EP2765510 - DATA PROCESSING METHOD, DISTRIBUTED PROCESSING SYSTEM, AND PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 18.06.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.06.2021 | Refusal of application | published on 21.07.2021 [2021/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fujitsu Limited 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2014/33] | For all designated states Fujitsu Limited 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MIZOBUCHI, Yuji c/o FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1 Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [2014/33] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/33] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11873769.1 | 06.10.2011 | WO2011JP73099 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013051131 | Date: | 11.04.2013 | Language: | JA | [2013/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2765510 | Date: | 13.08.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 11.04.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.06.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/50, G06F15/173 | [2016/27] | CPC: |
G06F9/5066 (EP,US);
G06F15/17331 (US)
|
Former IPC [2014/33] | G06F9/50 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/33] | Title | German: | DATENVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN, VERTEILTES VERARBEITUNGSSYSTEM UND PROGRAMM | [2014/33] | English: | DATA PROCESSING METHOD, DISTRIBUTED PROCESSING SYSTEM, AND PROGRAM | [2014/33] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT DE DONNÉES, SYSTÈME DE TRAITEMENT DISTRIBUÉ ET PROGRAMME | [2014/33] | Entry into regional phase | 26.03.2014 | Translation filed | 26.03.2014 | National basic fee paid | 26.03.2014 | Search fee paid | 26.03.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.03.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.03.2014 | Examination requested [2014/33] | 02.01.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.10.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.02.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.02.2021 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 23.02.2021 | 23.02.2021 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 05.03.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2021/29] | 15.03.2021 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2021/29] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 31.10.2019 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 03.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 01.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 04.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH09231184 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [A] 1-7 * abstract * * paragraph [0146] *; | [A]JPH1097544 (HITACHI LTD) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [A]US2008120314 (YANG HUNG-CHIH [US], et al) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [XI]JP2010092222 (IBM) [X] 1,2,5-7 * abstract * * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0021] * [I] 3,4; | [I]US2011072006 (YU YUAN [US], et al) [I] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [I]US2011154339 (LEE MYUNG-CHEOL [KR], et al) [I] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [I] - ROYA PARVIZI, "Inkrementelle Neuberechnungen mit MapReduce", BACHELOR THESIS, Technische Universität Kaiserslautern, (20110627), XP002757568 [I] 1-7 * the whole document * | [IP] - Thomas Jörg, Roya Parvizi, Hu Yong, Stefan Dessloch, "Incremental recomputations in MapReduce", New York, NY, USA, doi:10.1145/2064085.2064088, ISBN 978-1-4503-0956-1, (20111028), pages 7 - 14, Proceedings of the third international workshop on Cloud data management CloudDB '11, URL: http://dl.acm.org/citation.cfm?doid=2064085.2064088, (20160510), XP055151850 [IP] 1-7 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/2064085.2064088 | International search | [Y]JPH09231184 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP); | [A]JPH1097544 (HITACHI LTD); | [X]JP2010092222 (IBM) | by applicant | JP2003296395 | JP2010244470 | - JEFFREY DEAN; SANJAY GHEMAWAT, "MapReduce: Simplified Data Processing on Large Clusters", PROC. OF THE 6TH SYMPOSIUM ON OPERATING SYSTEMS DESIGN AND IMPLEMENTATION, (200412), pages 137 - 150 | - UTPAL BANERJEE; RUDOLF EIGENMANN; ALEXANDRU NICOLAU; DAVID A. PADUA, "Automatic Program Parallelization", PROC. OF THE IEEE (INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, (199302), vol. 81, no. 2, doi:doi:10.1109/5.214548, XP000369553 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/5.214548 |