] | HU | 15.11.2011 | |
AT | 11.05.2016 | ||
BE | 11.05.2016 | ||
BG | 11.05.2016 | ||
CY | 11.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 11.05.2016 | ||
DK | 11.05.2016 | ||
EE | 11.05.2016 | ||
FI | 11.05.2016 | ||
HR | 11.05.2016 | ||
IS | 11.05.2016 | ||
LT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LV | 11.05.2016 | ||
MC | 11.05.2016 | ||
MK | 11.05.2016 | ||
NL | 11.05.2016 | ||
PL | 11.05.2016 | ||
RO | 11.05.2016 | ||
RS | 11.05.2016 | ||
SE | 11.05.2016 | ||
SI | 11.05.2016 | ||
SK | 11.05.2016 | ||
SM | 11.05.2016 | ||
TR | 11.05.2016 | ||
NO | 11.08.2016 | ||
GR | 12.08.2016 | ||
IE | 15.11.2016 | ||
MT | 15.11.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2018/43] | HU | 15.11.2011 | |
AT | 11.05.2016 | ||
BE | 11.05.2016 | ||
BG | 11.05.2016 | ||
CY | 11.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 11.05.2016 | ||
DK | 11.05.2016 | ||
EE | 11.05.2016 | ||
FI | 11.05.2016 | ||
HR | 11.05.2016 | ||
IS | 11.05.2016 | ||
LT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LV | 11.05.2016 | ||
MC | 11.05.2016 | ||
MK | 11.05.2016 | ||
NL | 11.05.2016 | ||
PL | 11.05.2016 | ||
RO | 11.05.2016 | ||
RS | 11.05.2016 | ||
SE | 11.05.2016 | ||
SI | 11.05.2016 | ||
SK | 11.05.2016 | ||
SM | 11.05.2016 | ||
NO | 11.08.2016 | ||
GR | 12.08.2016 | ||
IE | 15.11.2016 | ||
MT | 15.11.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2018/38] | HU | 15.11.2011 | |
AT | 11.05.2016 | ||
BE | 11.05.2016 | ||
BG | 11.05.2016 | ||
CY | 11.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 11.05.2016 | ||
DK | 11.05.2016 | ||
EE | 11.05.2016 | ||
FI | 11.05.2016 | ||
HR | 11.05.2016 | ||
IS | 11.05.2016 | ||
LT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LV | 11.05.2016 | ||
MC | 11.05.2016 | ||
MK | 11.05.2016 | ||
NL | 11.05.2016 | ||
PL | 11.05.2016 | ||
RO | 11.05.2016 | ||
RS | 11.05.2016 | ||
SE | 11.05.2016 | ||
SI | 11.05.2016 | ||
SK | 11.05.2016 | ||
SM | 11.05.2016 | ||
NO | 11.08.2016 | ||
GR | 12.08.2016 | ||
IE | 15.11.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2018/34] | HU | 15.11.2011 | |
AT | 11.05.2016 | ||
BE | 11.05.2016 | ||
CY | 11.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 11.05.2016 | ||
DK | 11.05.2016 | ||
EE | 11.05.2016 | ||
FI | 11.05.2016 | ||
HR | 11.05.2016 | ||
IS | 11.05.2016 | ||
LT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LV | 11.05.2016 | ||
MC | 11.05.2016 | ||
MK | 11.05.2016 | ||
NL | 11.05.2016 | ||
PL | 11.05.2016 | ||
RO | 11.05.2016 | ||
RS | 11.05.2016 | ||
SE | 11.05.2016 | ||
SI | 11.05.2016 | ||
SK | 11.05.2016 | ||
SM | 11.05.2016 | ||
NO | 11.08.2016 | ||
GR | 12.08.2016 | ||
IE | 15.11.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2018/31] | HU | 15.11.2011 | |
AT | 11.05.2016 | ||
BE | 11.05.2016 | ||
CY | 11.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 11.05.2016 | ||
DK | 11.05.2016 | ||
EE | 11.05.2016 | ||
FI | 11.05.2016 | ||
HR | 11.05.2016 | ||
IS | 11.05.2016 | ||
LT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LV | 11.05.2016 | ||
MC | 11.05.2016 | ||
MK | 11.05.2016 | ||
NL | 11.05.2016 | ||
PL | 11.05.2016 | ||
RO | 11.05.2016 | ||
RS | 11.05.2016 | ||
SE | 11.05.2016 | ||
SI | 11.05.2016 | ||
SK | 11.05.2016 | ||
SM | 11.05.2016 | ||
NO | 11.08.2016 | ||
GR | 12.08.2016 | ||
IE | 15.11.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 15.11.2011 | |
AT | 11.05.2016 | ||
BE | 11.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 11.05.2016 | ||
DK | 11.05.2016 | ||
EE | 11.05.2016 | ||
FI | 11.05.2016 | ||
HR | 11.05.2016 | ||
LT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LV | 11.05.2016 | ||
MC | 11.05.2016 | ||
MK | 11.05.2016 | ||
NL | 11.05.2016 | ||
PL | 11.05.2016 | ||
RO | 11.05.2016 | ||
RS | 11.05.2016 | ||
SE | 11.05.2016 | ||
SI | 11.05.2016 | ||
SK | 11.05.2016 | ||
SM | 11.05.2016 | ||
NO | 11.08.2016 | ||
GR | 12.08.2016 | ||
IE | 15.11.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 11.05.2016 | |
BE | 11.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 11.05.2016 | ||
DK | 11.05.2016 | ||
EE | 11.05.2016 | ||
FI | 11.05.2016 | ||
HR | 11.05.2016 | ||
LT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LV | 11.05.2016 | ||
NL | 11.05.2016 | ||
PL | 11.05.2016 | ||
RO | 11.05.2016 | ||
RS | 11.05.2016 | ||
SE | 11.05.2016 | ||
SI | 11.05.2016 | ||
