EP2761764 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR CODE ACTIVATION, COMPUTER PROGRAM AND STORAGE MEDIUM THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 15.06.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.06.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 18.07.2018 [2018/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OCT Circuit Technologies International Limited Unit 32, the Hyde Building The Park, Carrickmines Dublin 18 / IE | [2017/03] |
Former [2014/32] | For all designated states ST-Ericsson SA Chemin du Champ-des-Filles 39 1228 Plan-les-Ouates / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TANG, Zhixun 9/F Tower B North Star Century Center Chaoyang District Beijing 100101 / CN | 02 /
LI, Xie 9/F Tower B North Star Century Center Chaoyang District Beijing 100101 / CN | 03 /
ZHUANG, Liang 9/F Tower B North Star Century Center Chaoyang District Beijing 100101 / CN | [2014/32] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/32] | Cabinet Plasseraud 52, rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 11873036.5 | 27.09.2011 | WO2011CN80230 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013044447 | Date: | 04.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2761764 | Date: | 06.08.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.04.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 04.04.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.06.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H04B1/707, H04B1/7105, H04J11/00 | [2015/30] | CPC: |
H04B1/7105 (EP,US);
H04J13/0077 (US);
H04B1/707 (US);
H04J11/0046 (EP,US);
H04J11/005 (EP,US);
H04B2201/70714 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2014/32] | H04B1/707 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/32] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR CODEAKTIVIERUNG SOWIE COMPUTERPROGRAMM UND SPEICHERMEDIUM DAFÜR | [2014/32] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR CODE ACTIVATION, COMPUTER PROGRAM AND STORAGE MEDIUM THEREOF | [2014/32] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL POUR ACTIVATION DE CODE, PROGRAMME INFORMATIQUE ET SUPPORT DE STOCKAGE CORRESPONDANT | [2014/32] | Entry into regional phase | 11.04.2014 | National basic fee paid | 11.04.2014 | Search fee paid | 11.04.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.04.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.04.2014 | Examination requested [2014/32] | 07.01.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.05.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.06.2018 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2018/29] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.05.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]WO2009138946 (NXP BV [NL], et al) [X] 1,3-5,9,11-13,18,19 * abstract * * page 1 * * page 7, line 11 - page 15, line 7 * [A] 7,8,15-17[I] 2,6,10,14 | International search | [A]CN1753322 (DATANG MOBILE COMM APPARATUS [CN]); | [A]CN1801648 (SPREADTRUM COMMUNICATIONS INC [CN]); | [A]CN101640549 (ZTE CORP); | [A]US2010128759 (MCKOWN RUSSELL [US], et al) |