SK | 11.05.2016 | ||
SM | 11.05.2016 | ||
NO | 11.08.2016 | ||
GR | 12.08.2016 | ||
IE | 15.11.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/43] | AT | 11.05.2016 | |
BE | 11.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 11.05.2016 | ||
DK | 11.05.2016 | ||
EE | 11.05.2016 | ||
FI | 11.05.2016 | ||
HR | 11.05.2016 | ||
LT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LV | 11.05.2016 | ||
NL | 11.05.2016 | ||
PL | 11.05.2016 | ||
RO | 11.05.2016 | ||
RS | 11.05.2016 | ||
SE | 11.05.2016 | ||
SI | 11.05.2016 | ||
SK | 11.05.2016 | ||
SM | 11.05.2016 | ||
NO | 11.08.2016 | ||
GR | 12.08.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 11.05.2016 | |
BE | 11.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 11.05.2016 | ||
DK | 11.05.2016 | ||
EE | 11.05.2016 | ||
FI | 11.05.2016 | ||
HR | 11.05.2016 | ||
LT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LV | 11.05.2016 | ||
NL | 11.05.2016 | ||
PL | 11.05.2016 | ||
RO | 11.05.2016 | ||
RS | 11.05.2016 | ||
SE | 11.05.2016 | ||
SI | 11.05.2016 | ||
SK | 11.05.2016 | ||
SM | 11.05.2016 | ||
NO | 11.08.2016 | ||
GR | 12.08.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 11.05.2016 | |
BE | 11.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 11.05.2016 | ||
DK | 11.05.2016 | ||
EE | 11.05.2016 | ||
FI | 11.05.2016 | ||
HR | 11.05.2016 | ||
LT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LV | 11.05.2016 | ||
NL | 11.05.2016 | ||
PL | 11.05.2016 | ||
RO | 11.05.2016 | ||
RS | 11.05.2016 | ||
SE | 11.05.2016 | ||
SK | 11.05.2016 | ||
SM | 11.05.2016 | ||
NO | 11.08.2016 | ||
GR | 12.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | BE | 11.05.2016 | |
CZ | 11.05.2016 | ||
DK | 11.05.2016 | ||
EE | 11.05.2016 | ||
FI | 11.05.2016 | ||
HR | 11.05.2016 | ||
LT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LV | 11.05.2016 | ||
NL | 11.05.2016 | ||
PL | 11.05.2016 | ||
RO | 11.05.2016 | ||
RS | 11.05.2016 | ||
SE | 11.05.2016 | ||
SK | 11.05.2016 | ||
NO | 11.08.2016 | ||
GR | 12.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | CZ | 11.05.2016 | |
DK | 11.05.2016 | ||
EE | 11.05.2016 | ||
FI | 11.05.2016 | ||
HR | 11.05.2016 | ||
LT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LV | 11.05.2016 | ||
NL | 11.05.2016 | ||
RO | 11.05.2016 | ||
RS | 11.05.2016 | ||
SE | 11.05.2016 | ||
NO | 11.08.2016 | ||
GR | 12.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | DK | 11.05.2016 | |
FI | 11.05.2016 | ||
HR | 11.05.2016 | ||
LT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LV | 11.05.2016 | ||
NL | 11.05.2016 | ||
RS | 11.05.2016 | ||
SE | 11.05.2016 | ||
NO | 11.08.2016 | ||
GR | 12.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/52] | FI | 11.05.2016 | |
HR | 11.05.2016 | ||
LT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LV | 11.05.2016 | ||
NL | 11.05.2016 | ||
RS | 11.05.2016 | ||
SE | 11.05.2016 | ||
NO | 11.08.2016 | ||
GR | 12.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | FI | 11.05.2016 | |
HR | 11.05.2016 | ||
LT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LV | 11.05.2016 | ||
NL | 11.05.2016 | ||
RS | 11.05.2016 | ||
NO | 11.08.2016 | ||
GR | 12.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | FI | 11.05.2016 | |
HR | 11.05.2016 | ||
LT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LV | 11.05.2016 | ||
NL | 11.05.2016 | ||
RS | 11.05.2016 | ||
NO | 11.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 11.05.2016 | |
LT | 11.05.2016 | ||
NL | 11.05.2016 | ||
NO | 11.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 11.05.2016 | |
NO | 11.08.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4682139 (KUO JUNG-TSAN [TW]) [A] 5 * figure 2 *; | [A]US6394851 (PACIOREK MATTHEW A [US]) [A] 5,6* figure 5 *; | [A]US2004092156 (ARKIN DAVID M [US], et al) [A] 5 * figures 1-3 *; | [X]US6868718 (XU XIGANG) [X] 1-4 * figures 2-6 *; | [XA]US2006125613 (KO YUEH-YING [TW]) [X] 1-4,14 * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0044]; figures 10A, 10B * [A] 5-13; | [A]DE202011001597U (CHANG CHING CHIH [TW]) [A] 5,6 * figure 5 * | International search | [A]CN2750940Y (XU XIGANG [CN]); | [A]US7024928 (CHEN JUI-YU [TW]); | [A]CN1785700 (KE YUEYING [CN]); | [X]CN101474973B (GUANGDONG STEELMATE SECURITY); | [E]CN102361154 (GUANGDONG STEELMATE SECURITY) | by applicant | CN101474973 |